This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/27/2019 at 07:45:09 (UTC).

Haines v. Q Hotels, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 07/29/2019 Haines filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Q Hotels, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Amos L. Mazzant, III, Kimberly C Priest Johnson and Sean D. Jordan. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:19-CV-00564

  • Filing Date:

    07/29/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Kimberly C Priest Johnson

Presiding Judges

Amos L. Mazzant, III

Sean D. Jordan

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

George C. Haines

Defendants

Fairfield Inn & Suites by Marriott Denton

University Lodging, LLC

University Lodging Partners, LP

Q Hotels, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Steven Robert Samples

Attorney at Samples Ames PLLC

2727 Lbj Freeway, Suite 922

Dallas, TX 75234

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) REFERRAL ORDER. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636 and Local Rule CV-72, the undersigned hereby REFERS the cases set forth below to U. S. Magistrate Judge Kimberly C. Priest Johnson for all pretrial proceedings. Signed by District Judge Sean D. Jordan on 9/18/2019. (rpc, ) (Entered: 09/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2019
  • ORDER TRANSFERRING CIVIL CASES. It is hereby ORDERED that this civil action is transferred to the Honorable Sean D. Jordan, effective immediately. Upon transfer, any pretrial referral to a Magistrate Judge is REVOKED except in Social Security cases, Pro Se Non-Prisoner/Habeas cases, and mortgage cases, where the pretrial referral will stay in place. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by United States District Judge Amos L. Mazzant. District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III no longer assigned to the case. (kls, ) (Entered: 08/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (rpc, ) (Entered: 07/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • Case Assigned to District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III. (rpc, ) (Entered: 07/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-7368372.), filed by George C. Haines. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Samples, Steven) (Entered: 07/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Fairfield Inn & Suites by Marriott is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Steven Robert Samples