This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/24/2022 at 08:03:41 (UTC).

GWIAZDA v. LVNV FUNDING, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 02/23/2022 GWIAZDA filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against LVNV FUNDING, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Eastern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is CHAD F. KENNEY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-00698

  • Filing Date:

    02/23/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

CHAD F. KENNEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KATHRYN GWIAZDA

Defendants

LVNV FUNDING, LLC

PATENAUDE & FELIX, A.P.C.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ROBERT F. SALVIN

Attorney at Philadelphia Consumer Law, Robert F. Salvin, Attorney

Two Bala Plaza, Suite 300

Bala Cynwyd, PA 19004

Defendant Attorney

LAUREN M. BURNETTE

Attorney at Messer Strickler Burnette, Ltd.

12276 San Jose Blvd., Suite 718

Jacksonville, FL 32223

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) NOTICE of Hearing: ARBITRATION HEARING SET FOR 8/3/2022 09:30 AM IN COURTROOM 5D.(sah) (Entered: 04/19/2022)

11 #1

Consent Form

11 #11

Main Document

10 #1

Exhibit A

10 #10

Main Document

9 #1

Exhibit A

9 #9

Main Document

#8

(#8) NOTICE THAT COUNSEL SHALL FILE THE AFFIDAVIT(S) OF SERVICE, AS TO DEFENDANTS LVNV FUNDING, LLC AND PATENAUDE & FELIX, A.P.C., ON ECF, ON OR BEFORE 4/18/22. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CHAD F. KENNEY ON 3/28/22. 3/28/22 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas) (Entered: 03/28/2022)

#7

(#7) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including None with Certificate of Service by PATENAUDE & FELIX, A.P.C..(BURNETTE, LAUREN) (Entered: 03/28/2022)

#6

(#6) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including Sherman Originator, LLC with Certificate of Service by LVNV FUNDING, LLC.(BURNETTE, LAUREN) (Entered: 03/28/2022)

#5

(#5) ANSWER to Complaint together with with Affirmative Defenses by PATENAUDE & FELIX, A.P.C..(BURNETTE, LAUREN) (Entered: 03/28/2022)

#4

(#4) ANSWER to Complaint together with with Affirmative Defenses by LVNV FUNDING, LLC.(BURNETTE, LAUREN) (Entered: 03/28/2022)

#3

(#3) NOTICE TO THE PARTIES THAT THIS CASE HAS BEEN FLAGGED AS ELIGIBLE FOR MANDATORY ARBITRATION AND AN ARBITRATION HEARING WILL BE SCHEDULED WITHIN APPROXIMATELY 120 DAYS OF THE FILING OF AN ANSWER, ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CHAD F. KENNEY ON 2/24/22. 2/24/22 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas) (Entered: 02/24/2022)

#2

(#2) ORDER THAT COUNSEL CONTEMPLATING FILING A MOTION UNDER F.R.C.P.12(B)(6), (E), OR (F), SHALL FIRST CONTACT OPPOSING COUNSEL TO DISCUSS THE SUBSTANCE OF THE CONTEMPLATED MOTION AND TO PROVIDE AN OPPORTUNITY TO CURE ANY ALLEGED PLEADING DEFICIENCIES OR STRIKE CERTAIN MATTER. THIS CONFERENCE SHALL TAKE PLACE AT LEAST 7 DAYS BEFORE THE FILING OF THE MOTION, ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CHAD F. KENNEY ON 2/24/22. 2/24/22 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas) (Entered: 02/24/2022)

1 #6

Administrative Forms

1 #3

Exhibit P-3

1 #2

Exhibit P-2

1 #1

Main Document

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE of Hearing: ARBITRATION HEARING SET FOR 8/3/2022 09:30 AM IN COURTROOM 5D.(sah) (Entered: 04/19/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Notice Re: Arbitration Videoconference (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(mcos, ) (Entered: 04/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) AFFIDAVIT of Service by USPS re: served Summons and Complaint upon Bryan Faliero through his authorized agent by certified mail, return receipt, restricted deliver on 03/07/2022 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(SALVIN, ROBERT) (Entered: 03/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) AFFIDAVIT of Service by USPS re: served Summons and Complaint upon Raymond Patenaude by certified mail, return receipt, restricted deliver on 03/07/2022 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(SALVIN, ROBERT) (Entered: 03/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE THAT COUNSEL SHALL FILE THE AFFIDAVIT(S) OF SERVICE, AS TO DEFENDANTS LVNV FUNDING, LLC AND PATENAUDE & FELIX, A.P.C., ON ECF, ON OR BEFORE 4/18/22. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CHAD F. KENNEY ON 3/28/22. 3/28/22 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas) (Entered: 03/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including None with Certificate of Service by PATENAUDE & FELIX, A.P.C..(BURNETTE, LAUREN) (Entered: 03/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including Sherman Originator, LLC with Certificate of Service by LVNV FUNDING, LLC.(BURNETTE, LAUREN) (Entered: 03/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ANSWER to Complaint together with with Affirmative Defenses by PATENAUDE & FELIX, A.P.C..(BURNETTE, LAUREN) (Entered: 03/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ANSWER to Complaint together with with Affirmative Defenses by LVNV FUNDING, LLC.(BURNETTE, LAUREN) (Entered: 03/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • DocketSummons Issued as to LVNV FUNDING, LLC, PATENAUDE & FELIX, A.P.C.. Forwarded To: PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL on 2/25/22 (amas) (Entered: 02/25/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE TO THE PARTIES THAT THIS CASE HAS BEEN FLAGGED AS ELIGIBLE FOR MANDATORY ARBITRATION AND AN ARBITRATION HEARING WILL BE SCHEDULED WITHIN APPROXIMATELY 120 DAYS OF THE FILING OF AN ANSWER, ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CHAD F. KENNEY ON 2/24/22. 2/24/22 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas) (Entered: 02/24/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ORDER THAT COUNSEL CONTEMPLATING FILING A MOTION UNDER F.R.C.P.12(B)(6), (E), OR (F), SHALL FIRST CONTACT OPPOSING COUNSEL TO DISCUSS THE SUBSTANCE OF THE CONTEMPLATED MOTION AND TO PROVIDE AN OPPORTUNITY TO CURE ANY ALLEGED PLEADING DEFICIENCIES OR STRIKE CERTAIN MATTER. THIS CONFERENCE SHALL TAKE PLACE AT LEAST 7 DAYS BEFORE THE FILING OF THE MOTION, ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CHAD F. KENNEY ON 2/24/22. 2/24/22 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas) (Entered: 02/24/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number APAEDC-15745243.), filed by KATHRYN GWIAZDA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit P-1, #2 Exhibit P-2, #3 Exhibit P-3, #4 Exhibit P-4, #5 Exhibit P-5, #6 Administrative Forms)(SALVIN, ROBERT) (Entered: 02/23/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PATENAUDE & FELIX is a litigant

Latest cases where LVNV FUNDING LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lauren M. Burnette