2:23-CV-00958
02/17/2023
Pending - Other Pending
Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability
Brian R. Martinotti
Edward S. Kiel
MICHELE HACKWELDER
ALLERGAN INC.
ALLERGAN USA INC.
ALLERGAN BIOCELL TEXTURED BREAST IMPLANT PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION
JULIE BRAMAN KANE
NEAL ALLAN ROTH
(#1) COMPLAINT against ALLERGAN INC., ALLERGAN USA INC. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-14051853) with JURY DEMAND, filed by MICHELE HACKWELDER. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(FURST, RACHEL) (Entered: 02/17/2023)
Civil Cover Sheet
(#2) SUMMONS ISSUED as to ALLERGAN INC., ALLERGAN USA INC.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (gh, ) (Entered: 02/17/2023)
(#3) MOTION to Withdraw Rachel W. Furst as Attorney of Record by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(ROTH, NEAL) (Entered: 03/15/2023)
Text of Proposed Order
(#4) ORDER granting #3 Motion to Withdraw Rachel W. Furst as Attorney of Record. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel on 3/15/2023. (ld, ) (Entered: 03/16/2023)
(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by JULIE BRAMAN KANE on behalf of MICHELE HACKWELDER (KANE, JULIE) (Entered: 04/06/2023)
(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by JULIE BRAMAN KANE on behalf of MICHELE HACKWELDER (KANE, JULIE) (Entered: 04/06/2023)
Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by JULIE BRAMAN KANE on behalf of MICHELE HACKWELDER (KANE, JULIE) (Entered: 04/06/2023)
[-] Read LessDocket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by JULIE BRAMAN KANE on behalf of MICHELE HACKWELDER (KANE, JULIE) (Entered: 04/06/2023)
[-] Read LessDocket(#4) ORDER granting #3 Motion to Withdraw Rachel W. Furst as Attorney of Record. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel on 3/15/2023. (ld, ) (Entered: 03/16/2023)
[-] Read LessDocket(#3) MOTION to Withdraw Rachel W. Furst as Attorney of Record by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(ROTH, NEAL) (Entered: 03/15/2023)
[-] Read LessDocketMember Case Direct File on 2/17/23, for MDL 2921 ALLERGAN BIOCELL TEXTURED BREAST IMPLANT PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION (gh, ) (Entered: 02/17/2023)
[-] Read LessDocket(#2) SUMMONS ISSUED as to ALLERGAN INC., ALLERGAN USA INC.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (gh, ) (Entered: 02/17/2023)
[-] Read LessDocketJudge Brian R. Martinotti and Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel added. (gh, ) (Entered: 02/17/2023)
[-] Read LessDocket(#1) COMPLAINT against ALLERGAN INC., ALLERGAN USA INC. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-14051853) with JURY DEMAND, filed by MICHELE HACKWELDER. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(FURST, RACHEL) (Entered: 02/17/2023)
[-] Read Less