This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/21/2020 at 14:55:11 (UTC).

Hair v. Lake County Police Dept et al

Case Summary

On 05/22/2020 Hair filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Lake County Police Dept. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Indiana Northern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Andrew P Rodovich and Philip P Simon. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-00204

  • Filing Date:

    05/22/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Andrew P Rodovich

Presiding Judge

Philip P Simon

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Terik D Hair

Defendants

Winfield Police Dept

D Murchek

All Medical Departments and Staff of Lake Co. Jail

R Borchert

R Colombini

V Prieto

Oscar Martinez

M Hamady

Mr. Neary

Lake County Police Dept

M Powers

Illinois State Police Dept

B Wozniak

U.S. Border Patrol Dept

Michael Zenk

Lake County Jail

K. O'Connor

Lake County Sheriffs Dept

B Moore

2 More Parties Available

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Envelope

#2

2 #1

Envelope

#3

#4

4 #1

Envelope

#5

5 #1

Envelope

#6

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER GRANTING #4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; ORDERING Plaintiff to immediately pay $26.60 to the clerk in payment of the initial partial filing fee; ORDERING Plaintiff to pay to the clerk 20% of the money received for each calendar month during which $10.00 or more is received, until the $350.00 filing fee is paid in full; and DIRECTING the clerk to create a ledger for receipt of these funds and to send a copy of this order to each facility where the plaintiff is housed until the filing fee has been paid in full. Signed by Judge Philip P Simon on 7/21/2020. (Copy mailed to pro se and as directed in Order)(mrm) (Entered: 07/21/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Letter from Terik Hair requesting copy of IFP filed and docket. (copy of IFP and docket mailed to Plaintiff). (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (shk) (Entered: 07/13/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (Prisoner Trust Account Ledger attached) by Plaintiff Terik D Hair. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(shk) (Entered: 07/13/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER DIRECTING the clerk to place this case number on a blank AO 240 (Rev. 7/10) (INND Rev. 8/16) Prisoner Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis and send it to Terik D. Hair with a copy of this order GRANTING him until 7/31/2020, to resolve his filing fee status; and CAUTIONING him if he does not respond by the deadline, this case may be dismissed without further notice for non-payment of the filing fee. Signed by Judge Philip P Simon on 6/24/2020. (Copy mailed as directed in Order) (lhc) (Entered: 06/25/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION to Add Exhibits and Addresses by Plaintiff Terik D Hair. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(shk) (Entered: 06/03/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) PRO SE COMPLAINT against All Medical Departments and Staff of Lake Co. Jail, Benton, R Borchert, R Colombini, M Hamady, Illinois State Police Dept, Lake County Jail, Lake County Police Dept, Lake County Sheriffs Dept, J Manley, Oscar Martinez, B Moore, D Murchek, Neary, K. O'Connor, M Powers, V Prieto, U.S. Border Patrol Dept, Winfield Police Dept, B Wozniak, Michael Zenk, filed by Terik D Hair. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (No IFP or summons received) (File stamped copy sent to Plaintiff) (jat) (Entered: 05/22/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less