This case was last updated from PACER on 03/06/2020 at 07:38:38 (UTC).

Habib v. 3M Company et al

Case Summary

On 01/06/2020 Habib filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against 3M Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Minnesota District. The Judges overseeing this case are John R. Tunheim and Katherine M. Menendez. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    0:20-CV-00063

  • Filing Date:

    01/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Minnesota District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John R. Tunheim

Referral Judge

Katherine M. Menendez

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Joshua Habib

Defendants

Aearo Technologies LLC

3M Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Casey D Marshall

Attorney at Bassford Remele, PA

100 South 5Th Street, Suite 1500

Minneapolis, MN 55402-1254

Aram V. Desteian

Attorney at Bassford Remele

100 South 5Th St., Suite 1500

Minneapolis, MN 55402

Lewis A Remele, Jr

Attorney at Bassford Remele

100 South 5Th Street, Ste 1500

Minneapolis, MN 55402

Defendant Attorneys

Faris Rashid

Attorney at Greene Espel PLLP

222 S. Ninth Street, Suite 2200

Minneapolis, MN 55402

Benjamin W Hulse

Attorney at Blackwell Burke PA

431 S 7Th St Ste 2500

Mpls, MN 55415

Jerry W Blackwell

Attorney at Blackwell Burke PA

431 S 7Th St Ste 2500

Mpls, MN 55415

S Jamal Faleel

Attorney at Blackwell Burke PA

431 S 7Th St Ste 2500

Mpls, MN 55415

 

Court Documents

#2

(#2) RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Defendant 3M Company. (Hulse, Benjamin) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

#7

(#7) NOTICE by Aearo Technologies LLC re #1 Notice of Removal, CONSENT TO REMOVAL (Rashid, Faris) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

#9

(#9) CERTIFIED COPY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-49) transferring case to the Northern District of Florida per the MDL Panel for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings. Case assigned to Judge M. Casey Rodgers. (kt) (Entered: 01/23/2020)

1 #1

Summons and Complaint

#3

(#3) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by 3M Company re #1 Notice of Removal, #2 Rule 7.1 - Disclosure Statement (Hulse, Benjamin) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

#8

(#8) RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Aearo LLC is a corporate parent of Defendant Aearo Technologies LLC. 3M Company is a publicly-held corporation owning 10 percent or more of stock of Defendant Aearo Technologies LLC. (Rashid, Faris) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Hennepin County, case number N/A (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-7378629) filed by 3M Company. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Summons and Complaint, #2 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Hulse, Benjamin) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/23/2020
  • DocketNOTICE: The case has been transferred/extracted to the Northern District of Florida. (kt) (Entered: 01/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) CERTIFIED COPY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-49) transferring case to the Northern District of Florida per the MDL Panel for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings. Case assigned to Judge M. Casey Rodgers. (kt) (Entered: 01/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Aearo LLC is a corporate parent of Defendant Aearo Technologies LLC. 3M Company is a publicly-held corporation owning 10 percent or more of stock of Defendant Aearo Technologies LLC. (Rashid, Faris) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE by Aearo Technologies LLC re #1 Notice of Removal, CONSENT TO REMOVAL (Rashid, Faris) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • Docket(#6) TEXT ONLY ENTRY: Pursuant to Chief Judge John R. Tunheim, all EARPLUG cases are directly assigned via the MDL List to Chief Judge John R.Tunheim and Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez. NOTE: the new case number is 20-cv-63 (JRT/KMM). Please use this case number for all subsequent pleadings. (lmb) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • Docket(#5) TEXT ONLY ENTRY: Notice re: Non-Admitted AttorneyWe have received documents listing Mikal C. Watts, Francisco Guerra IV, Erin Rogiers as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c) or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e).For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at #href=http://www.mnd.uscourts.gov/FORMS/court_forms.shtml#attorneyforms#. (CLK) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • Docket(#4) TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Chief Judge John R. Tunheim per Civil (3rd, 4th - Master) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer. Please use case number 20-cv-63 JRT/HB. (CLK) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by 3M Company re #1 Notice of Removal, #2 Rule 7.1 - Disclosure Statement (Hulse, Benjamin) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Defendant 3M Company. (Hulse, Benjamin) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Hennepin County, case number N/A (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-7378629) filed by 3M Company. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Summons and Complaint, #2 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Hulse, Benjamin) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less