This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/24/2022 at 07:59:41 (UTC).

Hale et al v. Air & Liquid Systems Corp. et al

Case Summary

On 02/23/2022 Hale filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against Air Liquid Systems Corp. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Joseph C. Spero. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:22-CV-01112

  • Filing Date:

    02/23/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Joseph C. Spero

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Dennis Hale

Lora Hale

Defendants

Air & Liquid Systems Corp.

Alfa Laval Inc.

BW/IP, Inc.

CBS Corporation

Clark-Reliance Corporation

Crane Co.

Cummins Inc.

Elliot Company

Flowserve US Inc.

FMC Corporation

Gardner Denver, Inc.

WHEELER LLC FOSTER

General Electric Company

IMO Industries Inc.

ITT LLC

John Crane Inc.

Kaiser Gypsum Company, Inc.

Mueller Steam Specialty

20 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Stephen Michael Fishback

Attorney at Keller, Fishback & Jackson LLP

28720 Canwood Street Suite 200

Agoura Hills, CA 91301

Daniel Lee Keller

Attorney at Keller, Fishback & Jackson LLP

28720 Canwood Street, Suite 200

Agoura Hills, CA 91301

John Bruce Jackson

Attorney at Keller, Fishback & Jackson LLP

28720 Roadside Drive, Suite 201

Agoura Hills, CA 91301

Defendant Attorneys

Lance Douglas Wilson

Attorney at Tucker Ellis LLP

201 Mission Street, Suite 2310

San Francisco, CA 94105

Nicole Elisabet Gage

Attorney at Tucker Ellis LLP

201 Mission Street, Suite 2310

San Francisco, CA 94105

Carrie S. Lin

Attorney at Manning Gross + Massenburg LLP

201 Spear Street, Suite 1800

San Francisco, CA 94105

Abigail Perry Adams

Attorney at Manning Gross + Massenburg LLP

201 Spear Street, 18Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105

Stephen Vincent Harrington

Attorney at Manning Gross + Massenburg LLP

201 Spear Street, 18Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105-1637

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Exhibit A through E

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) Certificate of Interested Entities by John Crane Inc. (Lin, Carrie) (Filed on 2/23/2022) (Entered: 02/23/2022)

#4

(#4) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 5/20/2022. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/27/2022 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor. (jml, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/24/2022) (Entered: 02/24/2022)

#5

(#5) Rule 7.1 Disclosures by John Crane Inc. (Lin, Carrie) (Filed on 2/24/2022) (Entered: 02/24/2022)

#6

(#6) Clark-Reliance Corporation solely as alleged successor to Jerguson Gage & Valve Company's Answer to Complaint for personal injuries by Clark-Reliance Corporation. (Gage, Nicole) (Filed on 3/2/2022) Modified on 3/3/2022 (anj, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 03/02/2022)

7 #7

Main Document

7 #1

Certificate/Proof of Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/07/2022
  • Docket(#8) ORDER by Hon. Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Plaintiffs have filed a notice that this action, Hale v. Air & Liquid Systems Corp., et al., was removed from state court by several different defendants, and that as a result, three different cases have been opened inadvertently in this district. The Court determines that Case No. 22-CV-00853-JSW and Case No. 22-CV-01112-JCS are duplicative of Case No. 22-CV-00826-HSG. The Clerk is accordingly DIRECTED to close the later-filed cases, Case No. 22-CV-00853-JSW and Case No. 22-CV-01112-JCS. The parties are advised that all future filings should be done in Case No. 22-CV-00826-HSG. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (hsglc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/7/2022) (Entered: 03/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE OF MULTIPLE ASSIGNMENT OF SINGLE ACTION; REQUEST FOR CLARIFICATION AS TO ASSIGNED DEPARTMENT by Dennis Hale, Lora Hale (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Keller, Daniel) (Filed on 3/3/2022) Modified on 3/4/2022 (jml, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 03/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Clark-Reliance Corporation solely as alleged successor to Jerguson Gage & Valve Company's Answer to Complaint for personal injuries by Clark-Reliance Corporation. (Gage, Nicole) (Filed on 3/2/2022) Modified on 3/3/2022 (anj, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 03/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Rule 7.1 Disclosures by John Crane Inc. (Lin, Carrie) (Filed on 2/24/2022) (Entered: 02/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 5/20/2022. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/27/2022 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor. (jml, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/24/2022) (Entered: 02/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket#Electronic filing error. Filer did not add all interested parties when prompted. Re-file this document in its entirety and when prompted, enter all affiliates or corporate parents . Re: #2 Certificate of Interested Entities filed by John Crane Inc. (jml, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/24/2022) (Entered: 02/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • Docket(#3) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 3/9/2022. (cjl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2022) (Entered: 02/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Certificate of Interested Entities by John Crane Inc. (Lin, Carrie) (Filed on 2/23/2022) (Entered: 02/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from San Francisco County Superior Court. Their case number is CGC-21-276981. (Filing fee $402 receipt number ACANDC-16929584). Filed byJohn Crane Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A through E, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Lin, Carrie) (Filed on 2/23/2022) (Entered: 02/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Dr. Wheeler is a litigant

Latest cases where ELLIOT COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where Alfa Laval Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where CLARK-RELIANCE CORPORATION is a litigant