This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/20/2021 at 07:51:32 (UTC).

H-D U.S.A., LLC v. The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A"

Case Summary

On 06/21/2021 H-D U S A , LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Trademark lawsuit against The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Thomas M. Durkin. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-03294

  • Filing Date:

    06/21/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Trademark

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Thomas M. Durkin

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

H-D U.S.A., LLC

Defendants

The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A"

autopartsfactory store

maxpeedingrods xpeed store

Balgari Store

Taibosch Store

Fancitale Store

double-van art Store

Lu Ai Store

LQXLSA Women's Store

Shop911202141 Store

Cutenew Store

Fantacy Art Store

Bald Governor 003H Store

Shop911609407 Store

Jupao Store

Xinxin Xiangyi Store

Golden Bay Store Store

redpink Store

excellentt Store

180 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Justin R. Gaudio

Attorney at Greer Burns & Crain Ltd

300 South Wacker Drivesuite 2500

Chicago, IL 60606

Amy Crout Ziegler

Attorney at Greer, Burns & Crain, Ltd.

300 S. Wacker Dr.Suite 2500

Chicago, IL 60606

RiKaleigh C. Johnson

Attorney at Greer, Burns & Crain

300 South Wacker Drivesuite 2500

Chicago, IL 60606

Martin Francis Trainor

Attorney at Greer, Burns & Crain, Ltd.

300 South Wacker Drivesuite 2500

Chicago, IL 60606

Other Attorneys

Adam Edward Urbanczyk

Attorney at AU LLC

564 W. Randolph St. 2Nd Floor

Chicago, IL 60661

 

Court Documents

#52

#51

50 #2

Exhibit 1

50 #1

Civil Cover Sheet of Martin F. Trainor

#50

#49

#48

#45

#38

#6

#5

#4

#3

1 #4

Exhibit 4

1 #3

Exhibit 3

1 #2

Exhibit 2

1 #1

Exhibit 1

#1

69 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#52) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: Plaintiffs' response on the motion to dissolve the preliminary injunction #38 , due 8/23/2021, is stayed. No response is due at this time. A telephone hearing on the motion to extend the briefing schedule #45 is set for 8/26/2021 at 9:00 a.m., at which time a new briefing schedule on the motion to dissolve #38 will be set. To join the telephone conference, dial 877-402-9757, Access Code 4410831. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing. Please be sure to keep your phone on mute when you are not speaking. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Mailed notice. (ecw, ) (Entered: 08/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#51) NOTICE by H-D U.S.A., LLC re reply to response to motion #50 (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 08/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#50) REPLY by H-D U.S.A., LLC to response to motion #48 to Extend Briefing Schedule (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Martin F. Trainor #2 Exhibit 1)(Gaudio, Justin) Modified on 8/13/2021 (ec, ). (Entered: 08/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#49) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by H-D U.S.A., LLC as to certain defendant (Johnson, RiKaleigh) (Entered: 08/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#48) RESPONSE by Zhang Hehe to MOTION by Plaintiff H-D U.S.A., LLC to Extend the Briefing Schedule for Defendant Zhang Hehe's Motion #45 (Exhibits) (nsf, ) (Entered: 08/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#47) NOTICE by H-D U.S.A., LLC re MOTION by Plaintiff H-D U.S.A., LLC to Extend the Briefing Schedule for Defendant Zhang Hehe's Motion #45 (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 08/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#46) DECLARATION of Martin F. Trainor regarding motion for miscellaneous relief #45 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 08/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#45) MOTION by Plaintiff H-D U.S.A., LLC to Extend the Briefing Schedule for Defendant Zhang Hehe's Motion (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 08/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#44) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: The Court enters the following briefing schedule on Defendant Zhang Hehe's motion #38 : Plaintiff's response is due by 8/23/2021, Defendant's reply is due by 8/30/2021. Mailed notice. (ecw, ) (Entered: 08/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#42) NOTICE of Correction regarding #39 . (nsf, ) (Entered: 08/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
35 More Docket Entries
  • 06/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION by Plaintiff H-D U.S.A., LLC for temporary restraining order Including a Temporary Injunction, a Temporary Asset Restraint, and Expedited Discovery (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 06/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Beth W. Jantz. Case assignment: Random assignment. (lxk, ) (Entered: 06/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff H-D U.S.A., LLC by Martin Francis Trainor (Trainor, Martin) (Entered: 06/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff H-D U.S.A., LLC by RiKaleigh C. Johnson (Johnson, RiKaleigh) (Entered: 06/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff H-D U.S.A., LLC by Amy Crout Ziegler (Ziegler, Amy) (Entered: 06/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff H-D U.S.A., LLC by Justin R. Gaudio (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 06/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 06/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION by Plaintiff H-D U.S.A., LLC for leave to file under seal (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 06/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SEALED EXHIBIT by Plaintiff H-D U.S.A., LLC Schedule A regarding complaint #1 (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 06/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed by H-D U.S.A., LLC; Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-18370480. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 06/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where H-D U.S.A. LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A" is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Adam E Urbanczyk