This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/31/2021 at 10:16:19 (UTC).

Hafeman v. LG Electronics Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 07/02/2021 Hafeman filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against LG Electronics Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Alan D Albright. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:21-CV-00696

  • Filing Date:

    07/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Alan D Albright

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Carolyn W. Hafeman

Defendants

LG Electronics Inc.

LG Electronics MobileComm U.S.A., Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Thomas V. DelRosario

Attorney at Susman Godfrey LLP

1000 Louisiana St Ste 5100

Houston, TX 77002

Max L. Tribble, Jr.

Attorney at Susman Godfrey L.L.P.

1000 Louisiana, Suite 5100

Houston, TX 77002-5096

Kalpana Srinivasan

Attorney at Susman Godfrey LLP

1900 Avenue Of The Stars, Suite 1400

Los Angeles, CA 90067-6029

Krisina J. Zuniga

Attorney at Susman Godfrey, LLP

1000 Louisiana St., Suite 5100

Houston, TX 77002

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Exhibit A

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

8 #1

Proposed Order

#9

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/24/2021
  • DocketSet/Reset Deadlines: LG Electronics Inc. answer due 10/27/2021; LG Electronics MobileComm U.S.A., Inc. answer due 10/27/2021. (jc5) (Entered: 08/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Waiver of Service and Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by Carolyn W. Hafeman (Tribble, Max) (Entered: 08/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Unopposed MOTION to Substitute Party by Carolyn W. Hafeman. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Tribble, Max) (Entered: 08/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS was Executed by Carolyn W. Hafeman. LG Electronics MobileComm U.S.A., Inc. served on 7/8/2021, answer due 7/29/2021. (bw) (Entered: 07/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Carolyn W. Hafeman of Summons, Complaint and initial documents on LG Electronics MobileComm USA, Inc. (Tribble, Max) (Entered: 07/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge Alan D Albright. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (lad) (Entered: 07/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summons Issued as to LG Electronics MobileComm U.S.A., Inc.. (lad) (Entered: 07/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to LG Electronics Inc.. (lad) (Entered: 07/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Tribble, Max) (Entered: 07/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Carolyn W. Hafeman. for LG Electronics MobileComm U.S.A., Inc. (Tribble, Max) (Main Document 3 replaced on 7/2/2021) (lad). (Entered: 07/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Carolyn W. Hafeman. for LG Electronics (Tribble, Max) (Entered: 07/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • DocketAll parties shall comply with the Standing Orders located at https://www.txwd.uscourts.gov/judges-information/standing-orders/. (lad) (Entered: 07/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0542-14975900). No Summons requested at this time, filed by Carolyn W. Hafeman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Tribble, Max) (Entered: 07/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LG Electronics Mobilecomm U.S.A., Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where LG ELECTRONICS U.S.A., INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Krisina J. Zuniga

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Max Lalon Tribble, Jr