This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/21/2020 at 09:22:03 (UTC).

Haase v. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 09/22/2020 Haase filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against Experian Information Solutions, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Justin S. Anand and Amy Totenberg. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-03924

  • Filing Date:

    09/22/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Justin S. Anand

Presiding Judge

Amy Totenberg

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Sherri Lynn Haase

Defendants

Prosper Marketplace, Inc.

Experian Information Solutions, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Matthew Thomas Berry

Attorney at Berry & Associates, P.C.

Suite 600, 2751 Buford Highway

Atlanta, GA 30324

Joseph Lewis Erkenbrack

Attorney at Berry & Associates

2751 Buford Highway Ne, Ste 600

Atlanta, GA 30324

Defendant Attorney

Andrew Mark Ellis

Attorney at Jones Day-Atlanta

Suite 800, 1420 Peachtree St., N.E.

Atlanta, GA 30309-3053

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Experian Information Solutions, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Experian plc, Other Affiliate Opt-Out Services LLC, Other Affiliate Central Source LLC, Other Affiliate Online Data Exchange LLC, Other Affiliate New Management Services LLC, Other Affiliate VantageScore Solutions LLC for Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Ellis, Andrew) (Entered: 11/20/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ANSWER to #1 COMPLAINT by Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. Discovery ends on 4/19/2021.(Ellis, Andrew) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. (Entered: 11/20/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Sherri Lynn Haase. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. waiver mailed on 9/24/2020, answer due 11/23/2020. (Erkenbrack, Joseph) (Entered: 11/06/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) EIGHTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 09/28/2020. (ddm) (ADI) (Entered: 09/29/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Certificate of Interested Persons by Sherri Lynn Haase. (Erkenbrack, Joseph) (Entered: 09/23/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SEVENTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 9/1/20. (eop) (Entered: 09/22/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Sherri Lynn Haase. (Filing fee $400.00, receipt number AGANDC-10169752) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 09/22/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Prosper Marketplace, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Experian Information Solutions, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Andrew M Ollis(Designation Retained)