This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/27/2019 at 07:07:07 (UTC).

H-D U.S.A., LLC v. The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A"

Case Summary

On 05/28/2019 H-D U S A , LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Trademark lawsuit against The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Gary Feinerman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-03547

  • Filing Date:

    05/28/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Trademark

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Gary Feinerman

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

H-D U.S.A., LLC

Defendants

The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A"

Shop4816005 Store

HLLZH Official Store

Customes World

Dulipyu Store

TshirtLink Store

Ao Mi Ke Rong Official Store

TCMT Authorization Store

Emmanuel Store

YIMING JEWEIRY STORE

Shop4401081 Store

NINEN Store

YogaGift Store

Roulan Motorcycle supplies Store

WIPU.2 Store

VEMIKYSION Manufacturer of Car Light Store

Shop4968046 Store

China Very Good Store

PandW Store

131 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Amy Crout Ziegler

Attorney at Greer, Burns & Crain, Ltd.

300 S. Wacker Dr., Suite 2500

Chicago, IL 60606

RiKaleigh C. Johnson

Attorney at Greer, Burns & Crain

300 South Wacker Drive, Suite 2500

Chicago, IL 60606

Justin R. Gaudio

Attorney at Greer Burns & Crain Ltd

300 South Wacker Drive, Suite 2500

Chicago, IL 60606

Allyson M. Martin

Attorney at Greer, Burns & Crain Ltd.

300 S. Wacker Drive, Suite 2500

Chicago, IL 60606

Jake Michael Christensen

Attorney at Greer, Burns & Crain

300 S Wacker Drive, #2500

Chicago, IL 60606

 

Court Documents

#44

43 #2

Exhibit 1

43 #1

Declaration of Justin R. Gaudio

#43

#42

#41

#40

#39

#10

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #2

Schedule A

1 #1

Exhibit 1

#1

70 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#44) NOTICE of Motion by Justin R. Gaudio for presentment of motion for entry of default, motion for default judgment #42 before Honorable Gary Feinerman on 7/31/2019 at 09:00 AM. (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 07/26/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#43) MEMORANDUM by H-D U.S.A., LLC in support of motion for entry of default, motion for default judgment #42 (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Justin R. Gaudio, #2 Exhibit 1)(Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 07/26/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#42) MOTION by Plaintiff H-D U.S.A., LLC for entry of default , MOTION by Plaintiff H-D U.S.A., LLC for default judgment as to all Defendants with the exception of a certain Defendant (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 07/26/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#41) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by H-D U.S.A., LLC as to certain Defendants (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 07/26/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#40) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by H-D U.S.A., LLC as to certain Defendants (Johnson, RiKaleigh) (Entered: 07/25/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#39) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:At the Plaintiff's request, the status hearing set for 7/17/2019 #10 is stricken.Mailed notice. (jlj, ) (Entered: 07/15/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#38) PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION ORDER Signed by the Honorable Gary Feinerman on 7/8/2019.Mailed notice.(jlj, ) (Entered: 07/08/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#37) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Motion hearing held. For the reasons stated on the record, Plaintiff's motion for preliminary injunction #32 is granted. Enter preliminary injunction order. Status hearing set for 9/10/2019 at 9:00 a.m.Mailed notice. (jlj, ) (Entered: 07/08/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#36) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff H-D U.S.A., LLC by Allyson M. Martin (Martin, Allyson) (Entered: 07/03/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#35) SUMMONS Returned Executed by H-D U.S.A., LLC as to The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A" on 7/3/2019, answer due 7/24/2019. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jake M. Christensen)(Christensen, Jake) (Entered: 07/03/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
26 More Docket Entries
  • 05/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (tt, ) (Entered: 05/29/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MAILED to plaintiff(s) counsel Lanham Mediation Program materials. (tt, ) (Entered: 05/29/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MAILED Trademark report to Patent Trademark Office, Alexandria VA (Attachments: #1 Registration Numbers) (tt, ) (Entered: 05/29/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Gary Feinerman. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey Cole. Case assignment: Random assignment. (jn, ) (Entered: 05/29/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION by Plaintiff H-D U.S.A., LLC for leave to file under seal (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 05/28/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff H-D U.S.A., LLC by RiKaleigh C. Johnson (Johnson, RiKaleigh) (Entered: 05/28/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff H-D U.S.A., LLC by Amy Crout Ziegler (Ziegler, Amy) (Entered: 05/28/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff H-D U.S.A., LLC by Justin R. Gaudio (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 05/28/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 05/28/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed by H-D U.S.A., LLC; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15870369. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Schedule A)(Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 05/28/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Shop4968046 Store is a litigant

Latest cases where H-D U.S.A. LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A" is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer RiKaleigh C. Johnson