This case was last updated from PACER on 02/03/2020 at 07:14:45 (UTC).

Mariam Hadidi v. Ariana Radio and Television Network et al

Case Summary

On 12/05/2019 Mariam Hadidi filed a Property - Personal Property Fraud lawsuit against Ariana Radio and Television Network. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Charles F. Eick and Dolly M. Gee. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-10329

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Personal Property Fraud

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Charles F. Eick

Presiding Judge

Dolly M. Gee

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Mariam Hadidi

Defendants

Ariana Television Network

Does 1-10, inclusive

Ariana Radio and Television Network

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Majid Safaie

Attorney at Arya Law Center PC

3187 Red Hill Avenue Suite 110

Costa Mesa, CA 92626

Brian T Stuart

Attorney at Arya Law Center PC

3187 Red Hill Avenue Suite 110

Costa Mesa, CA 92626

Defendant Attorneys

Nicholas Brian Melzer

Attorney at Holland and Knight LLP

400 South Hope Street 8Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Stacey Hsiang Chun Wang

Attorney at Holland and Knight LLP

400 South Hope Street 8Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071-2040

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Ariana Television Network, re Declaration #2 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #4 , Declaration #3 , Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #5 served on 12/5/2019. (Melzer, Nicholas) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

#8

(#8) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

1 #4

Notice of Case Assignment

#3

(#3) DECLARATION of Khushal Asefi re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant Ariana Television Network. (Melzer, Nicholas) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

#2

(#2) DECLARATION of NICHOLAS B. MELZER re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant Ariana Television Network. (Melzer, Nicholas) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

1 #2

Summons

#9

(#9) INITIAL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dolly M. Gee. (kti) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

#10

(#10) STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Ariana Radio and Television Network answer now due 1/10/2020, re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Specially-Appearing Defendant Ariana Radio and Television Network.(Melzer, Nicholas) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

1 #3

Civil Case Cover Sheet

1 #1

Complaint

1 #5

ADR Information Package

#11

(#11) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiff Mariam Hadidi. Dismissal is with prejudice. (Safaie, Majid) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles County Superior Court, case number 19VECV01488 Receipt No: 0973-24903047 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant Ariana Television Network. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Summons, #3 Civil Case Cover Sheet, #4 Notice of Case Assignment, #5 ADR Information Package) (Attorney Nicholas Brian Melzer added to party Ariana Television Network(pty:dft))(Melzer, Nicholas) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

#7

(#7) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dolly M. Gee and Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick. (lh) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

#4

(#4) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Ariana Television Network. (Melzer, Nicholas) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Ariana Television Network, (Melzer, Nicholas) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiff Mariam Hadidi. Dismissal is with prejudice. (Safaie, Majid) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Ariana Radio and Television Network answer now due 1/10/2020, re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Specially-Appearing Defendant Ariana Radio and Television Network.(Melzer, Nicholas) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) INITIAL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dolly M. Gee. (kti) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dolly M. Gee and Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick. (lh) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Ariana Radio and Television Network, Does 1-10. Jury Demanded, filed by Plaintiff Mariam Hadidi. (FILED IN LOS ANGELES COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 10/15/2019 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ) (lh) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Ariana Television Network, re Declaration #2 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #4 , Declaration #3 , Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #5 served on 12/5/2019. (Melzer, Nicholas) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Ariana Television Network, (Melzer, Nicholas) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Ariana Television Network. (Melzer, Nicholas) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) DECLARATION of Khushal Asefi re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant Ariana Television Network. (Melzer, Nicholas) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) DECLARATION of NICHOLAS B. MELZER re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant Ariana Television Network. (Melzer, Nicholas) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles County Superior Court, case number 19VECV01488 Receipt No: 0973-24903047 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant Ariana Television Network. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Summons, #3 Civil Case Cover Sheet, #4 Notice of Case Assignment, #5 ADR Information Package) (Attorney Nicholas Brian Melzer added to party Ariana Television Network(pty:dft))(Melzer, Nicholas) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.