This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/23/2019 at 07:52:51 (UTC).

HADDOCK v. CITY OF INDIANAPOLIS et al

Case Summary

On 05/24/2019 HADDOCK filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against CITY OF INDIANAPOLIS. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Indiana Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are James R. Sweeney II and Mark J. Dinsmore. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-02078

  • Filing Date:

    05/24/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Courthouse:

    Indiana Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

James R. Sweeney II

Referral Judge

Mark J. Dinsmore

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Gary Haddock

Defendants

Paul W Bellows

Robert P. Ferguson

Michael B Wagner-Gilbert

CITY OF INDIANAPOLIS

Craig S Wagoner

Jonathon Phelps

PAUL W. BELLOWS

CRAIG S. WAGONER

MICHAEL B. WAGNER-GILBERT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Robert D. King, Jr.

Attorney at LAW OFFICE OF ROBERT D. KING, JR, P.C.

22 E. Washington Street, Suite 310

Indianapolis, IN 46204

David Ray Thompson

Attorney at LAW OFFICE OF ROBERT D. KING, JR., P.C.

22 E. Washington Street, Suite 310

Indianapolis, IN 46204

Defendant Attorneys

Andrew Scheil

Attorney at OFFICE OF CORPORATION COUNSEL

200 E. Washington Street, Suite 1601

Indianapolis, IN 46204

John F. Kautzman

Attorney at RUCKELSHAUS KAUTZMAN BLACKWELL BEMIS, LLP

135 N. Pennsylvania Street, Suite 1600

Indianapolis, IN 46204

Andrew R. Duncan

Attorney at RUCKELSHAUS KAUTZMAN BLACKWELL BEMIS, LLP

135 N. Pennsylvania Street, Suite 1600

Indianapolis, IN 46204

Edward J. Merchant

Attorney at RUCKELSHAUS KAUTZMAN BLACKWELL BEMIS, LLP

135 N. Pennsylvania Street, Suite 1600

Indianapolis, IN 46204

 

Court Documents

#13

(#13) ORDER REGARDING PROTECTIVE ORDERS. See Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 7/22/2019.(SWM) (Entered: 07/22/2019)

#11

(#11) CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN TENDERED, filed by Plaintiff GARY HADDOCK and Defendants. (Thompson, David) (Entered: 07/16/2019)

#10

(#10) SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephonic Initial Pretrial Conference set for 7/22/2019 at 10:45 AM (Eastern Time) before Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore. Counsel shall attend the conference by calling the designated telephone number, to be provided by the Court via email generated by the Court's ECF system. The parties shall file a proposed Case Management Plan (CMP) on or before July 16, 2019 in the format set forth in the model CMP found on the Court's website (www.insd.uscourts.gov). Section III(A) through (E) of the proposed CMP shall include the following deadlines as set forth. *SEE ORDER FOR DEADLINES.* Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 7/9/2019. (GD) (Entered: 07/09/2019)

#9

(#9) ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) with Jury Demand , filed by PAUL W. BELLOWS, CITY OF INDIANAPOLIS, ROBERT P. FERGUSON, JONATHON PHELPS, MICHAEL B. WAGNER-GILBERT, CRAIG S. WAGONER.(Scheil, Andrew) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Edward J. Merchant on behalf of Defendants PAUL W. BELLOWS, ROBERT P. FERGUSON. (Merchant, Edward) (Entered: 06/24/2019)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew R. Duncan on behalf of Defendants PAUL W. BELLOWS, ROBERT P. FERGUSON. (Duncan, Andrew) (Entered: 06/24/2019)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by John F. Kautzman on behalf of Defendants PAUL W. BELLOWS, ROBERT P. FERGUSON. (Kautzman, John) (Entered: 06/24/2019)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time, filed by Defendants PAUL W. BELLOWS, CITY OF INDIANAPOLIS, ROBERT P. FERGUSON, JONATHON PHELPS, MICHAEL B. WAGNER-GILBERT, CRAIG S. WAGONER. (Scheil, Andrew) (Entered: 05/31/2019)

#4

(#4) PROCEDURES AND PRACTICES before Judge James R. Sweeney II. (JDC) (Entered: 05/29/2019)

#3

(#3) MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (DJH) (Entered: 05/28/2019)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Scheil on behalf of Defendants Paul W Bellows, CITY OF INDIANAPOLIS, Robert P. Ferguson, Jonathon Phelps, Michael B Wagner-Gilbert, Craig S Wagoner. (Scheil, Andrew) (Entered: 05/24/2019)

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

State Court Record Complaint

1 #1

State Court Record Docket Sheet, Appearance, Complaint, Summons to City of India

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Marion Superior Court, case number 49D111904CT016004, filed by All Defendants. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5446856) (Attachments: #1 State Court Record Docket Sheet, Appearance, Complaint, Summons to City of Indianapolis, Summons to City of Indianapolis, Summons to Craig S. Wagoner, Summons to Jonathon Phelps, Summons to Michael B. Wagner-Gilbert, Summons to Paul W. Bellows, Summons to Robert P. Ferguson, Demand for Jury Trial, Proof of Service, Affidavit, Notice of Automatic Enlargement of Time, Appearance, #2 State Court Record Complaint, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Scheil, Andrew) (Entered: 05/24/2019)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) ORDER REGARDING PROTECTIVE ORDERS. See Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 7/22/2019.(SWM) (Entered: 07/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN TENDERED, filed by Plaintiff GARY HADDOCK and Defendants. (Thompson, David) (Entered: 07/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephonic Initial Pretrial Conference set for 7/22/2019 at 10:45 AM (Eastern Time) before Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore. Counsel shall attend the conference by calling the designated telephone number, to be provided by the Court via email generated by the Court's ECF system. The parties shall file a proposed Case Management Plan (CMP) on or before July 16, 2019 in the format set forth in the model CMP found on the Court's website (www.insd.uscourts.gov). Section III(A) through (E) of the proposed CMP shall include the following deadlines as set forth. *SEE ORDER FOR DEADLINES.* Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 7/9/2019. (GD) (Entered: 07/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) with Jury Demand , filed by PAUL W. BELLOWS, CITY OF INDIANAPOLIS, ROBERT P. FERGUSON, JONATHON PHELPS, MICHAEL B. WAGNER-GILBERT, CRAIG S. WAGONER.(Scheil, Andrew) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Edward J. Merchant on behalf of Defendants PAUL W. BELLOWS, ROBERT P. FERGUSON. (Merchant, Edward) (Entered: 06/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew R. Duncan on behalf of Defendants PAUL W. BELLOWS, ROBERT P. FERGUSON. (Duncan, Andrew) (Entered: 06/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE of Appearance by John F. Kautzman on behalf of Defendants PAUL W. BELLOWS, ROBERT P. FERGUSON. (Kautzman, John) (Entered: 06/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time, filed by Defendants PAUL W. BELLOWS, CITY OF INDIANAPOLIS, ROBERT P. FERGUSON, JONATHON PHELPS, MICHAEL B. WAGNER-GILBERT, CRAIG S. WAGONER. (Scheil, Andrew) (Entered: 05/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) PROCEDURES AND PRACTICES before Judge James R. Sweeney II. (JDC) (Entered: 05/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (DJH) (Entered: 05/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Scheil on behalf of Defendants Paul W Bellows, CITY OF INDIANAPOLIS, Robert P. Ferguson, Jonathon Phelps, Michael B Wagner-Gilbert, Craig S Wagoner. (Scheil, Andrew) (Entered: 05/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Marion Superior Court, case number 49D111904CT016004, filed by All Defendants. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5446856) (Attachments: #1 State Court Record Docket Sheet, Appearance, Complaint, Summons to City of Indianapolis, Summons to City of Indianapolis, Summons to Craig S. Wagoner, Summons to Jonathon Phelps, Summons to Michael B. Wagner-Gilbert, Summons to Paul W. Bellows, Summons to Robert P. Ferguson, Demand for Jury Trial, Proof of Service, Affidavit, Notice of Automatic Enlargement of Time, Appearance, #2 State Court Record Complaint, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Scheil, Andrew) (Entered: 05/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer David Ray Thompson