This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/12/2021 at 08:53:05 (UTC).

Haile et al v. Arizona, State of et al

Case Summary

On 02/11/2021 Haile filed a Prisoner - Prison Condition lawsuit against Arizona, State of. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Arizona District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Diane J Humetewa and James F Metcalf. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-00272

  • Filing Date:

    02/11/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Diane J Humetewa

Referral Judge

James F Metcalf

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Sara Haile

Jocelyn Haile

Defendants

Arizona, State of

Christian Ortiz

Centurion of Arizona LLC

Timothy Johnson

Unknown Parties

Unknown Johnson

Unknown Ortiz

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Mark David Goldman

Attorney at Goldman & Zwillinger PLLC

17851 N 85Th St., Ste. 175

Scottsdale, AZ 85255

Defendant Attorneys

Sarah Lynn Barnes

Attorney at Broening Oberg Woods & Wilson PC - Phoenix, AZ

2800 N Central Ave., Ste. 1600

Phoenix, AZ 85004

Neil Singh

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General - Phoenix

2005 N Central Ave.

Phoenix, AZ 85004-1592

Eric Christopher Bevans

Attorney at Broening Oberg Woods & Wilson PC - Phoenix, AZ

2800 N Central Ave., Ste. 1600

Phoenix, AZ 85004

 

Court Documents

10 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#10

#9

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

3 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#3

#2

1 #4

Exhibit

1 #3

Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Joint MOTION for Extension of Time Joint Case Management Report by Arizona, State of. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Singh, Neil) (Entered: 04/09/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah Lynn Barnes on behalf of Arizona, State of, Centurion of Arizona LLC. (Barnes, Sarah) (Entered: 03/25/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal with Jury Demand by Arizona, State of.(Singh, Neil) (Entered: 03/17/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SCHEDULING ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 4/15/2021 at 10:15 AM before Magistrate Judge James F Metcalf. Discovery due by 8/31/2021. Dispositive motions due by 11/2/2021. Pretrial Motions due by 11/30/2021. See Order for further details. Signed by Magistrate Judge James F Metcalf on 3/5/21. (DXD) (Entered: 03/05/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Centurion of Arizona LLC. (Barnes, Sarah) (Entered: 03/04/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal with Jury Demand by Centurion of Arizona LLC.(Barnes, Sarah) (Entered: 03/04/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER granting #3 Stipulation: Plaintiff must either serve each unserved Defendant or seek a waiver of service for each unserved Defendant. Defendants Centurion and State of Arizona must answer the Complaint or otherwise respond by appropriate motion on or before 3/4/21. This matter is assigned to the standard track pursuant to Rule 16.2(b)(3) of the Local Rules of Civil Procedure. This matter is referred to Magistrate Judge James F. Metcalf pursuant to Rules 72.1 and 72.2 of the Local Rules of Civil Procedure for all pretrial proceedings. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 3/1/21. (DXD) (Entered: 03/01/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading by Arizona, State of, Centurion of Arizona LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Barnes, Sarah) (Entered: 02/16/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT (SCA) (Entered: 02/11/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • Docket***STATE COURT RECORDS RECEIVED*** SERVICE EXECUTED : Affidavit of Service upon Centurion of Arizona, LLC on 1/21/2021. (Original filed in Maricopa County State Court on 1/27/2021) SERVICE EXECUTED : Affidavit of Service upon State of Arizona on 1/21/2021. (Original filed in Maricopa County State Court on 1/27/2021) (SCA) This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (Entered: 02/11/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Maricopa County Superior Court, case number CV2021-050072. Filing fee received: $ 402.00, receipt number 0970-19154396 filed by Centurion of Arizona LLC. (Barnes, Sarah) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Exhibit)(SCA) (Entered: 02/11/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Centurion of Arizona LLC is a litigant