This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/22/2021 at 08:23:38 (UTC).

Haase v. Equifax Information Services LLC et al

Case Summary

On 09/23/2021 Haase filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against Equifax Information Services LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Charles A. Pannell, Jr and Alan J. Baverman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-03934

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Charles A. Pannell, Jr

Referral Judge

Alan J. Baverman

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Sherri Lynn Haase

Defendants

Equifax Information Services LLC

Prosper Marketplace, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Christopher Neil Armor

Attorney at Armor Law, LLC

P.O. Box 451328

Atlanta, GA 31145

Matthew Thomas Berry

Attorney at Berry & Associates, P.C.

Suite 6002751 Buford Highway

Atlanta, GA 30324

Defendant Attorney

Norman Charles Campbell, II

Attorney at Equifax, Inc.

1550 Peachtree Street, Nw

Atlanta, GA 30309

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) Certificate of Interested Persons by Sherri Lynn Haase. (Berry, Matthew) (Entered: 09/26/2021)

#3

(#3) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Sherri Lynn Haase. Equifax Information Services LLC waiver mailed on 9/27/2021, answer due 11/26/2021. (Berry, Matthew) (Entered: 09/29/2021)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal Prosper Marketplace, Inc., filed by Sherri Lynn Haase (Berry, Matthew) (Entered: 09/30/2021)

#5

(#5) First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Equifax Information Services LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Campbell, Norman) (Entered: 11/19/2021)

5 #1

Text of Proposed Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Equifax Information Services LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Campbell, Norman) (Entered: 11/19/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #4 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal with prejudice pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(A)(i). (tcc) (Entered: 09/30/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal Prosper Marketplace, Inc., filed by Sherri Lynn Haase (Berry, Matthew) (Entered: 09/30/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Sherri Lynn Haase. Equifax Information Services LLC waiver mailed on 9/27/2021, answer due 11/26/2021. (Berry, Matthew) (Entered: 09/29/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClerks Notation re #2 Certificate of Interested Persons--Reviewed and approved by Magistrate Judge Alan J. Baverman on 9/27/2021. (cp) (Entered: 09/27/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Certificate of Interested Persons by Sherri Lynn Haase. (Berry, Matthew) (Entered: 09/26/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Sherri Lynn Haase. (Filing fee $402.00, receipt number AGANDC-11280964) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 09/24/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Prosper Marketplace, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Equifax Information Services LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Norman Charles Campbell, II(Designation Retained)