Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 07/21/2020 at 13:52:57 (UTC).

Haileselassie v. United States of America

Case Summary

On 05/22/2020 Haileselassie filed a Prisoner - Vacate Sentence lawsuit against United States of America. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Iowa Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is John A. Jarvey. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:20-CV-00162

  • Filing Date:

    05/22/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Vacate Sentence

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Iowa Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John A. Jarvey

 

Party Details

Petitioner

America Yegile Haileselassie

Po Box 6000

Glenville, WV 26351

Respondent

United States of America

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) Supplement by America Yegile Haileselassie re #1 Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255). (slg) (Entered: 07/16/2020)

#8

(#8) MOTION for Evidentiary Hearing by America Yegile Haileselassie. Responses due by 7/24/2020. (don) (Entered: 07/10/2020)

#7

(#7) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Exhibits by America Yegile Haileselassie. Responses due by 7/24/2020. (don) (Entered: 07/10/2020)

#6

(#6) MOTION to Issue Subpoenas by America Yegile Haileselassie. Responses due by 7/9/2020. (slg) (Entered: 06/25/2020)

#5

(#5) MOTION for Extension of Time to File 2255 motion by America Yegile Haileselassie. Responses due by 6/29/2020. (slg) (Entered: 06/15/2020)

#4

(#4) Letter from America Yegile Haileselassie. Docketed in 3-16-cr-70 as well. (slg) (Entered: 06/08/2020)

#3

(#3) ORDER re #2 Letter from petitioner. Petitioner's request for a ninety day extension within which to file his petition pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2255 is denied. Signed by Chief Judge John A. Jarvey on 5/26/2020. (mem) (Entered: 05/26/2020)

#2

(#2) Letter from America Yegile Haileselassie. (slg) (Entered: 05/26/2020)

1 #1

Affidavit

#1

(#1) MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255), filed by America Yegile Haileselassie. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit) (kjw) (Entered: 05/22/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Supplement by America Yegile Haileselassie re #1 Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255). (slg) (Entered: 07/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION for Evidentiary Hearing by America Yegile Haileselassie. Responses due by 7/24/2020. (don) (Entered: 07/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Exhibits by America Yegile Haileselassie. Responses due by 7/24/2020. (don) (Entered: 07/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION to Issue Subpoenas by America Yegile Haileselassie. Responses due by 7/9/2020. (slg) (Entered: 06/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION for Extension of Time to File 2255 motion by America Yegile Haileselassie. Responses due by 6/29/2020. (slg) (Entered: 06/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Letter from America Yegile Haileselassie. Docketed in 3-16-cr-70 as well. (slg) (Entered: 06/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER re #2 Letter from petitioner. Petitioner's request for a ninety day extension within which to file his petition pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2255 is denied. Signed by Chief Judge John A. Jarvey on 5/26/2020. (mem) (Entered: 05/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Letter from America Yegile Haileselassie. (slg) (Entered: 05/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255), filed by America Yegile Haileselassie. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit) (kjw) (Entered: 05/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less