This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/04/2021 at 11:03:25 (UTC).

Hakizimana v. D.M. Bowman, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 03/05/2021 Hakizimana filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against D M Bowman, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Leigh Martin May. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-00948

  • Filing Date:

    03/05/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Courthouse:

    Georgia Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Leigh Martin May

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Fidele Hakizimana

Defendants

ABC Corp.

Kevin Weaver

John Doe 1-2

D.M. Bowman, Inc.

XYZ Corp.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Benjamin J. Rollins

Attorney at The Angell Law Firm, LLC

Suite 110, 3391 Peachtree Road, Ne

Atlant, GA 30326

Defendant Attorneys

Jonathan Gibson

Attorney at Dennis Corry Smith & Dixon, LLP- ATL

Suite 1400, 900 Circle 75 Parkway

Atlanta, GA 30339

John D. Dixon

Attorney at Dennis Corry Smith & Dixon, LLP- ATL

Suite 1400, 900 Circle 75 Parkway

Atlanta, GA 30339

 

Court Documents

#13

(#13) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Discovery by D.M. Bowman, Inc., Kevin Weaver.(Gibson, Jonathan) (Entered: 04/12/2021)

#12

(#12) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Discovery Rule 5.4 - for non-party subpoenas) by D.M. Bowman, Inc., Kevin Weaver.(Gibson, Jonathan) (Entered: 04/08/2021)

#11

(#11) First Initial Disclosures by Fidele Hakizimana.(Rollins, Benjamin) (Entered: 04/07/2021)

#10

(#10) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Discovery Rule 5.4 - for D.M. Bowman's 1st ROGs & RPDs to Plaintiff by D.M. Bowman, Inc., Kevin Weaver.(Gibson, Jonathan) (Entered: 04/05/2021)

#9

(#9) Initial Disclosures by D.M. Bowman, Inc., Kevin Weaver.(Gibson, Jonathan) (Entered: 04/02/2021)

#8

(#8) SCHEDULING ORDER - Upon review of the information contained in the #7 Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan form completed and filed by the parties, the Court orders that the time limits for adding parties, amending the pleadings, filing motions, completing discovery, and discussing settlement are as set out in the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and the Local Rules of this Court, except as herein modified: The parties shall have 8 months to conduct discovery. Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 3/31/2021. (tcc) (Entered: 03/31/2021)

#7

(#7) JOINT PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by D.M. Bowman, Inc., Kevin Weaver. (Gibson, Jonathan) (Entered: 03/31/2021)

#6

(#6) Certificate of Interested Persons by D.M. Bowman, Inc., Kevin Weaver. (Gibson, Jonathan) (Entered: 03/19/2021)

#5

(#5) ELEVENTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 03/09/2021 (dgs) (ADI) (Entered: 03/10/2021)

#4

(#4) STANDING ORDER REGARDING CIVIL LITIGATION Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 3/8/2021. (tmf) (Entered: 03/08/2021)

#3

(#3) TENTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 1/27/21. (eop) (Entered: 03/08/2021)

#2

(#2) ANSWER to #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand by D.M. Bowman, Inc. and Kevin Weaver. Discovery ends on 8/2/2021. (Filed in State Court and included with Notice of Removal) (eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. (Entered: 03/08/2021)

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit -B - Answer

1 #1

Exhibit -A -Summons, Complaint and Affidavits of Service

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT filed by D.M. Bowman, Inc. and Kevin Weaver. (Filing fee $ 402.00 receipt number AGANDC-10799720) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit -A -Summons, Complaint and Affidavits of Service, #2 Exhibit -B - Answer, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 03/08/2021)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Discovery by D.M. Bowman, Inc., Kevin Weaver.(Gibson, Jonathan) (Entered: 04/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Discovery Rule 5.4 - for non-party subpoenas) by D.M. Bowman, Inc., Kevin Weaver.(Gibson, Jonathan) (Entered: 04/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) First Initial Disclosures by Fidele Hakizimana.(Rollins, Benjamin) (Entered: 04/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Discovery Rule 5.4 - for D.M. Bowman's 1st ROGs & RPDs to Plaintiff by D.M. Bowman, Inc., Kevin Weaver.(Gibson, Jonathan) (Entered: 04/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Initial Disclosures by D.M. Bowman, Inc., Kevin Weaver.(Gibson, Jonathan) (Entered: 04/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SCHEDULING ORDER - Upon review of the information contained in the #7 Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan form completed and filed by the parties, the Court orders that the time limits for adding parties, amending the pleadings, filing motions, completing discovery, and discussing settlement are as set out in the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and the Local Rules of this Court, except as herein modified: The parties shall have 8 months to conduct discovery. Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 3/31/2021. (tcc) (Entered: 03/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) JOINT PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by D.M. Bowman, Inc., Kevin Weaver. (Gibson, Jonathan) (Entered: 03/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClerks Notation re #6 Certificate of Interested Persons. Read and approved by LMM.(bnp) (Entered: 03/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Certificate of Interested Persons by D.M. Bowman, Inc., Kevin Weaver. (Gibson, Jonathan) (Entered: 03/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ELEVENTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 03/09/2021 (dgs) (ADI) (Entered: 03/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) STANDING ORDER REGARDING CIVIL LITIGATION Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 3/8/2021. (tmf) (Entered: 03/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) TENTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 1/27/21. (eop) (Entered: 03/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ANSWER to #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand by D.M. Bowman, Inc. and Kevin Weaver. Discovery ends on 8/2/2021. (Filed in State Court and included with Notice of Removal) (eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. (Entered: 03/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT filed by D.M. Bowman, Inc. and Kevin Weaver. (Filing fee $ 402.00 receipt number AGANDC-10799720) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit -A -Summons, Complaint and Affidavits of Service, #2 Exhibit -B - Answer, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 03/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where D.M. BOWMAN, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where XYZ CORPORATIONS 1-10 is a litigant

Latest cases where ABC CORPORATIONS 1-100 is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Benjamin J. Rollins