This case was last updated from PACER on 11/16/2020 at 09:30:08 (UTC).

Haifa Chemicals, Ltd. v. Israel Huipu Biotechnology Group, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 09/17/2020 Haifa Chemicals, Ltd filed an Intellectual Property - Trademark lawsuit against Israel Huipu Biotechnology Group, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Colorado District. The Judge overseeing this case is Scott T. Varholak. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-02823

  • Filing Date:

    09/17/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Trademark

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Colorado District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Scott T. Varholak

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Haifa Chemicals, Ltd.

Defendants

Israel Huipu Biotechnology Group, Inc.

Qingsong Ma

Jena Griswald

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Rakesh Khanna

Attorney at Weissberg and Associates, Ltd.

401 S. Lasalle Street, Suite 403

Chicago, IL 60605

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) SUMMONSES issued by Clerk. (cmadr, ) (Entered: 09/22/2020)

#10

(#10) SUMMONS REQUEST as to Quingsong Ma re #1 Complaint, by Plaintiff Haifa Chemicals, Ltd.. (Khanna, Rakesh) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

#9

(#9) SUMMONS REQUEST as to Jena Griswald re #1 Complaint, by Plaintiff Haifa Chemicals, Ltd.. (Khanna, Rakesh) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

#8

(#8) SUMMONS REQUEST as to Israel Huipu Biotechnology Group, Inc. re #1 Complaint, by Plaintiff Haifa Chemicals, Ltd.. (Khanna, Rakesh) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

#7

(#7) ORDER Setting Telephonic Scheduling Conference for 12/1/2020 10:15 AM before Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Consent Form due by 11/17/2020. Proposed Scheduling Order due 11/24/2020, by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 9/17/2020. (jgonz, ) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

#5

(#5) Report re Patent/Trademark: Report on the filing of an action emailed (NEF) to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (cpomm, ) (Entered: 09/17/2020)

#4

(#4) Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (cpomm, ) (Entered: 09/17/2020)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Rakesh Khanna on behalf of Haifa Chemicals, Ltd. (Khanna, Rakesh) (Entered: 09/17/2020)

1 #5

Exhibit

1 #4

Exhibit

1 #3

Exhibit

1 #2

Exhibit

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Jena Griswald, Israel Huipu Biotechnology Group, Inc., Qingsong Ma (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-7493344)Attorney Rakesh Khanna added to party Haifa Chemicals, Ltd.(pty:pla), filed by Haifa Chemicals, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit)(Khanna, Rakesh) (Entered: 09/17/2020)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) SUMMONSES issued by Clerk. (cmadr, ) (Entered: 09/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) SUMMONS REQUEST as to Quingsong Ma re #1 Complaint, by Plaintiff Haifa Chemicals, Ltd.. (Khanna, Rakesh) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) SUMMONS REQUEST as to Jena Griswald re #1 Complaint, by Plaintiff Haifa Chemicals, Ltd.. (Khanna, Rakesh) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUMMONS REQUEST as to Israel Huipu Biotechnology Group, Inc. re #1 Complaint, by Plaintiff Haifa Chemicals, Ltd.. (Khanna, Rakesh) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • Docket(#6) Administrative Notice: Duplicate filing fee received. Financial notified and a refund is pending. (Text Only Entry) (jtorr, ) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER Setting Telephonic Scheduling Conference for 12/1/2020 10:15 AM before Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Consent Form due by 11/17/2020. Proposed Scheduling Order due 11/24/2020, by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 9/17/2020. (jgonz, ) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Report re Patent/Trademark: Report on the filing of an action emailed (NEF) to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (cpomm, ) (Entered: 09/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (cpomm, ) (Entered: 09/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • Docket(#3) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Text Only Entry (cpomm, ) (Entered: 09/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Rakesh Khanna on behalf of Haifa Chemicals, Ltd. (Khanna, Rakesh) (Entered: 09/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Jena Griswald, Israel Huipu Biotechnology Group, Inc., Qingsong Ma (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-7493344)Attorney Rakesh Khanna added to party Haifa Chemicals, Ltd.(pty:pla), filed by Haifa Chemicals, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit)(Khanna, Rakesh) (Entered: 09/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less