This case was last updated from PACER on 01/12/2020 at 07:52:41 (UTC).

H. Saga International Inc. v. EM1 Labs, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 11/13/2019 H Saga International Inc filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against EM1 Labs, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Tennessee Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Tu M. Pham and Sheryl H. Lipman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-02778

  • Filing Date:

    11/13/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Tennessee Western District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Tu M. Pham

Presiding Judge

Sheryl H. Lipman

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

H. Saga International Inc.

Defendants

Angelo Skulas

EMI1 Labs, LLC

EM1 Labs, LLC

Not Classified By Court

Clerk W. Aaron Hall

Memphis, TN 38103

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

John L. Ryder

Attorney at HARRIS SHELTON HANOVER WALSH PLLC - Memphis

One Commerce Square, Ste. 2210

Memphis, TN 38103

Pablo Adrian Varela

Attorney at HARRIS SHELTON HANOVER WALSH PLLC - Memphis

One Commerce Square, Ste. 2210

Memphis, TN 38103

Defendant Attorneys

Catherine H. Molloy

Attorney at GREENBERG TRAURIG, PA - Tampa

625 E. Twiggs Street, Suite 100

Tampa, FL 33602

Brian Koch

Attorney at GREENBERG TRAURIG, P.A.

401 E. Las Olas Blvd., Suite 2000

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33301

 

Court Documents

#27

(#27) STIPULATION Regarding Selection of Mediator by H. Saga International Inc.. (Varela, Pablo) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

#26

(#26) Amended ANSWER to #24 Amended Complaint by EM1 Labs, LLC.(Koch, Brian) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

#25

(#25) ANSWER to #24 Amended Complaint by EM1 Labs, LLC.(Koch, Brian) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

24 #4

Exhibit

24 #3

Exhibit

24 #2

Exhibit

24 #1

Exhibit

#24

(#24) AMENDED COMPLAINT against EM1 Labs, LLC, Angelo Skulas, filed by H. Saga International Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit) (Varela, Pablo) (Entered: 12/26/2019)

#23

(#23) SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Sheryl H. Lipman on 12/19/19. (Lipman, Sheryl) (Entered: 12/19/2019)

8 #2

Exhibit Amended Complaint From Related Florida Litigation

8 #1

Exhibit Declaration of Angelo Skulas

#8

(#21) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Sheryl H. Lipman: Scheduling Conference was held on 12/19/2019. Pablo Adrian Varela appeared for the plaintiff. On the phone was Brian Koch for the defendant. The court discussed the dates and deadlines with the parties. The Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #8 was DENIED as moot. Non-Jury Trial set for Monday, January 25, 2021 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 1 - Memphis before Judge Sheryl H. Lipman. Trial expected to last 2-3 days. Proposed Pretrial Order due by January 8, 2021. Pretrial Conference set for Friday, January 15, 2021 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 1 - Memphis before Judge Sheryl H. Lipman. Scheduling Order to be Entered. (Court Reporter Candace Covey.) (smm) (Entered: 12/19/2019)

#7

(#7) SETTING LETTER: Scheduling Conference set for Thursday, December 19, 2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 1 - Memphis before Judge Sheryl H. Lipman. (smm) (Entered: 11/14/2019)

#2

(#2) Judge Sheryl H. Lipman and Magistrate Judge Tu M. Pham added. (jld) (Entered: 11/13/2019)

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit 2 - Notice of Removal to District Court

1 #1

Exhibit Composite Exhibit 1 - State Court Documents

#1

(#3) COURTESY NOTICE: Pursuant to Rule 5 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, document #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Angelo Skulas, EMI1 Labs, LLC has been filed. For future reference, please note ECF Policies and Procedures 10.1 electronic signature. A "wet signature" was used on the civil cover sheet. Please refer to the #ECF User Manual and #ECF Policies and Procedures. Filer is not required to resubmit document. (jld) (Entered: 11/13/2019)

24 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#27) STIPULATION Regarding Selection of Mediator by H. Saga International Inc.. (Varela, Pablo) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#26) Amended ANSWER to #24 Amended Complaint by EM1 Labs, LLC.(Koch, Brian) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#25) ANSWER to #24 Amended Complaint by EM1 Labs, LLC.(Koch, Brian) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#24) AMENDED COMPLAINT against EM1 Labs, LLC, Angelo Skulas, filed by H. Saga International Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit) (Varela, Pablo) (Entered: 12/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#23) SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Sheryl H. Lipman on 12/19/19. (Lipman, Sheryl) (Entered: 12/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) NOTICE SETTING NON-JURY TRIAL WITH PRETRIAL PROCEDURES: Non-Jury Trial set for Monday, January 25, 2021 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 1 - Memphis before Judge Sheryl H. Lipman. Trial expected to last 2-3 days. Proposed Pretrial Order due by January 8, 2021. Pretrial Conference set for Friday, January 15, 2021 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 1 - Memphis before Judge Sheryl H. Lipman. (smm) (Entered: 12/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Sheryl H. Lipman: Scheduling Conference was held on 12/19/2019. Pablo Adrian Varela appeared for the plaintiff. On the phone was Brian Koch for the defendant. The court discussed the dates and deadlines with the parties. The Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #8 was DENIED as moot. Non-Jury Trial set for Monday, January 25, 2021 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 1 - Memphis before Judge Sheryl H. Lipman. Trial expected to last 2-3 days. Proposed Pretrial Order due by January 8, 2021. Pretrial Conference set for Friday, January 15, 2021 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 1 - Memphis before Judge Sheryl H. Lipman. Scheduling Order to be Entered. (Court Reporter Candace Covey.) (smm) (Entered: 12/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting . (Varela, Pablo) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) JUDGMENT. Party Angelo Skulas terminated. Signed by Judge Sheryl H. Lipman on 12/11/19. (Lipman, Sheryl) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) STIPULATION of Dismissal as to Angelo Skulas only by H. Saga International Inc.. (Varela, Pablo) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 11/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ORDER GRANTING UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT #9 . Signed by Judge Sheryl H. Lipman on 11/21/2019. (shl) (Entered: 11/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer proposed order submitted by EMI1 Labs, LLC. (Molloy, Catherine) (Entered: 11/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Angelo Skulas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Angelo Skulas, #2 Exhibit Amended Complaint From Related Florida Litigation)(Molloy, Catherine) (Entered: 11/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) SETTING LETTER: Scheduling Conference set for Thursday, December 19, 2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 1 - Memphis before Judge Sheryl H. Lipman. (smm) (Entered: 11/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • (#6) NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (jld) (Entered: 11/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • (#5) NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (jld) (Entered: 11/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • (#4) NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (jld) (Entered: 11/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) COURTESY NOTICE: Pursuant to Rule 5 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, document #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Angelo Skulas, EMI1 Labs, LLC has been filed. For future reference, please note ECF Policies and Procedures 10.1 electronic signature. A "wet signature" was used on the civil cover sheet. Please refer to the #ECF User Manual and #ECF Policies and Procedures. Filer is not required to resubmit document. (jld) (Entered: 11/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Judge Sheryl H. Lipman and Magistrate Judge Tu M. Pham added. (jld) (Entered: 11/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Angelo Skulas, EMI1 Labs, LLC from Thirtieth Judicial District at Memphis, case number CH-19-1288 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNWDC-3214091), filed by Angelo Skulas, EMI1 Labs, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Composite Exhibit 1 - State Court Documents, #2 Exhibit 2 - Notice of Removal to District Court, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Molloy, Catherine) (Entered: 11/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.