This case was last updated from PACER on 02/02/2020 at 07:42:24 (UTC).

Hall et al v. Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 12/04/2019 Hall filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are Brian J. Davis and Joel B. Toomey. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-01398

  • Filing Date:

    12/04/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Middle District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Brian J. Davis

Referral Judge

Joel B. Toomey

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Teresa A. Hall

Kenneth L. Hall

Defendant

Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jason D. Montes

Attorney at Morgan & Morgan

16087 Tisons Bluff Road

Jacksonville, FL 32218

Defendant Attorney

Michael Francis Lenhardt

Attorney at Traub Lieberman Strauss & Shrewsberry LLP

360 Central Ave Ste 1000

St Petersburg, FL 33701-3878

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) Joint MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically JOINT MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE by Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company. (Lenhardt, Michael) (Entered: 01/16/2020)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #5 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Kenneth L. Hall, Teresa A. Hall. Related case(s): N (Montes, Jason) (Entered: 12/20/2019)

#8

(#8) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Kenneth L. Hall, Teresa A. Hall. (Montes, Jason) (Entered: 12/19/2019)

#7

(#7) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Liberty Mutual Group Inc., Corporate Parent LMHC Massachusetts Holdings Inc., Corporate Parent Liberty Mutual Holding Company Inc. for Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company.. (Lenhardt, Michael) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #5 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company. Related case(s): no (Lenhardt, Michael) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

5 #2

Consent Letter and Form

5 #1

Case Management Report Form

#5

(#5) NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 12/6/2019. (Attachments: #1 Case Management Report Form, #2 Consent Letter and Form)(CKS) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

#4

(#4) ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #3 Complaint (filed in State Court on 10/07/2019) by Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company.(AEJ) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

#3

(#3) COMPLAINT (filed in State Court on 09/03/2019) against Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company with Jury Demand filed by Teresa A. Hall, Kenneth L. Hall.(AEJ) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

1 #9

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #8

Exhibit 5 NOF-Notice of Removal

1 #7

Exhibit 4- Liberty Mutual Ltr

1 #6

Exhibit 3- Plfs Demand

1 #5

Exhibit 2- Property Appraiser Record

1 #4

State Court Other Documents Exhibit 1- State Ct. Documents

1 #3

State Court Docket Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Duval County Circuit Court, case number 2019-CA-006281 filed in State Court on 9/3/2019. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 113A-16210575 filed by Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 State Court COMPLAINT, #2 State Court ANSWER, #3 State Court Docket Sheet, #4 State Court Other Documents Exhibit 1- State Ct. Documents, #5 Exhibit 2- Property Appraiser Record, #6 Exhibit 3- Plfs Demand, #7 Exhibit 4- Liberty Mutual Ltr, #8 Exhibit 5 NOF-Notice of Removal, #9 Civil Cover Sheet)(Lenhardt, Michael) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ENDORSED ORDER: #10 The parties' Joint Motion for Preliminary Pre-Trial Conference is DENIED. The parties shall file their case management report consistent with the deadlines provided in Doc. #5 Track Notice. Signed by Judge Brian J. Davis on 1/17/2020. (AMP) (Entered: 01/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Joint MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically JOINT MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE by Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company. (Lenhardt, Michael) (Entered: 01/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #5 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Kenneth L. Hall, Teresa A. Hall. Related case(s): N (Montes, Jason) (Entered: 12/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Kenneth L. Hall, Teresa A. Hall. (Montes, Jason) (Entered: 12/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Liberty Mutual Group Inc., Corporate Parent LMHC Massachusetts Holdings Inc., Corporate Parent Liberty Mutual Holding Company Inc. for Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company.. (Lenhardt, Michael) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #5 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company. Related case(s): no (Lenhardt, Michael) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 12/6/2019. (Attachments: #1 Case Management Report Form, #2 Consent Letter and Form)(CKS) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #3 Complaint (filed in State Court on 10/07/2019) by Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company.(AEJ) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) COMPLAINT (filed in State Court on 09/03/2019) against Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company with Jury Demand filed by Teresa A. Hall, Kenneth L. Hall.(AEJ) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • Docket(#2) NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Brian J. Davis and Magistrate Judge Joel B. Toomey. New case number: 3:19-cv-1398-J-39JBT. (SJB) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Duval County Circuit Court, case number 2019-CA-006281 filed in State Court on 9/3/2019. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 113A-16210575 filed by Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 State Court COMPLAINT, #2 State Court ANSWER, #3 State Court Docket Sheet, #4 State Court Other Documents Exhibit 1- State Ct. Documents, #5 Exhibit 2- Property Appraiser Record, #6 Exhibit 3- Plfs Demand, #7 Exhibit 4- Liberty Mutual Ltr, #8 Exhibit 5 NOF-Notice of Removal, #9 Civil Cover Sheet)(Lenhardt, Michael) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.