This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/11/2022 at 07:42:04 (UTC).

Halbert v. Marriot International, Inc.

Case Summary

On 01/10/2022 Halbert filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Marriot International, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-00104

  • Filing Date:

    01/10/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Thomas W. Thrash, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jesse Halbert

Defendant

Marriot International, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Andre Dennis

Attorney at Dennis Law Firm, LLC

101 Marietta Street Nw, Suite 2200

Atlanta, GA 30303

Defendant Attorneys

Edward Wylly Killorin, III

Attorney at Hall Booth Smith PC

191 Peachtree Street Ne, Suite 2900

Atlanta, GA 30303

Paul Barry Trainor

Attorney at Hall Booth Smith, P.C.-ATL

Suite 2900, 191 Peachtree Street, N.E.

Atlanta, GA 30303-1775

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Exhibit A

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #4

Exhibit D

1 #5

Exhibit E

1 #6

Civil Cover Sheet

2 #2

Main Document

2 #1

Exhibit A - Summons & Complaint

2 #2

Exhibit B - 14th Order Extending Declaration

#3

(#3) PROPOSED ORDER Order Granting Defendant's Motion to Dismiss re: #2 MOTION to Dismiss and Brief in Support. (Trainor, Paul) (Entered: 03/10/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) PROPOSED ORDER Order Granting Defendant's Motion to Dismiss re: #2 MOTION to Dismiss and Brief in Support. (Trainor, Paul) (Entered: 03/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSubmission of #2 MOTION to Dismiss and Brief in Support to District Judge Thomas W. Thrash Jr. (jeh) (Entered: 01/31/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION to Dismiss and Brief in Support by Marriot International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Summons & Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - 14th Order Extending Declaration)(Trainor, Paul) (Entered: 01/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT filed by Marriot International, Inc. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AGANDC-11506711) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(jra) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 01/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Marriott International Inc is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Paul Barry Trainor