This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/01/2022 at 07:32:47 (UTC).

Hale v. State Farm Fire and Casualty Company

Case Summary

On 11/02/2021 Hale filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Oklahoma Northern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Gregory K Frizzell and Christine D Little. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:21-CV-00473

  • Filing Date:

    11/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Gregory K Frizzell

Referral Judge

Christine D Little

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Shawna Hale

Defendant

State Farm Fire and Casualty Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Michael Dennis McGrew

Attorney at Michael D McGrew & Associates PC

400 N Walker Ste 115

Oklahoma City, OK 73102

Defendant Attorneys

Anna Wolfe

Attorney at McAfee & Taft (Tulsa)

Two W Second St Ste 1100

Tulsa, OK 74103

Jessica Lynn Dickerson

Attorney at McAfee & Taft (Tulsa)

Two W Second St Ste 1100

Tulsa, OK 74103

 

Court Documents

2 #1

Exhibit 1 Petition

#11

(#11) SCHEDULING ORDER by Judge Gregory K Frizzell , setting/resetting scheduling order date(s): ( Discovery due by 6/15/2022, Dispositive Motions due by 6/29/2022, Motion Hearing set for 10/11/2022 at 01:30 PM before Judge Gregory K Frizzell, Proposed Pretrial Order due by 10/31/2022, Pretrial Conference set for 11/7/2022 at 09:30 AM before Judge Gregory K Frizzell, Jury Trial set for 11/21/2022 at 09:30 AM before Judge Gregory K Frizzell) (kjp, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 12/27/2021)

#10

(#10) JOINT STATUS REPORT by Shawna Hale (McGrew, Michael) (Entered: 12/10/2021)

#9

(#9) ORDER by Judge Gregory K Frizzell , directing parties to file joint status report ( Status Report due by 12/10/2021) (kjp, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 11/17/2021)

#8

(#8) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Michael Dennis McGrew on behalf of All Plaintiffs (McGrew, Michael) (Entered: 11/09/2021)

#7

(#7) ANSWER with Jury Demand (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint ) by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company (Dickerson, Jessica) (Entered: 11/09/2021)

#5

(#5) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Anna Wolfe on behalf of State Farm Fire and Casualty Company [Note: Attorney Anna Wolfe added to party State Farm Fire and Casualty Company(pty:dft).] (Wolfe, Anna) (Entered: 11/02/2021)

#4

(#4) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company (Dickerson, Jessica) (Entered: 11/02/2021)

#3

(#3) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Jessica Lynn Dickerson on behalf of State Farm Fire and Casualty Company (Dickerson, Jessica) (Entered: 11/02/2021)

2 #7

Exhibit 7 Registration with State of Oklahoma

2 #6

Exhibit 6 Registration with State of Illinois

2 #5

Exhibit 5 Corporate Disclosure

2 #4

Exhibit 4 Tulsa County Docket

2 #3

Exhibit 3 Summons

2 #2

Exhibit 2 Service of Process

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Removal with Jury Demand from Tulsa County, case number CJ-2021-01148 (paid $402 filing fee; receipt number AOKNDC-2506092) by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company (With attachments) (Dickerson, Jessica) (Entered: 11/02/2021)

#1

(#1) CIVIL COVER SHEET by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company (Dickerson, Jessica) (Entered: 11/02/2021)

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) SCHEDULING ORDER by Judge Gregory K Frizzell , setting/resetting scheduling order date(s): ( Discovery due by 6/15/2022, Dispositive Motions due by 6/29/2022, Motion Hearing set for 10/11/2022 at 01:30 PM before Judge Gregory K Frizzell, Proposed Pretrial Order due by 10/31/2022, Pretrial Conference set for 11/7/2022 at 09:30 AM before Judge Gregory K Frizzell, Jury Trial set for 11/21/2022 at 09:30 AM before Judge Gregory K Frizzell) (kjp, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 12/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) JOINT STATUS REPORT by Shawna Hale (McGrew, Michael) (Entered: 12/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER by Judge Gregory K Frizzell , directing parties to file joint status report ( Status Report due by 12/10/2021) (kjp, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 11/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Michael Dennis McGrew on behalf of All Plaintiffs (McGrew, Michael) (Entered: 11/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ANSWER with Jury Demand (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint ) by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company (Dickerson, Jessica) (Entered: 11/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • Docket(#6) MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing State Farm Fire and Casualty Company to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Corporate Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Corporate Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (blc, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 11/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Anna Wolfe on behalf of State Farm Fire and Casualty Company [Note: Attorney Anna Wolfe added to party State Farm Fire and Casualty Company(pty:dft).] (Wolfe, Anna) (Entered: 11/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company (Dickerson, Jessica) (Entered: 11/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Jessica Lynn Dickerson on behalf of State Farm Fire and Casualty Company (Dickerson, Jessica) (Entered: 11/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Removal with Jury Demand from Tulsa County, case number CJ-2021-01148 (paid $402 filing fee; receipt number AOKNDC-2506092) by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company (With attachments) (Dickerson, Jessica) (Entered: 11/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) CIVIL COVER SHEET by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company (Dickerson, Jessica) (Entered: 11/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • DocketPETITION/COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed in State Court against State Farm Fire and Casualty Company by Shawna Hale (blc, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 11/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where State Farm Fire & Casualty Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jessica L Dickerson