This case was last updated from PACER on 02/04/2020 at 07:26:04 (UTC).

Hageman v. Lorain City School District

Case Summary

On 12/06/2019 Hageman filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Lorain City School District. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Ohio Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Solomon Oliver, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-02839

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Ohio Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Solomon Oliver, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Nicole Hageman

Defendant

Lorain City School District

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Brian D. Spitz

Attorney at Spitz Law Firm

25200 Chagrin Blvd.

Beachwood, OH 44122

Daniel S. Dubow

Attorney at Spitz Law Firm

25200 Chagrin Blvd.

Beachwood, OH 44122

Defendant Attorney

Giselle S. Spencer

Attorney at Ennis Britton

6000 Lombardo Center

Independence, OH 44131

 

Court Documents

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

2 #1

Magistrate Consent Form

1 #1

Exhibit Right to Sue

#2

(#2) Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to counsel for service upon Lorain City School District. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form) (L,MI) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

#3

(#3) Notice of Appearance filed by All Defendants. (Spencer, Giselle) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

#4

(#4) Motion to stay proceedings filed by Plaintiff Nicole Hageman. (Dubow, Daniel) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

#5

(#5) Return of Service by Clerk by certified mail executed upon Lorain City School District on 12/16/2019, no delivery date on green card, date obtained from U.S. Postal Service website, filed on behalf of Nicole Hageman Related document(s) #2 . (S,AN) (Entered: 12/17/2019)

#1

(#1) Complaint for Damages and Reinstatement with jury demand against All Defendants. Filing fee paid $ 400, Receipt number 0647-9665030. Filed by Nicole Hageman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Right to Sue, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons) (Dubow, Daniel) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

1 #3

Summons Summons

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/03/2020
  • DocketLAST NOTICE: Prepare now and avoid delays logging in later. The U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Ohio [OHND] will be upgrading CM/ECF to the Next Generation of CM/ECF [NextGen] on February 10, 2020. In order to complete our final transition to NextGen, CM/ECF will be offline starting at 12:00 noon on Friday, February 7, 2020, through 11:59 p.m. Sunday, February 9, 2020. Pursuant to General Order 2020-02, we have established an email box, nextgenfilings@ohnd.uscourts.gov, for submitting documents to be filed during this period.Preparing for NextGen is a two-step process. Step one was to obtain or upgrade your PACER account. Each attorney should have their own individual upgraded PACER account at this time. Step two will be to link your upgraded PACER account to your OHND e-filing account in the NextGen CM/ECF system on or after February 10, 2020. # Linking Instructions. You will be unable to e-file until the accounts are linked. If you have any additional questions, please call the Clerk's Office Help Desk at 1-800-355-8498. (SL) (ADI) (Entered: 02/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • DocketIMPORTANT: Prepare now and avoid delays logging in later. The U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Ohio [OHND] will be upgrading CM/ECF to the Next Generation of CM/ECF [NextGen] on February 10, 2020. Information regarding NextGen can be found # on the court's website.Preparing for NextGen CM/ECF is a multi-step process. Step one is to obtain or upgrade your PACER account. Currently, attorneys within a firm may share a PACER account. This will not be allowed with NextGen. Each attorney must have their own upgraded PACER account. If you are using a shared PACER account, register for a new PACER account by clicking # here.If you have an upgraded PACER account for another NextGen court or your PACER account was created after August 10, 2014, no further action is required at this time. If neither applies, you must upgrade your legacy PACER account. If this is not done, you will be unable to e-file after February 10, 2020. Instructions for linking your PACER account to your CM/ECF account will be sent in February. If you still have questions, please contact the PACER Service Center at 800-676-6854 or the Clerk's Office Help Desk at 1-800-355-8498. (SL) (ADI) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder [non-document] granting in part Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion to stay for a period of 60 days. If the parties wish to extend the period, they must file a motion before the expiration of that time (Related Doc #4 ). Approved by Judge Solomon Oliver, Jr. on 1/6/2020.(R,Sh) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Return of Service by Clerk by certified mail executed upon Lorain City School District on 12/16/2019, no delivery date on green card, date obtained from U.S. Postal Service website, filed on behalf of Nicole Hageman Related document(s) #2 . (S,AN) (Entered: 12/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Motion to stay proceedings filed by Plaintiff Nicole Hageman. (Dubow, Daniel) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • DocketService by Clerk. Summons and Complaint addressed to Lorain City School District placed in U.S. Mail. Type of service: certified mail. Receipt # 7019 0700 0002 0328 5365. (S,AN) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Notice of Appearance filed by All Defendants. (Spencer, Giselle) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to counsel for service upon Lorain City School District. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form) (L,MI) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketRandom Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Jonathan D. Greenberg. (L,MI) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketJudge Solomon Oliver, Jr assigned to case. (L,MI) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Complaint for Damages and Reinstatement with jury demand against All Defendants. Filing fee paid $ 400, Receipt number 0647-9665030. Filed by Nicole Hageman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Right to Sue, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons) (Dubow, Daniel) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.