This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/26/2021 at 10:14:15 (UTC).

Hakes et al v. WorldMark the Club et al

Case Summary

On 12/04/2020 Hakes filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against WorldMark the Club. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Missouri Western District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Lajuana M. Counts and Roseann Ketchmark. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:20-CV-03384

  • Filing Date:

    12/04/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Lajuana M. Counts

Roseann Ketchmark

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Counter Defendants

Heidee Hakes

Matthew Hakes

Defendants and Counter Claimants

Wyndham Vacation Resorts, Inc.

WorldMark the Club

Wyndham Resort Development Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorney

J Lindsey Ikram

Attorney at Wood Ikram Law Firm

105 E. 5Th Street, Ste 402

Kansas City, MO 64106

Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorneys

David Alois Jermann

Attorney at Armstrong Teasdale LLP-KCMO

2345 Grand Boulevard, Suite 1500

Kansas City, MO 64108

Darren K. Sharp

Attorney at Armstrong Teasdale LLP-KCMO

2345 Grand Boulevard, Suite 1500

Kansas City, MO 64108

 

Court Documents

#25

(#25) STIPULATION of dismissal by WorldMark the Club, Wyndham Resort Development Corporation, Wyndham Vacation Resorts, Inc.. (Sharp, Darren) (Entered: 11/01/2021)

#24

#20

#18

#8

6 #1

Exhibit A 2020 Contract and 2005 Contract

#6

#5

4 #1

Exhibit A Notice to State Court and Plaintiffs of Removal to Federal Court

#4

2 #1

MAP General Order

#2

1 #5

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

1 #4

Exhibit 4 VonDavid Judgment

1 #3

Exhibit 3 Halverson Amended Final Judgment

1 #2

Exhibit 2 Declaration of Stacey Jagielski

1 #1

Exhibit 1 State Court File

#1

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) Order of Dismissal with prejudice per #25 STIPULATION of dismissal. Signed on November 5, 2021 by District Judge Roseann Ketchmark. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Wheeler, LaTandra) (Entered: 11/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) STIPULATION of dismissal by WorldMark the Club, Wyndham Resort Development Corporation, Wyndham Vacation Resorts, Inc.. (Sharp, Darren) (Entered: 11/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) STATUS REPORT by Heidee Hakes, Matthew Hakes. (Ikram, J) (Entered: 09/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • Docket(#23) ORDER that Plaintiffs file a status report by October 29, 2021, advising the Court as to the status of this case. Signed on 9/28/2021 by District Judge Roseann Ketchmark. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Brown, Jonathan) (Entered: 09/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • Docket(#22) Minute Entry. Proceedings held before District Judge Roseann Ketchmark: STATUS CONFERENCE held via teleconference on 9/28/2021. Counsel appearing for Defendants: Darren K. Sharp. Time in court: 1:35 pm to 1:41 pm. Discussions held as noted on the record. To order a transcript of this hearing please contact Katie Wirt, 816-512-5608, katie_wirt@mow.uscourts.gov. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Brown, Jonathan) (Entered: 09/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • Docket(#21) NOTICE OF HEARING - This is the official notice for this hearing. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. Status Conference set for 9/28/2021 at 1:30 PM in Chambers before District Judge Roseann Ketchmark. The call-in number for the teleconference is 888-557-8511 and the access code is 4626639. (Brown, Jonathan) (Entered: 08/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING CANCELLATION - The Status Conference scheduled for September 1, 2021 at 10:30 a.m. has been cancelled. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Casey, Susan) (Entered: 08/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF DOCKET MODIFICATION. A modification has been made to the document filed on 7/14/2021 as Document No. 21, Order to Show Cause. The document has been deleted as it was filed in the incorrect case. This is a text entry only - no document is attached. (Casey, Susan) (Entered: 07/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by All Defendants filed by Darren K. Sharp on behalf of Defendants WorldMark the Club, Wyndham Resort Development Corporation, Wyndham Vacation Resorts, Inc..(Sharp, Darren) (Entered: 06/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) ORDER granting #18 motion for extension of time. Defendants shall have until 6/17/21 to answer Plaintiffs' First Interrogatories and Requests for Production of Documents. Signed on 6/4/21 by District Judge Roseann Ketchmark. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Dollar, Jordan) (Entered: 06/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 01/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER by WorldMark the Club, Wyndham Resort Development Corporation, Wyndham Vacation Resorts, Inc.. (Sharp, Darren) (Entered: 01/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) COUNTER-DEFENDANTS ANSWER to Counterclaim on behalf of Heidee Hakes, Matthew Hakes.(Ikram, J) (Entered: 12/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT from Magistrate Judge Lajuana M. Counts to District Judge Roseann Ketchmark. Please note the new case number: 20-3384-CV-S-RK. (Melvin, Greg) (Entered: 12/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Defendants' ANSWER to Complaint Affirmative Defenses and, COUNTERCLAIM against Heidee Hakes, Matthew Hakes on behalf of Wyndham Resort Development Corporation, WorldMark the Club, Wyndham Vacation Resorts, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A 2020 Contract and 2005 Contract)(Sharp, Darren) (Entered: 12/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) RULE 16 NOTICE. Proposed scheduling order due on or before 1/26/2021. Rule 26 conference due by 1/12/2021. The parties are directed to review and comply with the Notice of Pretrial Procedures. Signed on December 9, 2020 by Magistrate Judge Lajuana M. Counts. (Clinton, Erica) (Entered: 12/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of filing by WorldMark the Club, Wyndham Resort Development Corporation, Wyndham Vacation Resorts, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Notice to State Court and Plaintiffs of Removal to Federal Court)(Sharp, Darren) (Entered: 12/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • Docket(#3) ADMINISTRATIVE TRANSFER. Due to a conflict of interest by the Honorable Jill A. Morris, this case was randomly reassigned to the Honorable Lajuana M. Counts for all further proceedings. Please note the new case number: 6:20-3384-CV-S-LMC. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Burch, Steve) (Entered: 12/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF MAGISTRATE ASSIGNMENT as to plaintiffs and defendants: All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge assignment. Click # here for instructions. Form due by 12/28/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Keller, Jeanne) (Entered: 12/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Keller, Jeanne) (Entered: 12/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Taney County, Missouri County, case number 2046-CC00243, filed by Darren K. Sharp on behalf of Wyndham Resort Development Corporation, WorldMark the Club, Wyndham Vacation Resorts, Inc.. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AMOWDC-7172104. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 State Court File, #2 Exhibit 2 Declaration of Stacey Jagielski, #3 Exhibit 3 Halverson Amended Final Judgment, #4 Exhibit 4 VonDavid Judgment, #5 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Sharp, Darren) (Entered: 12/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Worldmark, The Club is a litigant

Latest cases where Wyndham Resort Development Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where Wyndham Vacation Resorts, Inc. is a litigant