This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/25/2023 at 07:15:54 (UTC).

Hal O'Neal v. 3M Company, The et al

Case Summary

On 02/24/2023 Hal O'Neal filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against 3M Company, The. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, South Carolina District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Richard M Gergel. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:23-CV-00746

  • Filing Date:

    02/24/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Richard M Gergel

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Hal O'Neal

Defendants

3M Company, The

Du Pont De Nemours Inc

UTC Fire & Security Americas Corporation Inc

Minnesota Mining and Manufacturing Company

Chemguard Inc

EI Du Pont De Nemours and Company

Chemours Company FC LLC, The

DowDupont Inc

Kidde-Fenwal Inc

Kidde PLC Inc

GE Interlogix Inc

United Technologies Corporation

Chubb Fire LTD

Corteva Inc

Chemours Company, The

Archroma US Inc

Carrier Global Corporation

Clariant Corporation

ChemDesign Products Inc

10 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Gary A Anderson

Gregory A Cade

Kevin B McKie

Richard M Zgoda

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ASCDC-10961301.), filed by Hal O'Neal. Service due by 5/25/2023(sshe, ) (Entered: 03/01/2023)

#2

(#2) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (sshe, ) (Entered: 03/01/2023)

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/01/2023
  • Docket(#3) MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: (Direct-filed) (associated as of 2/24/2023), Hal O'Neal v. 3M Company, The et al, as DSC case 2:23-cv-00746-RMG Plaintiff Home Venue: Eastern North Carolina (sshe, ) (Entered: 03/01/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (sshe, ) (Entered: 03/01/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ASCDC-10961301.), filed by Hal O'Neal. Service due by 5/25/2023(sshe, ) (Entered: 03/01/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less