This case was last updated from PACER on 09/22/2020 at 09:34:58 (UTC).

HALE v. MUKES

Case Summary

On 07/24/2020 HALE filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against MUKES. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Middle District. The Judge overseeing this case is LESLIE ABRAMS GARDNER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00146

  • Filing Date:

    07/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Georgia Middle District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

LESLIE ABRAMS GARDNER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LIZZIE HALE

Defendants

WAQUANZA MUKES

JOHN DOES 1-3

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JORDAN JOHNSON

5 Dunwoody Park, Ste 100

Atlanta, GA 30338

Defendant Attorney

BRIAN EDWARD GOLDBERG

40 Capitol Sq Sw

Atlanta, GA 30334

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) RESPONSE filed by LIZZIE HALE re #5 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings (JOHNSON, JORDAN) (Entered: 09/15/2020)

6 #1

Memorandum in Support Brief in support of consent motion to stay discovery and f

#6

(#6) CONSENT MOTION to Stay Discovery and discovery schedule pending resolution of motion for partial judgment on the pleadings re #5 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings by WAQUANZA MUKES filed by BRIAN EDWARD GOLDBERG. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support Brief in support of consent motion to stay discovery and filing discovery schedule pending resolution of motion for partial judgment on the pleadings)(GOLDBERG, BRIAN) (Entered: 09/01/2020)

5 #1

Memorandum in Support Brief in Support of Motion for Partial Judgment on the Ple

#5

(#5) MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings by WAQUANZA MUKES filed by BRIAN EDWARD GOLDBERG. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support Brief in Support of Motion for Partial Judgment on the Pleadings)(GOLDBERG, BRIAN) (Entered: 09/01/2020)

4 #1

Required Form

#4

(#4) RULES 16/26 ORDER:Proposed Scheduling/Discovery order due by 9/4/2020. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE LESLIE ABRAMS GARDNER on 8/5/2020. (Attachments: #1 Required Form)(far) (Entered: 08/05/2020)

#3

(#3) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by WAQUANZA MUKES re #1 Notice of Removal, (GOLDBERG, BRIAN) (Entered: 07/24/2020)

#2

(#2) Consent Form (28 USC 636(c)(1)) sent to WAQUANZA MUKES (ggs) (Entered: 07/24/2020)

1 #3

Exhibit Exhibit C civil cover sheet

1 #2

Exhibit Exhibit B, pleadings filed BY defendant

1 #1

Exhibit Exhibit A Pleadings and process served on defendant

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL against WAQUANZA MUKES Fee paid: Receipt # AGAMDC-3522359, $400 filed by WAQUANZA MUKES (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Pleadings and process served on defendant, #2 Exhibit B, Answer filed BY defendant MUKES, #3 Exhibit C civil cover sheet)(GOLDBERG, BRIAN) Modified on 7/24/2020 to edit docket text. (ggs). (Entered: 07/24/2020)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) RESPONSE filed by LIZZIE HALE re #5 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings (JOHNSON, JORDAN) (Entered: 09/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CONSENT MOTION to Stay Discovery and discovery schedule pending resolution of motion for partial judgment on the pleadings re #5 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings by WAQUANZA MUKES filed by BRIAN EDWARD GOLDBERG. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support Brief in support of consent motion to stay discovery and filing discovery schedule pending resolution of motion for partial judgment on the pleadings)(GOLDBERG, BRIAN) (Entered: 09/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings by WAQUANZA MUKES filed by BRIAN EDWARD GOLDBERG. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support Brief in Support of Motion for Partial Judgment on the Pleadings)(GOLDBERG, BRIAN) (Entered: 09/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) RULES 16/26 ORDER:Proposed Scheduling/Discovery order due by 9/4/2020. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE LESLIE ABRAMS GARDNER on 8/5/2020. (Attachments: #1 Required Form)(far) (Entered: 08/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by WAQUANZA MUKES re #1 Notice of Removal, (GOLDBERG, BRIAN) (Entered: 07/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Consent Form (28 USC 636(c)(1)) sent to WAQUANZA MUKES (ggs) (Entered: 07/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL against WAQUANZA MUKES Fee paid: Receipt # AGAMDC-3522359, $400 filed by WAQUANZA MUKES (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Pleadings and process served on defendant, #2 Exhibit B, Answer filed BY defendant MUKES, #3 Exhibit C civil cover sheet)(GOLDBERG, BRIAN) Modified on 7/24/2020 to edit docket text. (ggs). (Entered: 07/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less