This case was last updated from PACER on 04/27/2021 at 10:08:08 (UTC).

Gyro-Trac Corporation v. Fecon, LLC

Case Summary

On 02/26/2021 Gyro-Trac Corporation filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Fecon, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Delaware District. The Judge overseeing this case is Leonard P. Stark. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-00303

  • Filing Date:

    02/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Courthouse:

    Delaware District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Leonard P. Stark

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Gyro-Trac Corporation

Defendant

Fecon, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Nathan Roger Hoeschen

Attorney at Shaw Keller LLP

1105 North Market Street, 12Th Floor

Wilmington, DE 19801

Karen Elizabeth Keller

Attorney at Shaw Keller LLP

1105 North Market Street, 12Th Floor

Wilmington, DE 19801

Defendant Attorneys

Paul M. Ulrich

James Darlington Taylor, Jr.

Attorney at Saul Ewing Arnstein & Lehr LLP

1201 N. Market Street, Suite 2300, P.O. Box 1266

Wilmington, DE 19899

John F. Bennett

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney John Bennett and Paul Ulrich - filed by Fecon, LLC. (Taylor, James) (Entered: 03/24/2021)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by James Darlington Taylor, Jr on behalf of Fecon, LLC (Taylor, James) (Entered: 03/24/2021)

#5

(#5) Summonses Issued (please complete the top portion of the form and print out for use/service). (kmd) (Entered: 02/26/2021)

#4

(#4) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed - filed by Gyro-Trac Corporation. (kmd) (Entered: 02/26/2021)

#3

(#3) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) US 8,167,225 B2; US 8,893,997 B2. (kmd) (Entered: 02/26/2021)

#2

(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (kmd) (Entered: 02/26/2021)

1 #7

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #6

Exhibit 6

1 #5

Exhibit 5

1 #4

Exhibit 4

1 #3

Exhibit 3

1 #2

Exhibit 2

1 #1

Exhibit 1

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against Fecon, LLC - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. (Filing fee $402, receipt number ADEDC-3550402.) - filed by Gyro-Trac Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(kmd) (Entered: 02/26/2021)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/31/2021
  • DocketPro Hac Vice Attorneys John F. Bennett and Paul M. Ulrich for Fecon, LLC added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (kmd) (Entered: 03/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSO ORDERED, re #7 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney John Bennett and Paul Ulrich filed by Fecon, LLC. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 3/25/21. (ntl) (Entered: 03/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney John Bennett and Paul Ulrich - filed by Fecon, LLC. (Taylor, James) (Entered: 03/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by James Darlington Taylor, Jr on behalf of Fecon, LLC (Taylor, James) (Entered: 03/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Leonard P. Stark. Please include the initials of the Judge (LPS) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb) (Entered: 03/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summonses Issued (please complete the top portion of the form and print out for use/service). (kmd) (Entered: 02/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed - filed by Gyro-Trac Corporation. (kmd) (Entered: 02/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) US 8,167,225 B2; US 8,893,997 B2. (kmd) (Entered: 02/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (kmd) (Entered: 02/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against Fecon, LLC - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. (Filing fee $402, receipt number ADEDC-3550402.) - filed by Gyro-Trac Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(kmd) (Entered: 02/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Fecon, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Paul M Ulrich

Latest cases represented by Lawyer John Francis Bennett

Latest cases represented by Lawyer James Darlington Taylor, Jr.