This case was last updated from PACER on 07/13/2019 at 10:20:35 (UTC).

Hale v. Janssen Research & Development LLC et al

Case Summary

On 04/02/2019 Hale filed a Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability lawsuit against Janssen Research Development LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Eldon E. Fallon and Michael North. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-07252

  • Filing Date:

    04/02/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Louisiana Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Eldon E. Fallon

Referral Judge

Michael North

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Donald Hale

Defendants

Johnson & Johnson Company

Bayer HealthCare LLC

Janssen Ortho LLC

JANSSEN RESEARCH & DEVELOPMENT LLC f/k/a JOHNSON AND JOHNSON PHARMACEUTICAL RESEARCH AND DEVELOPMENT LLC

Bayer AG

Bayer HealthCare AG

Bayer Pharma AG

Bayer Corporation

Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals Inc.

Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. f/k/a Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc. f/k/a Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.

Janssen Research & Development LLC

Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Kevin Michael Cox

Attorney at McDonald Worley

1770 St. James Place, Suite 100

Houston, TX 77056

William H. Barfield

Attorney at McDonald Worley

1770 St. James Place, Suite 100

Houston, TX 77056

 

Court Documents

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals Inc., Bayer Pharma AG, Janssen Ortho LLC, Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Janssen Research & Development LLC, Johnson & Johnson Company. (DeCou, Denischia) (Entered: 05/24/2019)

1 #2

Summons

#4

(#4) PRETRIAL ORDERS #1 - #31. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon.(adiGutierrez, ) (Entered: 05/28/2019)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7534262) filed by Donald Hale. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)Attorney Kevin Michael Cox added to party Donald Hale(pty:pla).(Cox, Kevin) (Entered: 04/02/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) PRETRIAL ORDERS #1 - #31. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon.(adiGutierrez, ) (Entered: 05/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Summons Issued as to Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals Inc., Bayer Pharma AG, Janssen Ortho LLC, Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Janssen Research & Development LLC, Johnson & Johnson Company. (DeCou, Denischia) (Entered: 05/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • (#2) Initial Case Assignment to Judge Eldon E. Fallon and Magistrate Judge Michael North. (gk) (Entered: 04/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7534262) filed by Donald Hale. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)Attorney Kevin Michael Cox added to party Donald Hale(pty:pla).(Cox, Kevin) (Entered: 04/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.