This case was last updated from PACER on 07/12/2020 at 17:09:05 (UTC).

Hagen et al v. Last Chance Funding, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 08/19/2019 Hagen filed an Other lawsuit against Last Chance Funding, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Dana M. Sabraw and Michael S. Berg. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-01559

  • Filing Date:

    08/19/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Dana M. Sabraw

Referral Judge

Michael S. Berg

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Carrie E. Sorrento

Carrie Hagen

Euromotorwerks, LLC

Richard John Hagen

Carrie Sorento-Hagen

Euromotorwerks, LLC doing business as Euro Motorwerks

Defendants

Robert L. Rentto, Esq.

Does 1 through 200

Last Chance Funding, Inc.

Adam J. Feldman

David A. Rentto

Rentto & Rentto PLC

Mitchelly Levy

Andrew Parker

The Feldman Law Firm, P.C.

Yellowstone Capital West LLC

Vadim Serebro, Esq.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Michael A Alfred

Attorney at The Law Office of Michael A. Alfred

7220 Trade Street, Suite 104

San Diego, CA 92121

Defendant Attorneys

John P. Girarde

Attorney at Murphy Pearson Bradley & Feeney

88 Kearny Street, 10Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94108

Edwin Mendelson Boniske

Attorney at Higgs Fletcher & Mack, LLP

401 West A Street, Suite 2600

San Diego, CA 92101

Alexis Gutierrez

Attorney at Higgs, Fletcher and Mack, LLP

401 West A Street, Suite 2600

San Diego, CA 92101

Sharon Oh-Kubisch

Attorney at Smiley Wang-Ekvall, LLP

3200 Park Center Drive, Suite 250

Costa Mesa, CA 92626

Timothy William Evanston

Attorney at Smiley Wang-Ekvall, LLP

3200 Park Center Drive, Suite 250

Costa Mesa, CA 92626

 

Court Documents

#47

(#47) ORDER Granting #46 Joint Motion to Dismiss Action with Prejudice. The Court GRANTS the joint motion and DISMISSES the action, including all claims asserted by Plaintiffs RICHARD JOHN HAGEN; EUROMOTORWERKS, LLC dba EURO MOTORWERKS; CARRIE E. SORRENTO aka CARRIE SORRENTO-HAGEN aka CARRIE HAGEN in their First Amended Complaint, WITH PREJUDICE. Each party is to bear their own attorneys' fees and costs of suit. The Clerk is instructed to terminate the action. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 10/2/2019. (aef) (sjt). (Entered: 10/02/2019)

46 #1

Proof of Service

#46

(#46) Joint MOTION to Dismiss Action with Prejudice by Plaintiffs Richard J. Hagen; Euromotorwerks, LLC; and Carrie Hagen and by Adam J. Feldman, Last Chance Funding, Inc., Andrew Parker, David A. Rentto, Rentto & Rentto PLC, Robert L. Rentto, Esq., The Feldman Law Firm, P.C., Vadim Serebro, Esq., Yellowstone Capital West LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Oh-Kubisch, Sharon) (aef). (Entered: 10/02/2019)

#45

(#45) Order Confirming Settlement and Setting Deadline to File Joint Motion to Dismiss. The parties are ordered to file their Joint Motion to Dismiss this case, signed by counsel of record and any unrepresented parties, no later than October 11, 2019. The Settlement Disposition Conference will be held on October 17, 2019, at 1:30 p.m. in Courtroom 2C with Magistrate Judge Berg. If the parties file their Joint Motion to Dismiss on or before October 11, 2019, the Settlement Disposition Conference will be VACATED without further court order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael S. Berg on 9/26/2019.(aef) (Entered: 09/27/2019)

43 #4

Affidavit Affidavid of David A. Rennto iso Mtn to Dismiss First Amended Cplt Pur

43 #3

Affidavit Affidavid of Robert L. Rennto iso Mtn to Dismiss First Amended Cplt Pu

43 #2

Proof of Service Certificate of Service

43 #1

Request for Judicial Notice Defs David A. Rennto, Robert Rennto and Rento&Rento

#43

(#43) MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by David A. Rentto, Rentto & Rentto PLC, Robert L. Rentto, Esq.. (Attachments: #1 Request for Judicial Notice Defs David A. Rennto, Robert Rennto and Rento&Rento PLCs RFJN ISO Mtn to Dismiss First Amended Cplt Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6), #2 Proof of Service Certificate of Service, #3 Affidavit Affidavid of Robert L. Rennto iso Mtn to Dismiss First Amended Cplt Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(1) For Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction and FRCP 12(B)(6) for Failure to State a Claim Upon Which Relief Can Be Grant, #4 Affidavit Affidavid of David A. Rennto iso Mtn to Dismiss First Amended Cplt Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6))(Girarde, John)Attorney John P. Girarde added to party David A. Rentto (pty:dft), Attorney John P. Girarde added to party Rentto & Rentto PLC(pty:dft), Attorney John P. Girarde added to party Robert L. Rentto, Esq.(pty:dft) (aef). (Entered: 09/25/2019)

3 #2

Declaration Supporting Declaration

3 #1

Memo of Points and Authorities Memo of Points and Authorities

#3

(#9) ORDER Denying #3 Plaintiffs' Ex Parte Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. Plaintiffs' motion for a TRO is DENIED without prejudice. To the extent Plaintiffs wish to proceed with a motion for preliminary injunction, the Court sets that matter for hearing on September 20, 2019, at 1:30 p.m. Any supplemental briefs on this issue shall be submitted in accordance with the Civil Local Rules of this Court. Counsel shall contact the chambers of Magistrate Judge Michael S. Berg to schedule an Early Neutral Evaluation conference at the earliest opportunity before the September 20, 2019 hearing. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 8/23/2019. (aef) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

#2

(#2) Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (als) (Entered: 08/19/2019)

1 #4

Exhibits I - R

1 #3

Exhibits E - H

1 #2

Exhibits A - D

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Does 1 through 200, Adam J. Feldman, Last Chance Funding, Inc., Mitchelly Levy, Andrew Parker, David A. Rentto, Rentto & Rentto PLC, Robert L. Rentto, Esq., The Feldman Law Firm, P.C. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0974-12845287.), filed by Carrie E. Sorrento, Euromotorwerks, LLC, Richard John Hagen. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibits A - D, #3 Exhibits E - H, #4 Exhibits I - R)The new case number is 3:19-cv-01559-DMS-MSB. Judge Dana M. Sabraw and Magistrate Judge Michael S. Berg are assigned to the case. (Alfred, Michael)(als) (sjt). (Entered: 08/19/2019)

79 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#47) ORDER Granting #46 Joint Motion to Dismiss Action with Prejudice. The Court GRANTS the joint motion and DISMISSES the action, including all claims asserted by Plaintiffs RICHARD JOHN HAGEN; EUROMOTORWERKS, LLC dba EURO MOTORWERKS; CARRIE E. SORRENTO aka CARRIE SORRENTO-HAGEN aka CARRIE HAGEN in their First Amended Complaint, WITH PREJUDICE. Each party is to bear their own attorneys' fees and costs of suit. The Clerk is instructed to terminate the action. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 10/2/2019. (aef) (sjt). (Entered: 10/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#46) Joint MOTION to Dismiss Action with Prejudice by Plaintiffs Richard J. Hagen; Euromotorwerks, LLC; and Carrie Hagen and by Adam J. Feldman, Last Chance Funding, Inc., Andrew Parker, David A. Rentto, Rentto & Rentto PLC, Robert L. Rentto, Esq., The Feldman Law Firm, P.C., Vadim Serebro, Esq., Yellowstone Capital West LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Oh-Kubisch, Sharon) (aef). (Entered: 10/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#45) Order Confirming Settlement and Setting Deadline to File Joint Motion to Dismiss. The parties are ordered to file their Joint Motion to Dismiss this case, signed by counsel of record and any unrepresented parties, no later than October 11, 2019. The Settlement Disposition Conference will be held on October 17, 2019, at 1:30 p.m. in Courtroom 2C with Magistrate Judge Berg. If the parties file their Joint Motion to Dismiss on or before October 11, 2019, the Settlement Disposition Conference will be VACATED without further court order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael S. Berg on 9/26/2019.(aef) (Entered: 09/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • (#44) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael S. Berg: Early Neutral Evaluation Conference was held on 9/26/2019. The case settled. Order to follow. (Plaintiff Attorney Michael A. Alfred). (Defendant Attorneys Edwin M. Boniske; Timothy W. Evanston; Sharon Oh-Kubisch; Kavin D. Cardona). (no document attached) (dxm) (Entered: 09/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#43) MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by David A. Rentto, Rentto & Rentto PLC, Robert L. Rentto, Esq.. (Attachments: #1 Request for Judicial Notice Defs David A. Rennto, Robert Rennto and Rento&Rento PLCs RFJN ISO Mtn to Dismiss First Amended Cplt Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6), #2 Proof of Service Certificate of Service, #3 Affidavit Affidavid of Robert L. Rennto iso Mtn to Dismiss First Amended Cplt Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(1) For Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction and FRCP 12(B)(6) for Failure to State a Claim Upon Which Relief Can Be Grant, #4 Affidavit Affidavid of David A. Rennto iso Mtn to Dismiss First Amended Cplt Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6))(Girarde, John)Attorney John P. Girarde added to party David A. Rentto (pty:dft), Attorney John P. Girarde added to party Rentto & Rentto PLC(pty:dft), Attorney John P. Girarde added to party Robert L. Rentto, Esq.(pty:dft) (aef). (Entered: 09/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#42) ORDER Granting #40 Joint Motion for Telephonic Appearance at the September 26, 2019 Early Neutral Evaluation Conference. Party representatives of Defendants Last Chance Funding, Inc., the Feldman Law Firm, P.C., West Coast Business Capital, LLC, f/k/a Yellowstone Capital West, LLC, and individual Defendants Andrew Parker, Adam J. Feldman, and Vadim Serebro, are permitted to appear telephonically at the Early Neutral Evaluation Conference scheduled for September 26, 2019, at 9:00 a.m. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael S. Berg on 9/25/2019. (aef) (Entered: 09/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#41) ORDER Denying #12 Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Plaintiffs' motion for a preliminary injunction is DENIED without prejudice. After consulting with counsel, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants shall file responsive pleading by October 11, 2019. When counsel are ready to file their motion to dismiss, they shall contact the Court for a hearing date. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 9/25/2019. (aef) (Entered: 09/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#40) Joint MOTION Telephonic Appearance at ENE re #39 Notice and Order for Early Neutral Evaluation conference by Adam J. Feldman, Last Chance Funding, Inc., Andrew Parker, The Feldman Law Firm, P.C.. (Boniske, Edwin) (aef). (Entered: 09/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#39) NOTICE AND ORDER for Early Neutral Evaluation Conference. An Early Neutral Evaluation is set for 9/26/2019 at 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Michael S. Berg. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael S. Berg on 9/23/2019.(aef) (Entered: 09/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#38) Minute Order. for proceedings held before Judge Dana M. Sabraw: Motion Hearing held on 9/20/2019 re #12 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . Motion was denied without prejudice. Any 12(b) motions may be filed by 10/11/2019. Court to issue order. (Court Reporter/ECR Lee Ann Pence). (Plaintiff Attorney Michael Alfred).(Defendant Attorney Tim Evanston, Lei Lei Wang Ekvall, Edwin Boniske, telephonically-Kevin Cardona). (no document attached) (jak) (Entered: 09/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
27 More Docket Entries
  • 08/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants, filed by Carrie E. Sorrento, Euromotorwerks, LLC, Richard John Hagen. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Table of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit FAC Exhibits A - F, #3 Exhibit FAC Exhibits G - L, #4 Exhibit FAC Exhibits M - X)New Summons Requested. (Alfred, Michael) (aef). (Entered: 08/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER Denying #3 Plaintiffs' Ex Parte Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. Plaintiffs' motion for a TRO is DENIED without prejudice. To the extent Plaintiffs wish to proceed with a motion for preliminary injunction, the Court sets that matter for hearing on September 20, 2019, at 1:30 p.m. Any supplemental briefs on this issue shall be submitted in accordance with the Civil Local Rules of this Court. Counsel shall contact the chambers of Magistrate Judge Michael S. Berg to schedule an Early Neutral Evaluation conference at the earliest opportunity before the September 20, 2019 hearing. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 8/23/2019. (aef) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Carrie E. Sorrento, Euromotorwerks, LLC, Richard John Hagen. Robert L. Rentto, Esq. served. (Alfred, Michael) (aef). (Entered: 08/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Carrie E. Sorrento, Euromotorwerks, LLC, Richard John Hagen. Rentto & Rentto PLC served. (Alfred, Michael) (aef). (Entered: 08/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Carrie E. Sorrento, Euromotorwerks, LLC, Richard John Hagen. Last Chance Funding, Inc. served. (Alfred, Michael) (aef). (Entered: 08/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Carrie E. Sorrento, Euromotorwerks, LLC, Richard John Hagen. David A. Rentto served. (Alfred, Michael) (aef). (Entered: 08/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF DOCUMENT by Euromotorwerks, LLC, Richard John Hagen, Carrie E. Sorrento re #3 Ex Parte MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Carrie E. Sorrento, Richard John Hagen, Euromotorwerks, LLC . (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration Supporting Declaration)(Alfred, Michael) Modified on 8/22/2019 QC mailer sent re clarification of document; left voicemail w/attorney (aef). (Entered: 08/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Ex Parte MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Euromotorwerks, LLC, Richard John Hagen, Carrie E. Sorrento. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration Supporting Declaration)(Alfred, Michael) (aef). (Entered: 08/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (als) (Entered: 08/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Does 1 through 200, Adam J. Feldman, Last Chance Funding, Inc., Mitchelly Levy, Andrew Parker, David A. Rentto, Rentto & Rentto PLC, Robert L. Rentto, Esq., The Feldman Law Firm, P.C. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0974-12845287.), filed by Carrie E. Sorrento, Euromotorwerks, LLC, Richard John Hagen. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibits A - D, #3 Exhibits E - H, #4 Exhibits I - R)The new case number is 3:19-cv-01559-DMS-MSB. Judge Dana M. Sabraw and Magistrate Judge Michael S. Berg are assigned to the case. (Alfred, Michael)(als) (sjt). (Entered: 08/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LAST CHANCE FUNDING INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where FELDMAN LAW FIRM LLP is a litigant

Latest cases where YELLOWSTONE CAPITAL LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Edwin Mendelson Boniske