This case was last updated from PACER on 03/29/2021 at 07:13:44 (UTC).

H-D U.S.A., LLC v. The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A"

Case Summary

On 01/28/2021 H-D U S A , LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Trademark lawsuit against The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Jorge L. Alonso. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-00499

  • Filing Date:

    01/28/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Trademark

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jorge L. Alonso

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

H-D U.S.A., LLC

Defendants

The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A"

SHUIZAOBA

HIBEOULEB

ShenYangTieXiQuYiMaoJianCaiDian

SUEXI

Tseven Store

Hao Shunda

AmaAguirrend

JIAHEJIA

GaoXinQuMeiHengDaDianZiChanPinJingYingBu

Shop910747155 Store

OUR SALAN Store

Shop910745159 Store

FGJIUSHINIU

HeNanGeDaJiXieSheBeiAnZhuangYouXianGongSi

NewBetter Store

aairprdds

Wofei mall

Pet DreamWorks

180 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Justin R. Gaudio

Attorney at Greer Burns & Crain Ltd

300 South Wacker Drive, Suite 2500

Chicago, IL 60606

Amy Crout Ziegler

Attorney at Greer, Burns & Crain, Ltd.

300 S. Wacker Dr., Suite 2500

Chicago, IL 60606

RiKaleigh C. Johnson

Attorney at Greer, Burns & Crain

300 South Wacker Drive, Suite 2500

Chicago, IL 60606

Martin Francis Trainor

Attorney at Greer, Burns & Crain, Ltd.

300 South Wacker Drive, Suite 2500

Chicago, IL 60606

Defendant Attorneys

Depeng Bi

Attorney at The Law Offices Of Konrad Sherinian, Llc

1755 Park Street, Suite 200

Naperville, IL 60563

Shengmao Mu

Attorney at Whitewood Law Pllc

57 West, 57Th Street, 3Rd And 4Th Floors

New York, NY 10019

Konrad Val Sherinian

Attorney at The Law Offices of Konrad Sherinian, LLC

1755 Park Street, Suite 200

Chicago, IL 60563

 

Court Documents

#41

#40

#39

#36

#35

#38

#37

#34

#31

#5

#4

#3

#2

RESTRICTED

1 #4

Exhibit 4

1 #3

Exhibit 3

1 #2

Exhibit 2

1 #1

Exhibit 1

#1

52 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#41) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by H-D U.S.A., LLC as to certain defendants (Johnson, RiKaleigh) (Entered: 03/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#40) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by H-D U.S.A., LLC as to certain defendants (Johnson, RiKaleigh) (Entered: 03/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#39) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by H-D U.S.A., LLC as to certain defendants (Johnson, RiKaleigh) (Entered: 03/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketNEW PARTIES: OUR SALAN Store, SHIMANOx Store, MAGE WORLD Bike Wholesaler Store Store, Europe 3d picture, Aaron., co ltd Store, EVA LADY Official Store, CROSSSUNAI Store, shimanoplus Store, GUO BIKE Store, Karnoz Store, pengrongup Official Store, Shop5251344 Store, iDzn Newborn Clothes Store, Domomo Store, KENDIM SECTIM Store, Mother Clothes Show Store, NewBetter Store, GROMD Store, Cystal Accessories Store, Shop5885764 Store, Shop5885784 Store, Dafu design Store, Shop900249236 Store, t-shirt016 Store, Sundrewr Store, Shop910331347 Store, nilart_word Store, VectorWear Store, Shop910367296 Store, Shop910558312 Store, Shop910640048 Store, StevenXjan Store, Shop910729150 Store, Shop910737084 Store, FH digital 017 Store, Shop910745159 Store, Shop910747155 Store, Shop910873006 Store, Shop910948053 Store, Shop910949027 Store, Shop910951065 Store, Shop910965071 Store, Reinventing trend Store, Shop910976001 Store, Shop910988071 Store, Farraw Store, Shop911017063 Store, Shop911051034 Store, KDH8 Store, JT Shoping, WANG CHUNMEI, FuXindream, TYHGF, Heinmo, SZRZTR, taiyuanshiyingzequyangboshuiguodian, June-US, liaohuilong2, tyrertyr, Natasha Breeden, NYFlying, AmaAguirrend, Wofei mall, sazwdk, kaifenghuangcaishangmaoyouxiangongsi, 4CAR&, WANGJQIN, Weiye Personality Store, A15VU8DMFXALLY, W-TinSigns, LeiChuangShangMao, Kacol-Studio, Lvliangshilishiquhebianpingzonghejingxiaobu, HSZSZY, MEIYAQQ, Twifon ZZY CYAN, shenzhenshiyuqianyigoudianziyouxianbfflpv, Kardiya, UntilYouGifts, EAGFLY, QiDongXianQuanDeBaiHuoDian, SUEXI, WANSU commerce and trade, RiZhaoTianChongShangMaoYouXianGongSi, aairprdds, WENDING88, seatesme266, KeLin, HZSXMASK, Ang-xw, QuanQuan-us, HIBEOULEB, rdtyhrtu, ogdfdrffdd, A1D0416K3CM5P7, HeNanGeDaJiXieSheBeiAnZhuangYouXianGongSi, FGJIUSHINIU, CKeKe, Never night sky, guang zhou ye sen fu shi you xian gong si, Radella, Tseven Store, ShenZhenShiDongBinShiYeYouXianGongSi, QPLAYnm, SSHSHOP, TongChengMinLanBaiHuoDian, BEER#, qinhanxinchengheyihaobaihodian, liangzisupermarket, SNIDKES, huizhoushihuichengquminggebianlidian, TOPUSE, SUHERVEX, SHUIZAOBA, OfinaZyx, Greeeen Parrot, A1K875DDN1YN1A, lv liang shi li shi qu xiao cao bian li dian, dingyashangmao, ningyu decor, Small beautiful sister, unyuexuefu, PTDMD, Mal-ll, ShenYangTieXiQuYiMaoJianCaiDian, lv liang shi li shi qu wei ying bian li dian, HeNanKeZuoShangMaoYouXianGongSi, JJFHGYUW, SrySmUS, SerendS, FMLAC, ABCDOR, JIAHEJIA, BiBuBaLa, ninglingxianbahuirizapu, Pendapu, SuperFan, maiJiaJianBingDian, putianshichengxiangqulvnongyimipu, Bvancuh, WENBINXSL, SONGWIEUS, ShanDongHuiZeFuWuWaiBao, Simon-Stark, GaoXinQuMeiHengDaDianZiChanPinJingYingBu, Noki home, QingXinQuTaiHeZhenXuFengJianCaiDian, 0AZNnk0, Powit, VAYUDD, tianlanqu, LinXianTuBanLiGuoChaoShi, Kooqi, SANZHUCAO, LOVELYSOUL, Travel Poster, Sattfashion, Bright world us, Ho Nok TAT trading company, lucky baby#, FLYING SMART DEVELOPMENT LIMITED, ONE-THREE-ONE, CHENGKUO, RenChengQuDaZiRanChongWuShiPinDian, NBHHPLS, Hi-WISH, erdfrtfded, Tisha Reveiro, Bimkole, Hao Shunda, Pet DreamWorks, WANLINGRR, Lucsy, Qin Guo She Ji, RMLiu, My_OP_Home, WHMPJG, LoveStar-Us, Day Romero, ouaomaoyi, FliFlition, Onlyhu, Baby ying, Tesgo-DIY, suyuquxinghahabochongwudian-1, qutichenwangluokejiyouxiangongsi, A2C3SC020G3WLH, Chaobaotongzhuang Store, shenzhenshichenyunshiyeyouxiangongsi, CHENYAN00, U9U3QP59UK, sterrp, Million Questions, Sunflower Home, Homus, 900 million Accessories, DOORZ and BQQDP added to case caption. (Ziegler, Amy) (Entered: 03/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#36) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A" by Konrad Val Sherinian the defendant store Heinmo (Sherinian, Konrad) (Entered: 03/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#35) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A" by Depeng Bi for the store Heinmo only (Bi, Depeng) (Entered: 03/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#38) PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION Order. Signed by the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso on 3/4/2021. Notice mailed by Judge's staff (lf, ) (Entered: 03/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#37) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: Telephonic motion hearing held. For the reasons stated on the record, Plaintiff's motion for entry of a preliminary injunction #31 is granted. Enter Preliminary Injunction Order. Oral motion to unseal documents is granted. The Clerk is directed to unseal all previously sealed documents. Plaintiff is ordered to add all Defendant names listed in the Schedule A to the docket within three business days. Instructions can be found on the court's website at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov. Notice mailed by Judge's staff (lf, ) (Entered: 03/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#34) SUMMONS Returned Executed by H-D U.S.A., LLC as to The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A" on 3/1/2021, answer due 3/22/2021. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Martin F. Trainor)(Trainor, Martin) (Entered: 03/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) NOTICE of Motion by Justin R. Gaudio for presentment of motion for preliminary injunction #31 before Honorable Jorge L. Alonso on 3/4/2021 at 09:30 AM. (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 03/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
23 More Docket Entries
  • 01/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MAILED trademark report to Patent Trademark Office, Alexandria VA (daj, ) (Entered: 01/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sheila M. Finnegan. Case assignment: Random assignment. (jmk, ) (Entered: 01/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff H-D U.S.A., LLC by Martin Francis Trainor (Trainor, Martin) (Entered: 01/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff H-D U.S.A., LLC by RiKaleigh C. Johnson (Johnson, RiKaleigh) (Entered: 01/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff H-D U.S.A., LLC by Amy Crout Ziegler (Ziegler, Amy) (Entered: 01/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff H-D U.S.A., LLC by Justin R. Gaudio (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 01/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 01/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION by Plaintiff H-D U.S.A., LLC for leave to file under seal (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 01/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SEALED EXHIBIT by Plaintiff H-D U.S.A., LLC Schedule A regarding complaint #1 (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 01/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed by H-D U.S.A., LLC; Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-17873378. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 01/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where H-D U.S.A. LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A" is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Konrad Val Sherinian

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Shengmao Mu