This case was last updated from PACER on 08/17/2020 at 11:18:19 (UTC).

Hahn-Thompson v. Davis et al

Case Summary

On 06/18/2020 Hahn-Thompson filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Davis. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Reona J. Daly. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-00589

  • Filing Date:

    06/18/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Reona J. Daly

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Susan Hahn-Thompson

Defendants

C.R. England, Inc.

John Batson Davis

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Christopher A. Koester

Attorney at Taylor Law Offices, P.C.

122 East Washington Avenue, P.O. Box 668

Effingham, IL 62401

Kristen M Flood

Attorney at Taylor Law Offices PC

122 East Washington Avenue, P. O. Box 668

Effingham, IL 62401

Defendant Attorneys

Rodney D. Fourez, II

Attorney at Lashly & Baer, P.C.

714 Locust Street

St. Louis, MO 63101

Kevin L. Fritz

Attorney at Lashly & Baer, P.C.

714 Locust Street

St. Louis, MO 63101

 

Court Documents

#12

DOCUMENT UNAVAILABLE

#11

(#11) NOTICE: Susan Hahn-Thompson was directed to file the attached form regarding consenting or declining to consent to magistrate judge jurisdiction. The time for doing so has now passed, and the Court has not received the form. As required by Administrative Order No. 257, Susan Hahn-Thompson shall return the form within 7 days or face possible sanctions. The Clerk notes that due to the COVID-19 public health crisis, deadlines that were pending on or before April 1, 2020 were extended in accord with Administrative Order No. 261 and/or Amended Administrative Order No. 261. This automated notice does not take into account any such extensions. If, after the expiration of the 7-day deadline set forth herein, the Court chooses to take further action, all applicable deadline extensions will be considered at that time. Consent due by 7/20/2020 (tba) (Entered: 07/13/2020)

#10

DOCUMENT UNAVAILABLE

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Kristen M Flood on behalf of Susan Hahn-Thompson (Flood, Kristen) (Entered: 06/19/2020)

#8

(#8) NOTICE OF INITIAL ASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE: This case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Reona J. Daly pursuant to Administrative Order No. 257. The parties are advised that their consent is required if the assigned Magistrate Judge is to conduct all further proceedings in the case, including trial and final entry of judgment pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 73. As set forth in Administrative Order No. 257, each party will be required to file a Notice and Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form indicating consent or nonconsent to the jurisdiction of the assigned Magistrate Judge. If all parties do not consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction, the case will be randomly assigned to a district judge for all further proceedings and the parties cannot later consent to reassignment of the case to a magistrate judge. The parties are further advised that they are free to withhold consent without adverse substantive consequences. Within 21 days of this Notice, the following party or parties must file the attached form indicating consent to proceed before the assigned Magistrate Judge or an affirmative declination to consent: C.R. England, Inc., Susan Hahn-Thompson. A link regarding the magistrate judges in this district is attached for your convenience: #http://www.ilsd.uscourts.gov/documents/BenefitsofConsent.pdf. All future documents must bear case number 20-cv-589-RJD. Refer to Civil/Removal Case Processing Requirements, found on the ILSD website, for further service information. Consent due by 7/10/2020 (tba) (Entered: 06/19/2020)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Rodney D. Fourez, II on behalf of C.R. England, Inc. (Fourez, Rodney) (Entered: 06/18/2020)

#6

(#6) ANSWER to Complaint by C.R. England, Inc..(Fritz, Kevin) (Entered: 06/18/2020)

#5

(#5) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by C.R. England, Inc.. (Fritz, Kevin) (Entered: 06/18/2020)

#4

(#4) Corporate Disclosure Statement by C.R. England, Inc.. (Fritz, Kevin) (Entered: 06/18/2020)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin L. Fritz on behalf of C.R. England, Inc. (Fritz, Kevin) (Entered: 06/18/2020)

#2

(#2) NOTICE by C.R. England, Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal, Notice to Plaintiff (Fritz, Kevin) (Entered: 06/18/2020)

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit 2

1 #1

Exhibit 1

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Effingham County Circuit Court, case number 2020L18 ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0754-4207610), filed by C.R. England, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Fritz, Kevin) (Entered: 06/18/2020)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE - sealed pending receipt from all parties. (Flood, Kristen) (Entered: 08/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE: Susan Hahn-Thompson was directed to file the attached form regarding consenting or declining to consent to magistrate judge jurisdiction. The time for doing so has now passed, and the Court has not received the form. As required by Administrative Order No. 257, Susan Hahn-Thompson shall return the form within 7 days or face possible sanctions. The Clerk notes that due to the COVID-19 public health crisis, deadlines that were pending on or before April 1, 2020 were extended in accord with Administrative Order No. 261 and/or Amended Administrative Order No. 261. This automated notice does not take into account any such extensions. If, after the expiration of the 7-day deadline set forth herein, the Court chooses to take further action, all applicable deadline extensions will be considered at that time. Consent due by 7/20/2020 (tba) (Entered: 07/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE - sealed pending receipt from all parties. (Fritz, Kevin) (Entered: 07/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Kristen M Flood on behalf of Susan Hahn-Thompson (Flood, Kristen) (Entered: 06/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE OF INITIAL ASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE: This case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Reona J. Daly pursuant to Administrative Order No. 257. The parties are advised that their consent is required if the assigned Magistrate Judge is to conduct all further proceedings in the case, including trial and final entry of judgment pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 73. As set forth in Administrative Order No. 257, each party will be required to file a Notice and Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form indicating consent or nonconsent to the jurisdiction of the assigned Magistrate Judge. If all parties do not consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction, the case will be randomly assigned to a district judge for all further proceedings and the parties cannot later consent to reassignment of the case to a magistrate judge. The parties are further advised that they are free to withhold consent without adverse substantive consequences. Within 21 days of this Notice, the following party or parties must file the attached form indicating consent to proceed before the assigned Magistrate Judge or an affirmative declination to consent: C.R. England, Inc., Susan Hahn-Thompson. A link regarding the magistrate judges in this district is attached for your convenience: #http://www.ilsd.uscourts.gov/documents/BenefitsofConsent.pdf. All future documents must bear case number 20-cv-589-RJD. Refer to Civil/Removal Case Processing Requirements, found on the ILSD website, for further service information. Consent due by 7/10/2020 (tba) (Entered: 06/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Rodney D. Fourez, II on behalf of C.R. England, Inc. (Fourez, Rodney) (Entered: 06/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ANSWER to Complaint by C.R. England, Inc..(Fritz, Kevin) (Entered: 06/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by C.R. England, Inc.. (Fritz, Kevin) (Entered: 06/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Corporate Disclosure Statement by C.R. England, Inc.. (Fritz, Kevin) (Entered: 06/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin L. Fritz on behalf of C.R. England, Inc. (Fritz, Kevin) (Entered: 06/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE by C.R. England, Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal, Notice to Plaintiff (Fritz, Kevin) (Entered: 06/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Effingham County Circuit Court, case number 2020L18 ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0754-4207610), filed by C.R. England, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Fritz, Kevin) (Entered: 06/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where C.R. England, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Christopher A. Koester