This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/29/2022 at 08:18:56 (UTC).

Gwenique Williams v. OGara Coach, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 04/30/2022 Gwenique Williams filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against OGara Coach, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr and Jean P. Rosenbluth. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-02928

  • Filing Date:

    04/30/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr

Referral Judge

Jean P. Rosenbluth

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Gwenique Williams

West Hollywood, CA 90046

Defendants

OGara Coach, LLC

Evan Paul Auto Capital, LLC

Roll-Royce Motor Cars NA, LLC

Does 1 to 100, inclusive

Merchants Bonding Company

Doe

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

Benjamin Thomas Runge

Attorney at Kolar and Associates

12241 Newport Avenue

Santa Ana, CA 92705

Jonathan Thomas Martinez

Attorney at Kolar and Associates

12241 Newport Avenue

Santa Ana, CA 92705

Elizabeth L Kolar

Attorney at Kolar and Associates

12241 Newport Ave

Santa Ana, CA 92705

Jimmy Lee Ma

Attorney at Stroock and Stroock and Lavan LLP

2029 Century Park East 18Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Arjun P Rao

Attorney at Stroock and Stroock and Lavan LLP

2029 Century Park East 18Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90067-3086

 

Court Documents

#72

(#72) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #69 . The following error(s) was/were found: Hearing information is missing, incorrect, or not timely. Hearing date of 7/22/2022 is untimely pursuant to Local Rule 6-1. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (gk) (Entered: 06/28/2022)

#71

(#71) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants OGara Coach, LLC, identifying O'Gara Coach Company, LLC. (Kolar, Elizabeth) (Entered: 06/27/2022)

#70

(#70) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Merchants Bonding Company, identifying Merchants Bonding Company (Mutual); Merchants National Bonding, Inc; Merchants Bonding Group, Inc.. (Kolar, Elizabeth) (Entered: 06/27/2022)

69 #1

Proposed Order

69 #69

Main Document

#68

(#68) Certification and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Roll-Royce Motor Cars NA, LLC, identifying BMW (US) Holding Corp.. (Rao, Arjun) (Entered: 06/22/2022)

#67

(#67) RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr. The document (Dkt. No. #64 ) is accepted as filed. The filer has until close of business day (4:30 PM PST) on June 22, 2022 to file their Notice of Interested Parties in accordance with LR 7.1-2 and the Notice to Filer of Deficiencies Dkt. No. #66 . (jgr) (Entered: 06/21/2022)

#66

(#66) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Complaint #64 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 7.1-1 No Notice of Interested Parties and/or no copies. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (gk) (Entered: 06/21/2022)

64 #1

Proposed Order Granting Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss Complaint

64 #64

Main Document

#5

(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr and Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth. (sh) (Entered: 05/03/2022)

4 #1

Summons 2

4 #4

Main Document

#3

(#3) APPLICATION for Pro Se Litigant to electronically file documents in a specific case filed by Plaintiff Gwenique Williams. (sh) (Entered: 05/03/2022)

#2

(#2) CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Gwenique Williams, (sh) (Entered: 05/03/2022)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Complaint Part 2

1 #1

Main Document

60 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#72) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #69 . The following error(s) was/were found: Hearing information is missing, incorrect, or not timely. Hearing date of 7/22/2022 is untimely pursuant to Local Rule 6-1. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (gk) (Entered: 06/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#71) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants OGara Coach, LLC, identifying O'Gara Coach Company, LLC. (Kolar, Elizabeth) (Entered: 06/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#70) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Merchants Bonding Company, identifying Merchants Bonding Company (Mutual); Merchants National Bonding, Inc; Merchants Bonding Group, Inc.. (Kolar, Elizabeth) (Entered: 06/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#69) NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendant OGara Coach, LLC. Motion set for hearing on 7/22/2022 at 08:30 AM before Judge Stanley Blumenfeld Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Kolar, Elizabeth) (Entered: 06/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#68) Certification and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Roll-Royce Motor Cars NA, LLC, identifying BMW (US) Holding Corp.. (Rao, Arjun) (Entered: 06/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#67) RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr. The document (Dkt. No. #64 ) is accepted as filed. The filer has until close of business day (4:30 PM PST) on June 22, 2022 to file their Notice of Interested Parties in accordance with LR 7.1-2 and the Notice to Filer of Deficiencies Dkt. No. #66 . (jgr) (Entered: 06/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#66) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Complaint #64 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 7.1-1 No Notice of Interested Parties and/or no copies. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (gk) (Entered: 06/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#65) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr. The Court sets an in-person Mandatory Scheduling Conference set for hearing on July 22, 2022 at 8:30 AM before Judge Stanley Blumenfeld Jr. The parties shall file a Joint Rule 26(f) Report by July 12, 2022. SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER DETAILS. (jgr) (Entered: 06/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#64) NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Complaint filed by Defendant Roll-Royce Motor Cars NA, LLC. Motion set for hearing on 7/22/2022 at 08:30 AM before Judge Stanley Blumenfeld Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss Complaint) (Rao, Arjun) (Entered: 06/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#63) MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER DENYING SECOND STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO FOURTH AMENDED COMPLAINT #60 by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr. See document for details. Court Reporter: N/A. (gk) (Entered: 06/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
51 More Docket Entries
  • 05/03/2022
  • Docket(#10) MEMORANDUM of Points and Authorities in Support of APPLICATION for Temporary Restraining Order and Motion for a Preliminary Injunction #8 filed by Plaintiff Gwenique Williams. (sh) (Entered: 05/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • Docket(#9) MEMORANDUM of Points and Authorities in Support of APPLICATION for Temporary Restraining Order and Motion for a Preliminary Injunction #8 filed by Plaintiff Gwenique Williams. (sh) (Entered: 05/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • Docket(#8) APPLICATION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Plaintiff Gwenique Williams. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (sh) (Entered: 05/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • Docket(#7) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (sh) (Entered: 05/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (sh) (Entered: 05/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr and Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth. (sh) (Entered: 05/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint - (Discovery), #1 as to Defendants Evan Paul Auto Capital, LLC, OGara Coach, LLC, Roll-Royce Motor Cars NA, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons 2)(sh) (Entered: 05/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) APPLICATION for Pro Se Litigant to electronically file documents in a specific case filed by Plaintiff Gwenique Williams. (sh) (Entered: 05/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Gwenique Williams, (sh) (Entered: 05/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Defendants Does, Evan Paul Auto Capital, LLC, OGara Coach, LLC, Roll-Royce Motor Cars NA, LLC.Case assigned to Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr for all further proceedings. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth.(Filing fee $ 402 PAID) Jury Demanded., filed by Plaintiff Gwenique Williams. (Attachments: #1 Complaint Part 2, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (sh) (Entered: 05/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Evan Paul Auto Capital, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where OGARA COACH COMPANY LLC DBA MCLAREN BEVERLY HILLS A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where ROLLS-ROYCE MOTOR CARS NA LLC A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where MERCHANTS BONDING COMPANY A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant