This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/13/2019 at 10:52:25 (UTC).

Ha et al v. US Bank National Association et al

Case Summary

On 04/03/2019 Ha filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against US Bank National Association. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Washington Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Richard A. Jones. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-00492

  • Filing Date:

    04/03/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Courthouse:

    Washington Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Richard A. Jones

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Monica Young Ha

Won Yong Ha

Defendants

Selene Finance LP

US Bank National Association

Michelle R Ghidotti

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Won Yong Ha

Defendant Attorney

Kristin A Zilberstein

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) OBJECTIONS TO PLAINTIFFS' #9 OBJECTION TO SET ASIDE DECLARATION OF NON-MONETARY STATUS by Defendants Michelle R Ghidotti, Selene Finance LP, US Bank National Association (Zilberstein, Kristin) Modified to add linkage on 7/11/2019 (MW). (Entered: 07/10/2019)

#11

(#11) RESPONSE, by Plaintiff Won Yong Ha, to #7 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint. (Ha, Won) (Entered: 07/06/2019)

#9

(#9) MOTION to Set Aside #3 Declaration (non motion) by Defendant MICHELLE R. GHIDOTTI,, filed by Plaintiff Monica Young Ha. Noting Date 7/15/2019, (Ha, Won) (Entered: 06/25/2019)

#10

(#10) OBJECTION to #3 Declaration on Non-Monetary Status of Defendant Foreclosure Trustee, Michelle R. Ghidotti, by Plaintiffs Monica Young Ha, Won Yong Ha (PM) (Entered: 06/25/2019)

#8

(#8) NOTICE: Plaintiff Won Yong Ha has registered to electronically file and receive electronic service in this case. (PS) (Entered: 06/21/2019)

7 #2

Proposed Order Proposed Order on Defendants' Motion to Dismiss

7 #1

Exhibit Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Defendants' Motion to Dis

#7

(#7) MOTION to Dismiss Complaint, filed by Defendants Selene Finance LP, US Bank National Association. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order on Defendants' Motion to Dismiss) Noting Date 6/21/2019, (Zilberstein, Kristin) (Entered: 05/30/2019)

#6

(#6) ORDER REGARDING FRCP 26(f) CONFERENCE, INITIAL DISCLOSURES, AND JOINT STATUS REPORT. FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 5/28/2019, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 6/4/2019, Joint Status Report due by 6/11/2019, by Judge Richard A. Jones. (cc: Plaintiffs via USPS) (VE) (Entered: 05/14/2019)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Kristin A Zilberstein on behalf of Defendants Michelle R Ghidotti, Selene Finance LP, US Bank National Association. (Zilberstein, Kristin) (Entered: 05/14/2019)

#4

(#4) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Other Affiliate Selene Holdings LLC for Selene Finance LP; Corporate Parent U.S. Bancorp for US Bank National Association. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Selene Finance LP, US Bank National Association (Zilberstein, Kristin) (Entered: 05/14/2019)

#3

(#3) DECLARATION OF NON-MONETARY STATUS OF DEFENDANT FORECLOSURE TRUSTEE, MICHELLE R. GHIDOTTI, ESQ. by Defendant Michelle R Ghidotti (Ghidotti, Michelle) (Entered: 05/13/2019)

#2

(#2) STANDING ORDER for Civil Cases Assigned to Judge Richard A. Jones. (cc: Plaintiffs via first class mail) (VE) (Entered: 04/04/2019)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT, filed by Won Yong Ha, Monica Young Ha against defendant(s) Michelle R Ghidotti, Selene Finance LP, US Bank National Association. (Summons(es) issued) (Receipt # SEA095426) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ST) (Entered: 04/04/2019)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) OBJECTIONS TO PLAINTIFFS' #9 OBJECTION TO SET ASIDE DECLARATION OF NON-MONETARY STATUS by Defendants Michelle R Ghidotti, Selene Finance LP, US Bank National Association (Zilberstein, Kristin) Modified to add linkage on 7/11/2019 (MW). (Entered: 07/10/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) RESPONSE, by Plaintiff Won Yong Ha, to #7 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint. (Ha, Won) (Entered: 07/06/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Noting Date Reset: #9 MOTION to Set Aside #3 Declaration (non motion) by Defendant MICHELLE R. GHIDOTTI, is renoted for 7/12/2019, pursuant to LCR 7(d)(3). (cc: Plaintiff Monica Young Ha via USPS) (VE) (Entered: 06/25/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) MOTION to Set Aside #3 Declaration (non motion) by Defendant MICHELLE R. GHIDOTTI,, filed by Plaintiff Monica Young Ha. Noting Date 7/15/2019, (Ha, Won) (Entered: 06/25/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) OBJECTION to #3 Declaration on Non-Monetary Status of Defendant Foreclosure Trustee, Michelle R. Ghidotti, by Plaintiffs Monica Young Ha, Won Yong Ha (PM) (Entered: 06/25/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE: Plaintiff Won Yong Ha has registered to electronically file and receive electronic service in this case. (PS) (Entered: 06/21/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ***Deadlines terminated. The Court notifies the parties that the deadlines contained in the #6 ORDER REGARDING FRCP 26(f) CONFERENCE, INITIAL DISCLOSURES, AND JOINT STATUS REPORT are suspended pending the Court's ruling on Defendants Selene Finance LP's and US Bank National Association's #7 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint. (cc: Plaintiffs via USPS) (VE) (Entered: 06/10/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MOTION to Dismiss Complaint, filed by Defendants Selene Finance LP, US Bank National Association. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order on Defendants' Motion to Dismiss) Noting Date 6/21/2019, (Zilberstein, Kristin) (Entered: 05/30/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER REGARDING FRCP 26(f) CONFERENCE, INITIAL DISCLOSURES, AND JOINT STATUS REPORT. FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 5/28/2019, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 6/4/2019, Joint Status Report due by 6/11/2019, by Judge Richard A. Jones. (cc: Plaintiffs via USPS) (VE) (Entered: 05/14/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Kristin A Zilberstein on behalf of Defendants Michelle R Ghidotti, Selene Finance LP, US Bank National Association. (Zilberstein, Kristin) (Entered: 05/14/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Other Affiliate Selene Holdings LLC for Selene Finance LP; Corporate Parent U.S. Bancorp for US Bank National Association. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Selene Finance LP, US Bank National Association (Zilberstein, Kristin) (Entered: 05/14/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) DECLARATION OF NON-MONETARY STATUS OF DEFENDANT FORECLOSURE TRUSTEE, MICHELLE R. GHIDOTTI, ESQ. by Defendant Michelle R Ghidotti (Ghidotti, Michelle) (Entered: 05/13/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) STANDING ORDER for Civil Cases Assigned to Judge Richard A. Jones. (cc: Plaintiffs via first class mail) (VE) (Entered: 04/04/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT, filed by Won Yong Ha, Monica Young Ha against defendant(s) Michelle R Ghidotti, Selene Finance LP, US Bank National Association. (Summons(es) issued) (Receipt # SEA095426) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ST) (Entered: 04/04/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less