This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/04/2021 at 08:49:10 (UTC).

H-D U.S.A., LLC v. The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A"

Case Summary

On 07/06/2021 H-D U S A , LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Trademark lawsuit against The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Jorge L. Alonso. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-03581

  • Filing Date:

    07/06/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Trademark

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jorge L. Alonso

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

H-D U.S.A., LLC

Defendants

The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A"

Amarzon-Automotive Parts

Lovef

Xiao Yun Store

Skillful Craftsman Store

Veccy Online Store

ZuoYou Painting Store

3DPrinted Store

Hibah Hibah Store

AMTMBS Official Store

KLALIEN Official Store

Badges World Store

ypods custommade Store

Jennifer Life Store

HealthFamily Store

Shop5785736 Store

YCC Store

KINGART

perfectlifestyle store

182 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Amy Crout Ziegler

Attorney at Greer, Burns & Crain, Ltd.

300 S. Wacker Dr.Suite 2500

Chicago, IL 60606

Martin Francis Trainor

Attorney at Greer, Burns & Crain, Ltd.

300 South Wacker Drivesuite 2500

Chicago, IL 60606

RiKaleigh C. Johnson

Attorney at Greer, Burns & Crain

300 South Wacker Drivesuite 2500

Chicago, IL 60606

Justin R. Gaudio

Attorney at Greer Burns & Crain Ltd

300 South Wacker Drivesuite 2500

Chicago, IL 60606

Allyson M. Martin

Attorney at Greer, Burns & Crain Ltd.

300 S. Wacker Drivesuite 2500

Chicago, IL 60606

Defendant Attorneys

Erin Kathryn Russell

Attorney at The Russell Firm, LLC

833 W. Chicago Avenuesuite 508

Chicago, IL 60642

Shengmao Mu

Attorney at Whitewood Law Pllc

57 West, 57Th Street3Rd And 4Th Floors

New York, NY 10019

 

Court Documents

#42

#41

40 #5

Exhibit 4

40 #4

Exhibit 3

40 #3

Exhibit 2

40 #2

Exhibit 1

40 #1

Declaration of Martin F. Trainor

37 #3

Exhibit C - KTM 1280 Feinerman transcript

#37

#5

#4

#3

#2

RESTRICTED

1 #4

Exhibit 4

1 #3

Exhibit 3

1 #2

Exhibit 2

1 #1

Exhibit 1

#1

63 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#42) REPLY by Amarzon-Automotive Parts to Response #40 (Russell, Erin) (Entered: 09/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#41) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by H-D U.S.A., LLC as to certain defendant (Johnson, RiKaleigh) (Entered: 08/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#40) RESPONSE by Plaintiff H-D U.S.A., LLC to response in opposition to motion, #37 (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Martin F. Trainor, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4)(Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 08/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • DocketNEW PARTIES: Xiao Yun Store, Skillful Craftsman Store, Veccy Online Store, ZuoYou Painting Store, 3DPrinted Store, Hibah Hibah Store, AMTMBS Official Store, KLALIEN Official Store, Badges World Store, ypods custommade Store, Jennifer Life Store, HealthFamily Store, Shop5785736 Store, YCC Store, KINGART, perfectlifestyle store, Shop900239428 Store, automobile parts replacement store, Cozy Decor Store, Amy Li Store, Moobuy Store, Shop910558267 Store, Shop910569222 Store, DiamondPainting factory Store, Shop911125168 Store, Shop911136005 Store, Shop911329097 Store, Shop911331074 Store, Shop911415325 Store, yellowpods's Store, cheap DP Store, Yiallen Store, To Be Cheerful Store, Yan yan decorative painting Store, dozoart Store, Ziyou123 Store, Leying Store, Larisa Diamonds Art Store, Sunga Outdoor Store, Quality shop 66 Store, qingrong Store, shop0726 Store, shop0798 Store, The First Zok Factory Store, qingzi01 Store, PVC Patch factory Store, xiaozhou Store, Rotating and furious Store, liao patch3 Store, RuiCai Digital Store, XNSFSC Store, XIAO ZI ZI Store, Candies zhou Store, hiomyy Store, qingzi-02 Store, qingzi03 Store, Xiao Cheng Store, sf455 Store, QingFu Store, yijiareStore Store, 101 percent Store, shop564178 Store, Megin Store, 2670440934 Store, 666 shirts Store, HRYB Store, customshirts666 Store, zhencang Store, thirts666 Store, 100%customTshirt Store, Seadi580 Store, A T-shirts Store, BB19SMT Store, yanjiamengs, Xin Department Store, ARELLM, Longshengv, dlkjmygs, 54gf, A16OC9CHA8AZFP, lixiaofeidiyigedian, Xiangchengshishanhaoshangmaoyouxiangongsi, UVBike, wodceeke, YCRYZY, ShenZhenShiHeBaiXinKeJiYouXianGongSi, binrongbaihuodian, hefeitiquandianzishangwuyouxianzerengongsi, Phinli, FANXIAOHANG-STORE, ShenZhenShiDongBinShiYeYouXianGongSi, US JINGDOU, yifmaoyi, baifanshangmao, dongruikang, YUNLOY, Xiaoyansang Art, jinpengshangmao666, 17Z16, Tracycy, Gieixi, VBTESI, GOODUSANO.1, Musheng Hall Industry and Trade, Longenter, Fashions brand, SuYang Department Store, shuaizhushangmao, VV ART, mansicai, tianyc, rong'rong'wu'jin'jiao'dian'jing'xiao'bu, LianShanTrading, chengdhuwendianzishangwuyouxiangongsi, Xingchen Trading Co., Ltd., JT MOTOSPORT, hdrtyiudythj, GJ-LHL, Fuyou summer Co., LTD, 17Z08, Newsmarts, TianMaiGeLun, xinluoquyanyushang, pu tian shi pin li mao yi you xian gong si, zhizibaihuodian, linlushangmao, xinXiwang, cdsmnjhcbgg, KDUFK, zhenghuanghuihua, Magic too, Rupert Gibsona, jianghuishangmao666, QiWenHeWangLuo, Jia Bang US, PENGHUANGXZP, XXLZLQ, Original Trip, TERRITORYSHOPS, zhidaz, A2WHPYJA330YA6, guangzhoujihuishangmaoshanghangg, JYLDP, Taopin, YUEYANG LXT, xiaoxiaoxiaoxiaolong, qietingfengyun, zhangximing, 17Z13, YQCHSC, 4WD FANS, singsong999, Terisass, Anitc B Dailne, homma shoko2, SYHXHY, HaiLeiYiLiaoQiXiaoShan, Jamielery, haoxiaotianxc, CLyxXyK, xiangchengshihuiyaoshangmaoyouxiangongsi, A3K879VIOQ8XG0, shuaichenshangmao, ShanXituyuanlingshangmaoyouxiangongsi, wanchengkeji, xiangyu hot sale shop, TooTii Stroe, Zhongbohou Art, myjoys us, Yokzanom, Fat Rabbit Shop, WASNMYL, chenyufan-c, yypphh8585, yuanhuiqubingyouwujinshanghang, YSBSM, YATONG, yiliya1, Wecade, YFMNX, Baidubulid, xiuyanmanzuzizhixianjiajingchengbaihuodian, caohuizhen, Right Shen, RUSHANGQI, xiangchengshilanwanshangmaoyouxiangongsi, ashidedian, YZY's company, Mament, Rosince, DMWTR, Super Go Cool, ChengDuYaYuBinQianShangMaoYouXianGongSi, zhaixingshangmao666, auto-lighting18, careboot, quick_autoparts and luzhihui fashion added to case caption. (Ziegler, Amy) (Entered: 08/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#37) RESPONSE by Amarzon-Automotive Partsin Opposition to MOTION by Plaintiff H-D U.S.A., LLC for preliminary injunction #31 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - plaintiff's evidence re: Amarzon-Automotive Parts, #2 Exhibit B - Amarzon-Automotive Parts sales data, #3 Exhibit C - KTM 1280 Feinerman transcript)(Russell, Erin) (Entered: 08/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#39) PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION ORDER. Signed by the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso on 8/10/2021. Notice mailed by Judge's staff (lf, ) (Entered: 08/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#38) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: Telephonic status hearing held and continued to 9/24/21 at 9:30 a.m. Motion hearing held. For the reasons stated on the record, Plaintiff's motion for entry of a preliminary injunction #31 is granted with the exception of Defendant Amarzon-Automotive Parts. Defendant Amarazon-Automotive Part's opposition to Plaintiff's motion for preliminary injunction shall be filed by 8/13/21; Plaintiff's response shall be filed by 8/27/21; Defendant's reply shall be filed by 9/7/21. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing. The call-in number is 888-808-6929 and the access code is 4911854. Counsel of record will receive an email 30 minutes prior to the start of the telephonic hearing with instructions to join the call. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Notice mailed by Judge's staff (lf, ) (Entered: 08/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#36) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Lovef by Shengmao Mu (Mu, Shengmao) (Entered: 08/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#35) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Amarzon-Automotive Parts by Erin Kathryn Russell (Russell, Erin) (Entered: 08/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#34) SUMMONS Returned Executed by H-D U.S.A., LLC as to The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A" on 8/5/2021, answer due 8/26/2021. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Martin F. Trainor)(Trainor, Martin) (Entered: 08/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
25 More Docket Entries
  • 07/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION by Plaintiff H-D U.S.A., LLC for temporary restraining order Including a Temporary Injunction, a Temporary Asset Restraint, and Expedited Discovery (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 07/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Heather K. McShain. Case assignment: Random assignment. (lxk, ) (Entered: 07/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff H-D U.S.A., LLC by Martin Francis Trainor (Trainor, Martin) (Entered: 07/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff H-D U.S.A., LLC by RiKaleigh C. Johnson (Johnson, RiKaleigh) (Entered: 07/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff H-D U.S.A., LLC by Amy Crout Ziegler (Ziegler, Amy) (Entered: 07/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff H-D U.S.A., LLC by Justin R. Gaudio (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 07/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 07/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION by Plaintiff H-D U.S.A., LLC for leave to file under seal (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 07/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SEALED EXHIBIT by Plaintiff H-D U.S.A., LLC Schedule A regarding complaint #1 (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 07/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed by H-D U.S.A., LLC; Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-18423857. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 07/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where H-D U.S.A. LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A" is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Shengmao Mu

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Erin Kathryn Russell