This case was last updated from PACER on 01/31/2020 at 07:59:44 (UTC).

Tammy Haddad v. Allergan, Inc et al

Case Summary

On 12/02/2019 Tammy Haddad filed a Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability lawsuit against Allergan, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are John D. Early and Josephine L. Staton. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:19-CV-02321

  • Filing Date:

    12/02/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

John D. Early

Presiding Judge

Josephine L. Staton

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Tammy Haddad

Defendants

Allergan USA, Inc.

Allergan PLC

Allergan, Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Mark P Robinson, Jr

Attorney at Robinson Calcagnie Inc

19 Corporate Plaza Drive

Newport Beach, CA 92660

Jennifer A Lenze

Attorney at Lenze Lawyers PLC

1300 Highland Avenue Suite 207

Manhattan Beach, CA 90266

Lila Razmara

Attorney at Robinson Calcagnie Inc

19 Corporate Plaza Drive

Newport Beach, CA 92660

Amanda Deanne McGee

Attorney at Lenze Lawyers PLC

1300 Highland Avenue Suite 207

Manhattan Beach, CA 90266

Shannon Lukei

Attorney at Robinson Calcagnie Inc

19 Corporate Plaza Drive

Newport Beach, CA 92660

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-1) from the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, MDL 2321, transferring case to USDC, District of New Jersey at Newark and assigned to Honorable Brian R. Martinotti. Case transferred electronically. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated.) (bm) (Entered: 12/30/2019)

#8

(#8) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants Allergan PLC, Allergan USA, Inc., and Allergan, Inc. (jtil) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Plaintiff Tammy Haddad. Related Case(s): 8:19-cv-02064, 8:19-cv-02101, 8:19-cv-02103, 8:19-cv-02135 (Robinson, Mark) (Entered: 12/02/2019)

#7

(#7) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

#10

(#10) INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOSEPHINE L. STATON. (rrp) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

#12

(#12) TRANSMITTAL LETTER - MDL CASE TRANSFER OUT: A certified copy of the MDL 2921 Transfer Order with electronic docket sheet sent to USDC District of New Jersey at Newark on 12/30/19. (bm) (Entered: 12/30/2019)

#6

(#6) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge David O. Carter and Magistrate Judge John D. Early. (jtil) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Tammy Haddad, (Robinson, Mark) (Entered: 12/02/2019)

#3

(#3) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Tammy Haddad. (Robinson, Mark) (Entered: 12/02/2019)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-24876999 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Tammy Haddad. (Attorney Mark P Robinson, Jr added to party Tammy Haddad(pty:pla))(Robinson, Mark) (Entered: 12/02/2019)

#9

(#9) ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 19-03-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 8:19-cv-02064 JLS(JDEx). Case transferred from Judge David O. Carter to Judge Josephine L. Staton for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 8:19-cv-02321 JLS(JDEx). Signed by Judge Josephine L. Staton (rn) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Tammy Haddad. (Robinson, Mark) (Entered: 12/02/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) TRANSMITTAL LETTER - MDL CASE TRANSFER OUT: A certified copy of the MDL 2921 Transfer Order with electronic docket sheet sent to USDC District of New Jersey at Newark on 12/30/19. (bm) (Entered: 12/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-1) from the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, MDL 2321, transferring case to USDC, District of New Jersey at Newark and assigned to Honorable Brian R. Martinotti. Case transferred electronically. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated.) (bm) (Entered: 12/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOSEPHINE L. STATON. (rrp) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 19-03-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 8:19-cv-02064 JLS(JDEx). Case transferred from Judge David O. Carter to Judge Josephine L. Staton for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 8:19-cv-02321 JLS(JDEx). Signed by Judge Josephine L. Staton (rn) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants Allergan PLC, Allergan USA, Inc., and Allergan, Inc. (jtil) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge David O. Carter and Magistrate Judge John D. Early. (jtil) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Plaintiff Tammy Haddad. Related Case(s): 8:19-cv-02064, 8:19-cv-02101, 8:19-cv-02103, 8:19-cv-02135 (Robinson, Mark) (Entered: 12/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Tammy Haddad, (Robinson, Mark) (Entered: 12/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Tammy Haddad. (Robinson, Mark) (Entered: 12/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Tammy Haddad. (Robinson, Mark) (Entered: 12/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-24876999 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Tammy Haddad. (Attorney Mark P Robinson, Jr added to party Tammy Haddad(pty:pla))(Robinson, Mark) (Entered: 12/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.