This case was last updated from PACER on 03/06/2020 at 07:26:24 (UTC).

Haapala et al v. JUUL Labs Inc et al

Case Summary

On 01/06/2020 Haapala filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against JUUL Labs Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is William H. Orrick. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-00112

  • Filing Date:

    01/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

William H. Orrick

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ZH

Kim Haapala

Defendants

JUUL Labs Inc

Altria Group Inc.

Juul Labs Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Charles J Crueger

Attorney at Crueger Dickinson LLC

4532 N Oakland Ave

Whitefish Bay, WI 53211

Gregory F. Coleman

Attorney at Greg Coleman Law PC

800 S. Gay Street, Suite 1100

Knoxville, TN 37929

Erin K. Dickinson

Attorney at Crueger Dickinson LLC

4532 N. Oakland Ave.

Whitefish Bay, WI 53211

Benjamin A Kaplan

Attorney at Crueger Dickinson LLC

4532 N Oakland Ave

Whitefish Bay, WI 53211

Edward A. Wallace

Attorney at Wexler Wallace LLP

55 West Monroe Street, Suite 3300

Chicago, IL 60603

 

Court Documents

#2

(#2) CERTIFIED COPY OF TRANSFER ORDER received from The USDC for Northern District of California issued by MDL panel. Case to be transferred for inclusion and MDL No. 2913. (cc: all counsel)(ds) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand; against All Defendants by Kim Haapala, Z.H.. ( Filing Fee PAID $400 receipt number AWIEDC-3303380) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons JUUL Labs, Inc. Summons, #3 Summons Altria Group, Inc Summons)(Dickinson, Erin) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

#3

(#3) Case transferred in from District of Wisconsin Eastern; Case Number 2:19-cv-01814. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 01/06/2020)

1 #2

Summons JUUL Labs, Inc. Summons

1 #3

Summons Altria Group, Inc Summons

#6

RESTRICTED

3 #1

*Restricted*

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Transcript of Proceedings held on February 14, 2020, before Judge William H. Orrick. Court Reporter Belle Ball, CSR, CRR, RDR, telephone number (415)373-2529, belle_ball@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re (376 in 3:19-md-02913-WHO) Transcript Order, (375 in 3:19-md-02913-WHO) Transcript Order, (371 in 3:19-md-02913-WHO) Transcript Order, (374 in 3:19-md-02913-WHO) Transcript Order, (373 in 3:19-md-02913-WHO) Transcript Order ) Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/20/2020. (ballbb15S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/18/2020) (Entered: 02/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketMEMBER CASE OPENED MDL 2913: Eastern District of Wisconsin, 19-01814, Haapala v. Juul Labs Inc, Opened in California Northern District as 20-00112 pursuant to Conditional Transfer Order 18 cc: JPMDL. (wsnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2020) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Case transferred in from District of Wisconsin Eastern; Case Number 2:19-cv-01814. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • Case Electronically Transmitted to the USDC Northern District of California on 1/6/2020. (ds) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CERTIFIED COPY OF TRANSFER ORDER received from The USDC for Northern District of California issued by MDL panel. Case to be transferred for inclusion and MDL No. 2913. (cc: all counsel)(ds) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • Summons Issued as to Altria Group Inc and JUUL Labs Inc. (ds) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Joseph to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website ;pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed (jcl) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand; against All Defendants by Kim Haapala, Z.H.. ( Filing Fee PAID $400 receipt number AWIEDC-3303380) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons JUUL Labs, Inc. Summons, #3 Summons Altria Group, Inc Summons)(Dickinson, Erin) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less