This case was last updated from PACER on 10/04/2020 at 09:19:18 (UTC).

Hall et al v. Bush et al

Case Summary

On 08/05/2020 Hall filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Bush. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Michigan Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Janet T. Neff, Sally J. Berens and Hala Y. Jarbou. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00731

  • Filing Date:

    08/05/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Sally J. Berens

Presiding Judges

Janet T. Neff

Hala Y. Jarbou

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Heidi Hall

Pekin, IL 61554

Joseph Hall

Pekin, IL 61554

Defendants

Unknown Party #2

Tonya Martinez

Stacey Strouse

Marisa Anderson

Thomaca Bush

Elizabeth Montemayor

Herman McCall

Unknown Party #1

Peter Brown

Rita Ermatinger

Richard Garcia

Unknown Party #3

Sidra Alvi-Waller

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

Jennifer LaChell-Arver Walker

Attorney at MI Dept Attorney General (Child Support)

P.O. Box 30758

Lansing, MI 48909

Neil Anthony Giovanatti

Attorney at MI Dept Attorney General (Health/Education/Family Srvcs)

P.O. Box 30758

Lansing, MI 48909

Bonnie G. Toskey

Attorney at Cohl Stoker & Toskey, P.C.

601 N Capitol Ave.

Lansing, MI 48933

Courtney Ann Gabbara

Attorney at Cohl Stoker & Toskey, P.C.

601 N Capitol Ave.

Lansing, MI 48933

 

Court Documents

#27

#26

#24

#22

#23

#21

#20

#19

#18

#17

#16

#15

#14

#13

#12

#11

#10

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCopy of Notice Regarding Reassignment (HYJ), #26 sent via U.S. Mail to Heidi Hall and Joseph Hall (jmw) (Entered: 09/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCopy of Order on Stipulation and Proposed Order, #27 sent via U.S. Mail to Heidi Hall, Joseph Hall (ems) (Entered: 09/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) ORDER finding as moot STIPULATION #21 ; granting STIPULATION #24 ; Ingham County Defendants' response to Plaintiffs' Complaint shall be filed on or before 10/12/2020; signed by Magistrate Judge Sally J. Berens (cbh) (Entered: 09/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) NOTICE that this case is reassigned to District Judge Hala Y. Jarbou under #Administrative Order No. 20-CA-071 ; Judge Janet T. Neff is no longer assigned to the case (asm) (Entered: 09/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) CORRECTED PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER by defendants Sidra Alvi-Waller, Peter Brown, Richard Garcia, Stacey Strouse (Toskey, Bonnie) Modified text on 9/28/2020; this entry replaces #21 (ems). (Entered: 09/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) NOTICE to attorney Bonnie G. Toskey regarding recent filing #21 (ems) (Entered: 09/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) PROPOSED SEALED EXHIBIT by plaintiffs Heidi Hall, Joseph Hall re MOTION for protective order MOTION to SEAL exhibits 1-11, 13, & 17-21 #4 , Exhibit #2 (as submitted and filed per Order #13 ) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 13, #13 Exhibit 17, #14 Exhibit 18, #15 Exhibit 19, #16 Exhibit 20, #17 Exhibit 21) (ems) (Entered: 09/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) REPLY to response to motion #4 filed by Heidi Hall, Joseph Hall (ems) (Entered: 09/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER by defendants Sidra Alvi-Waller, Peter Brown, Richard Garcia, Stacey Strouse (Toskey, Bonnie) (Entered: 09/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCopy of Order on Proposed Order #20 sent via U.S. Mail to Heidi Hall, Joseph Hall (ems) (Entered: 09/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
24 More Docket Entries
  • 08/07/2020
  • Docket(NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Courtney Ann Gabbara on behalf of defendants Sidra Alvi-Waller, Peter Brown, Richard Garcia, Stacey Strouse (Gabbara, Courtney) (Entered: 08/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • Docket(NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Bonnie G. Toskey on behalf of defendants Sidra Alvi-Waller, Peter Brown, Richard Garcia, Stacey Strouse (Toskey, Bonnie) (Entered: 08/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCopy of Receipt of Case Notice #5 sent via U.S. Mail to Heidi Hall, Joseph Hall (ems) (Entered: 08/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of receipt of case (ems) (Entered: 08/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2020
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED as to defendants Sidra Alvi-Waller, Marisa Anderson, Peter Brown, Thomaca Bush, Rita Ermatinger, Richard Garcia, Tonya Martinez, Herman McCall, Elizabeth Montemayor, Stacey Strouse, Unknown Party #1, Unknown Party #2, Unknown Party #3 and returned to plaintiff at counter in KZ office (ems) Modified text on 8/7/2020 (ems). (Entered: 08/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION for protective order , MOTION to SEAL exhibits 1-11, 13, & 17-21 by plaintiffs Heidi Hall, Joseph Hall; (ems) (Entered: 08/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION to appoint counsel by plaintiffs Heidi Hall, Joseph Hall; (ems) (Entered: 08/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) EXHIBIT re #1 (CD of Exhibits 1-26) by plaintiffs Heidi Hall, Joseph Hall (ems) (Entered: 08/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2020
  • DocketRECEIPT: in the amount of $400.00, receipt number KZ004169; for civil filing fee (ems) (Entered: 08/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Sidra Alvi-Waller, Marisa Anderson, Peter Brown, Thomaca Bush, Rita Ermatinger, Richard Garcia, Tonya Martinez, Herman McCall, Elizabeth Montemayor, Stacey Strouse, Unknown Party #1, Unknown Party #2, Unknown Party #3 filed by Joseph Hall, Heidi Hall (Attachments: #1 Appendix, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (ems) Modified text on 8/7/2020 (ems). (Entered: 08/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Bonnie G. Toskey

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Neil Anthony Giovanatti