This case was last updated from PACER on 11/19/2019 at 08:17:42 (UTC).

Hager Pacific Properties LLC et al v. West Coast Kustom Rigz, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 09/20/2019 Hager Pacific Properties LLC filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against West Coast Kustom Rigz, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Virginia A. Phillips and Kenly Kiya Kato. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:19-CV-01810

  • Filing Date:

    09/20/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Virginia A. Phillips

Referral Judge

Kenly Kiya Kato

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Dolin Property Investments LLC

Hager Pacific Properties LLC

Defendants

West Coast Kustom Rigz, Inc.

Does 1 through 10, inclusive

Cesar Valdez Carrera

Fontan, CA 92335

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Richard Geoffrey Daggenhurst

Attorney at Felman Daggenhurst and El Dabe

13743 Ventura Boulevard Suite 350

Sherman Oaks, CA 91423

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) Receipt of acknowledgment letter from San Bernardino County Superior Court, Fontana, CA 92335. Case No. UDFS1904396. (bm) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

#8

(#8) TRANSMITTAL of documents to San Bernardino County Superior Court. A certified copy of the order of remand and a copy of the docket sheet from this court was sent to San Bernardino County Superior Court, Fontana, CA 92335. (bm) (Entered: 10/02/2019)

#7

(#7) ORDER REMANDING CASE TO STATE COURT by Judge Virginia A. Phillips: IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that this matter be, and hereby is, REMANDED to the Superior Court of California listed above, for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Case Terminated. Made JS-6 (bm) (Entered: 10/02/2019)

#6

(#6) ORDER by Judge Virginia A. Phillips Denying #3 REQUEST to Proceed in Forma Pauperis: IT WAS RECOMMENDED that the Request to Proceed In Forma Pauperis be DENIED by Magistrate Judge Kenly Kiya Kato. Reason: District Court lacks jurisdiction. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that: This case is hereby REMANDED to state court. (bm) (Entered: 10/02/2019)

#5

(#5) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh) (Entered: 09/23/2019)

#4

(#4) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Virginia A. Phillips and Magistrate Judge Kenly Kiya Kato. (lh) (Entered: 09/23/2019)

#3

(#3) REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support filed by Defendant Cesar Valdez Carrera. (lh) (Entered: 09/23/2019)

#2

(#2) CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Cesar Valdez Carrera. (lh) (Entered: 09/23/2019)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of California, County of San Bernardino, Fontana District case number UDFS19004396 with NO copy of summons and CONFORMED FILED copy of complaint. Case assigned to Judge Virginia A. Phillips, Discovery to Magistrate Judge Kenly Kiya Kato. Filed by Defendant Cesar Valdez Carrera. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (lh) (Entered: 09/23/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Receipt of acknowledgment letter from San Bernardino County Superior Court, Fontana, CA 92335. Case No. UDFS1904396. (bm) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) TRANSMITTAL of documents to San Bernardino County Superior Court. A certified copy of the order of remand and a copy of the docket sheet from this court was sent to San Bernardino County Superior Court, Fontana, CA 92335. (bm) (Entered: 10/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER REMANDING CASE TO STATE COURT by Judge Virginia A. Phillips: IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that this matter be, and hereby is, REMANDED to the Superior Court of California listed above, for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Case Terminated. Made JS-6 (bm) (Entered: 10/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER by Judge Virginia A. Phillips Denying #3 REQUEST to Proceed in Forma Pauperis: IT WAS RECOMMENDED that the Request to Proceed In Forma Pauperis be DENIED by Magistrate Judge Kenly Kiya Kato. Reason: District Court lacks jurisdiction. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that: This case is hereby REMANDED to state court. (bm) (Entered: 10/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh) (Entered: 09/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Virginia A. Phillips and Magistrate Judge Kenly Kiya Kato. (lh) (Entered: 09/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support filed by Defendant Cesar Valdez Carrera. (lh) (Entered: 09/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Cesar Valdez Carrera. (lh) (Entered: 09/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of California, County of San Bernardino, Fontana District case number UDFS19004396 with NO copy of summons and CONFORMED FILED copy of complaint. Case assigned to Judge Virginia A. Phillips, Discovery to Magistrate Judge Kenly Kiya Kato. Filed by Defendant Cesar Valdez Carrera. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (lh) (Entered: 09/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HAGER PACIFIC PROPERTIES is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Richard Geoffrey Daggenhurst