This case was last updated from PACER on 07/26/2020 at 12:37:05 (UTC).

H5 Capital-Seattle Real Estate LLC v. Onni Capital LLC

Case Summary

On 05/27/2020 H5 Capital-Seattle Real Estate LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Onni Capital LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Washington Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Richard A. Jones. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-00801

  • Filing Date:

    05/27/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Washington Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Richard A. Jones

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

H5 CAPITAL - SEATTLE REAL ESTATE, LLC

H5 Capital-Seattle Real Estate LLC

Defendants

Onni Capital, LLC

Onni Capital LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Tyler Lawrence Farmer

Attorney at HARRIGAN LEYH FARMER & THOMSEN LLP

999 Third Avenue, Suite 4400

Seattle, WA 98104

Defendant Attorneys

Ryan William Sternoff

Attorney at AHLERS CRESSMAN & SLEIGHT, PLLC

999 Third Ave, Suite 3800

Seattle, WA 98104

Scott R Sleight

Attorney at AHLERS CRESSMAN & SLEIGHT, PLLC

999 Third Ave, Suite 3800

Seattle, WA 98104

 

Court Documents

#17

(#17) REPLY, filed by Defendant Onni Capital LLC, TO RESPONSE to #10 MOTION to Dismiss (Sternoff, Ryan) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

#16

(#16) DECLARATION of Sharon Yarber filed by Plaintiff H5 Capital-Seattle Real Estate LLC re #10 MOTION to Dismiss (Farmer, Tyler) (Entered: 07/13/2020)

15 #1

Exhibit Exhibits 1-2

#15

(#15) DECLARATION of Josh Simms filed by Plaintiff H5 Capital-Seattle Real Estate LLC re #10 MOTION to Dismiss (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits 1-2)(Farmer, Tyler) (Entered: 07/13/2020)

14 #1

Exhibit Exhibits 1-9

#14

(#14) DECLARATION of Tyler L. Farmer filed by Plaintiff H5 Capital-Seattle Real Estate LLC re #10 MOTION to Dismiss (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits 1-9)(Farmer, Tyler) (Entered: 07/13/2020)

#13

(#13) RESPONSE, by Plaintiff H5 Capital-Seattle Real Estate LLC, to #10 MOTION to Dismiss . (Farmer, Tyler) (Entered: 07/13/2020)

10 #1

Proposed Order

#10

(#10) MOTION to Dismiss , filed by Defendant Onni Capital LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 7/17/2020, (Sternoff, Ryan) (Entered: 06/23/2020)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Scott R Sleight on behalf of Defendant Onni Capital LLC. (Sleight, Scott) (Entered: 06/09/2020)

#6

***Deadlines terminated. The Court notifies the parties that the remaining deadlines contained in the #6 ORDER REGARDING FRCP 26(f) CONFERENCE, INITIAL DISCLOSURES, AND JOINT STATUS REPORT are suspended pending the Court's ruling on Defendant's #10 MOTION to Dismiss. (VE) (Entered: 06/24/2020)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Ryan William Sternoff on behalf of Defendant Onni Capital LLC. (Sternoff, Ryan) (Entered: 06/04/2020)

#4

(#4) STANDING ORDER for Civil Cases Assigned to Judge Richard A. Jones. (VE) (Entered: 06/01/2020)

#3

(#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by H5 Capital-Seattle Real Estate LLC (Farmer, Tyler) (Entered: 05/29/2020)

#2

(#2) Summons Electronically Issued as to defendant Onni Capital LLC (CDA) (Entered: 05/29/2020)

1 #2

Summons

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Onni Capital, LLC (Receipt # AWAWDC-6363736) Attorney Tyler Lawrence Farmer added to party H5 CAPITAL - SEATTLE REAL ESTATE, LLC(pty:pla), filed by H5 CAPITAL - SEATTLE REAL ESTATE, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Farmer, Tyler) (Entered: 05/27/2020)

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) REPLY, filed by Defendant Onni Capital LLC, TO RESPONSE to #10 MOTION to Dismiss (Sternoff, Ryan) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) DECLARATION of Sharon Yarber filed by Plaintiff H5 Capital-Seattle Real Estate LLC re #10 MOTION to Dismiss (Farmer, Tyler) (Entered: 07/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) DECLARATION of Josh Simms filed by Plaintiff H5 Capital-Seattle Real Estate LLC re #10 MOTION to Dismiss (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits 1-2)(Farmer, Tyler) (Entered: 07/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) DECLARATION of Tyler L. Farmer filed by Plaintiff H5 Capital-Seattle Real Estate LLC re #10 MOTION to Dismiss (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits 1-9)(Farmer, Tyler) (Entered: 07/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) RESPONSE, by Plaintiff H5 Capital-Seattle Real Estate LLC, to #10 MOTION to Dismiss . (Farmer, Tyler) (Entered: 07/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket***Deadlines terminated. The Court notifies the parties that the remaining deadlines contained in the #6 ORDER REGARDING FRCP 26(f) CONFERENCE, INITIAL DISCLOSURES, AND JOINT STATUS REPORT are suspended pending the Court's ruling on Defendant's #10 MOTION to Dismiss. (VE) (Entered: 06/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) DECLARATION of Ryan W. Sternoff filed by Defendant Onni Capital LLC re #10 MOTION to Dismiss (Sternoff, Ryan) (Entered: 06/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) DECLARATION of Kevin Carpenter filed by Defendant Onni Capital LLC re #10 MOTION to Dismiss (Sternoff, Ryan) (Entered: 06/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION to Dismiss , filed by Defendant Onni Capital LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 7/17/2020, (Sternoff, Ryan) (Entered: 06/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Onni Capital LLC (Sternoff, Ryan) (Entered: 06/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Onni Capital LLC on 6/2/2020, filed by Plaintiff H5 Capital-Seattle Real Estate LLC. (Farmer, Tyler) (Entered: 06/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Scott R Sleight on behalf of Defendant Onni Capital LLC. (Sleight, Scott) (Entered: 06/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER REGARDING FRCP 26(f) CONFERENCE, INITIAL DISCLOSURES, AND JOINT STATUS REPORT. FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 6/22/2020, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 6/29/2020, Joint Status Report due by 7/6/2020, by Judge Richard A. Jones. (VE) (Entered: 06/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Ryan William Sternoff on behalf of Defendant Onni Capital LLC. (Sternoff, Ryan) (Entered: 06/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) STANDING ORDER for Civil Cases Assigned to Judge Richard A. Jones. (VE) (Entered: 06/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by H5 Capital-Seattle Real Estate LLC (Farmer, Tyler) (Entered: 05/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Electronically Issued as to defendant Onni Capital LLC (CDA) (Entered: 05/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2020
  • DocketNOTICE Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1, Plaintiff(s) must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 6/5/2020. (CDA) (Entered: 05/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2020
  • DocketJudge Richard A. Jones added. (CDA) (Entered: 05/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Onni Capital, LLC (Receipt # AWAWDC-6363736) Attorney Tyler Lawrence Farmer added to party H5 CAPITAL - SEATTLE REAL ESTATE, LLC(pty:pla), filed by H5 CAPITAL - SEATTLE REAL ESTATE, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Farmer, Tyler) (Entered: 05/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less