This case was last updated from PACER on 04/26/2019 at 07:38:50 (UTC).

Haber et al v. Bankers Standard Insurance Co

Case Summary

On 02/25/2019 Haber filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Bankers Standard Insurance Co. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Connecticut District. The Judge overseeing this case is Vanessa L. Bryant. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-00276

  • Filing Date:

    02/25/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Vanessa L. Bryant

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Counter Defendants

Haber, Murray as Trustee for Murray Haber Revocable Trust

Washington Depot, CT 06794

Murray Haber

Washington Depot, CT 06794

Susan Haber

Defendant and Counter Claimant

Bankers Standard Insurance Co

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorney

Leonard Merrill Isaac

Attorney at Isaac Law Offices - Farm.

270 Farmington Avenue, Suite 345

Farmington, CT 06032

Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorneys

Joshua Laurence Milrad

Attorney at Goldberg Segalla LLP - CT

100 Pearl Street, Suite 1100

Hartford, CT 06103

Andrew L Baldwin

Attorney at Goldberg Segalla LLP - CT

100 Pearl Street, Suite 1100

Hartford, CT 06103

 

Court Documents

#18

(#18) MOTION to Set Aside Default by Murray Haber, Murray Haber(Trustee for Murray Haber Revocable Trust), Susan Haber. (Isaac, Leonard) (Entered: 04/17/2019)

#17

(#17) NOTICE of Appearance by Leonard Merrill Isaac on behalf of Murray Haber, Murray Haber(Trustee for Murray Haber Revocable Trust), Susan Haber (Isaac, Leonard) (Entered: 04/16/2019)

#15

(#15) NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew L Baldwin on behalf of Bankers Standard Insurance Co (Baldwin, Andrew) (Entered: 04/08/2019)

#14

(#14) Amended NOTICE by Bankers Standard Insurance Co re #2 Notice (Other) (Milrad, Joshua) (Entered: 04/08/2019)

#13

(#13) MOTION for Default Entry 55(a) as to Murray Haber, Susan Haber and The Murray Haber Revocable Trust by Bankers Standard Insurance Co. (Baldwin, Andrew) (Entered: 04/07/2019)

#12

(#12) ORDER RE: Judge's Chambers Practices. Counsel are directed to read and comply with the Chambers Practices and Standing Orders prior to filing any document. So ordered. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 03/05/2019. (Shafer, J.) (Entered: 03/05/2019)

#11

(#11) ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 03/05/2019. (Shafer, J.) (Entered: 03/05/2019)

9 #1

Exhibit A

#9

(#9) ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) , COUNTERCLAIM against Murray Haber, Murray Haber(Trustee for Murray Haber Revocable Trust), Susan Haber by Bankers Standard Insurance Co. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Baldwin, Andrew) (Entered: 03/04/2019)

#8

(#8) NOTICE by Bankers Standard Insurance Co Compliance with Standing Orders in Removed Cases (Milrad, Joshua) (Entered: 02/26/2019)

#7

(#7) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Bankers Standard Insurance Co. (Milrad, Joshua) (Entered: 02/26/2019)

6 #1

Removal Standing Order

#6

(#6) NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #5 Standing Protective Order, #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Bankers Standard Insurance Co, #4 Electronic Filing Order, #2 Notice (Other) filed by Bankers Standard Insurance Co, #3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines Signed by Clerk on 02/26/2019. (Attachments: #1 Removal Standing Order)(Murphy, Tatihana) (Entered: 02/26/2019)

#4

(#4) ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 2/25/2019.(Murphy, Tatihana) (Entered: 02/26/2019)

#2

(#2) NOTICE by Bankers Standard Insurance Co No Pending Motions (Milrad, Joshua) (Entered: 02/25/2019)

1 #4

Exhibit

1 #3

Exhibit

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Bankers Standard Insurance Co from Connecticut Superior Court for the Judicial District of Hartford at Hartford, case number HHD-CV19-6106943-S. Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ACTDC-5171146, filed by Bankers Standard Insurance Co. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit)(Milrad, Joshua) (Entered: 02/25/2019)

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) MOTION to Set Aside Default by Murray Haber, Murray Haber(Trustee for Murray Haber Revocable Trust), Susan Haber. (Isaac, Leonard) (Entered: 04/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) NOTICE of Appearance by Leonard Merrill Isaac on behalf of Murray Haber, Murray Haber(Trustee for Murray Haber Revocable Trust), Susan Haber (Isaac, Leonard) (Entered: 04/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) ORDER granting #13 Motion for Default Entry pursuant to FRCP 55(a). A Motion for Default Judgment pursuant to FRCP 55(b) shall be filed by 5/16/2019 or this action will be dismissed by the Clerk pursuant to FRCP 41(a). Signed by Clerk on 4/16/2019. (Shafer, J.) (Entered: 04/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew L Baldwin on behalf of Bankers Standard Insurance Co (Baldwin, Andrew) (Entered: 04/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) Amended NOTICE by Bankers Standard Insurance Co re #2 Notice (Other) (Milrad, Joshua) (Entered: 04/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) MOTION for Default Entry 55(a) as to Murray Haber, Susan Haber and The Murray Haber Revocable Trust by Bankers Standard Insurance Co. (Baldwin, Andrew) (Entered: 04/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) ORDER RE: Judge's Chambers Practices. Counsel are directed to read and comply with the Chambers Practices and Standing Orders prior to filing any document. So ordered. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 03/05/2019. (Shafer, J.) (Entered: 03/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 03/05/2019. (Shafer, J.) (Entered: 03/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • (#10) ORDER OF TRANSFER. Case reassigned to Judge Vanessa L. Bryant for all further proceedings Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 3/5/19.(Johnson, D.) (Entered: 03/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) , COUNTERCLAIM against Murray Haber, Murray Haber(Trustee for Murray Haber Revocable Trust), Susan Haber by Bankers Standard Insurance Co. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Baldwin, Andrew) (Entered: 03/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE by Bankers Standard Insurance Co Compliance with Standing Orders in Removed Cases (Milrad, Joshua) (Entered: 02/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Bankers Standard Insurance Co. (Milrad, Joshua) (Entered: 02/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #5 Standing Protective Order, #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Bankers Standard Insurance Co, #4 Electronic Filing Order, #2 Notice (Other) filed by Bankers Standard Insurance Co, #3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines Signed by Clerk on 02/26/2019. (Attachments: #1 Removal Standing Order)(Murphy, Tatihana) (Entered: 02/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 02/25/2019.(Murphy, Tatihana) (Entered: 02/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 2/25/2019.(Murphy, Tatihana) (Entered: 02/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 4/26/2019. Discovery due by 8/27/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 10/1/2019. Signed by Clerk on 2/26/2019.(Murphy, Tatihana) (Entered: 02/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • Judge Michael P. Shea added. (Anastasio, F.) (Entered: 02/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE by Bankers Standard Insurance Co No Pending Motions (Milrad, Joshua) (Entered: 02/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Bankers Standard Insurance Co from Connecticut Superior Court for the Judicial District of Hartford at Hartford, case number HHD-CV19-6106943-S. Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ACTDC-5171146, filed by Bankers Standard Insurance Co. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit)(Milrad, Joshua) (Entered: 02/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BANKERS STANDARD INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Leonard Merrill Isaac