This case was last updated from PACER on 09/05/2020 at 11:21:57 (UTC).

GWC Properties, Inc. v. Maxum Casualty Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 07/07/2020 GWC Properties, Inc filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Maxum Casualty Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Mississippi Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Sharion Aycock, David A. Sanders and Debra M. Brown. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00143

  • Filing Date:

    07/07/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Referral Judge

David A. Sanders

Presiding Judges

Sharion Aycock

Debra M. Brown

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GWC Properties, Inc.

Defendant

Maxum Casualty Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Richard Shane McLaughlin

Attorney at MCLAUGHLIN LAW FIRM

P.O. Box 200

Tupelo, MS 38802

Defendant Attorneys

John W. Johnson

Attorney at CHRISTIAN & SMALL, LLP

505 20Th Street North, Suite 1800

Birmingham, AL 35203

Shauncey Hunter Ridgeway

Attorney at Christian & Small, LLP

409 W. Parkway Place, Suite 200

Ridgeland, MS 39157

Priscilla K. Williams

Attorney at CHRISTIAN & SMALL LLP

505 20Th Street N.

Birmingham, AL 35203

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Priscilla K. Williams on behalf of Maxum Casualty Insurance Company (Williams, Priscilla)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John W. Johnson on behalf of Maxum Casualty Insurance Company (Johnson, John)

#8

(#8) INITIAL ORDER - RULE 16.1 Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 9/10/2020 at 10:00 AM from Amory Tele-Conference before Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders. Proposed Case Management Order and Confidential Settlement Memos due by 9/3/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders on 7/30/2020. (jf)

4 #19

Exhibit Letter re Order of Severance

4 #18

Exhibit Order of Severance

4 #16

Exhibit Order Granting Motion for Leave to File Rebuttal

4 #15

Exhibit Rebuttal

4 #14

Exhibit Proposed Order

4 #13

Exhibit Motion for Leave re Rebuttal

4 #11

Exhibit Notice of Hearing

4 #10

Exhibit Response

4 #9

Exhibit Memo re Motion to Sever

4 #8

Exhibit Motion to Sever & Cover Letter

4 #7

Exhibit Memo re Motion to Sever

4 #6

Exhibit Motion to Sever

4 #5

Exhibit Answer

4 #4

Exhibit Summons & POS

#4

(#4) STATE COURT RECORD - REMOVAL. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Motion for Leave to File 3rd Party Complaint, #2 Exhibit Order Granting Leave to File 3rd Party Complaint, #3 Exhibit Third Party Complaint, #4 Exhibit Summons & POS, #5 Exhibit Answer, #6 Exhibit Motion to Sever, #7 Exhibit Memo re Motion to Sever, #8 Exhibit Motion to Sever & Cover Letter, #9 Exhibit Memo re Motion to Sever, #10 Exhibit Response, #11 Exhibit Notice of Hearing, #12 Exhibit Motion for Leave re Rebuttal, #13 Exhibit Motion for Leave re Rebuttal, #14 Exhibit Proposed Order, #15 Exhibit Rebuttal, #16 Exhibit Order Granting Motion for Leave to File Rebuttal, #17 Exhibit Notice of Appearance, #18 Exhibit Order of Severance, #19 Exhibit Letter re Order of Severance) (Ridgeway, Shauncey)

23 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/02/2020
  • DocketTEXT NOTICE Continuing Case Management Conference due to settlement. (cs)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Priscilla K. Williams on behalf of Maxum Casualty Insurance Company (Williams, Priscilla)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John W. Johnson on behalf of Maxum Casualty Insurance Company (Johnson, John)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) INITIAL ORDER - RULE 16.1 Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 9/10/2020 at 10:00 AM from Amory Tele-Conference before Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders. Proposed Case Management Order and Confidential Settlement Memos due by 9/3/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders on 7/30/2020. (jf)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ANSWER to State Court Complaint by Maxum Casualty Insurance Company (filed in state court, see Doc #4 ). (jla)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER OF RECUSAL. District Judge Sharion Aycock recused. Case reassigned to District Judge Debra M. Brown for all further proceedings. Signed by District Judge Sharion Aycock on 7/10/20. (jla)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CORPORATE STATEMENT . (Ridgeway, Shauncey)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) STATE COURT RECORD - REMOVAL. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Motion for Leave to File 3rd Party Complaint, #2 Exhibit Order Granting Leave to File 3rd Party Complaint, #3 Exhibit Third Party Complaint, #4 Exhibit Summons & POS, #5 Exhibit Answer, #6 Exhibit Motion to Sever, #7 Exhibit Memo re Motion to Sever, #8 Exhibit Motion to Sever & Cover Letter, #9 Exhibit Memo re Motion to Sever, #10 Exhibit Response, #11 Exhibit Notice of Hearing, #12 Exhibit Motion for Leave re Rebuttal, #13 Exhibit Motion for Leave re Rebuttal, #14 Exhibit Proposed Order, #15 Exhibit Rebuttal, #16 Exhibit Order Granting Motion for Leave to File Rebuttal, #17 Exhibit Notice of Appearance, #18 Exhibit Order of Severance, #19 Exhibit Letter re Order of Severance) (Ridgeway, Shauncey)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Mandatory Electronic Case Filing as to John W. Johnson and Priscilla K. Williams (jla)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Aycock and Magistrate Judge Sanders. (jla)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) STATE COURT COMPLAINT against Maxum Casualty Insurance Company, filed by GWC Properties, Inc.. (jla) (Entered: 07/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Maxum Casualty Insurance Company from Itawamba County Circuit Court, case number CV20-113(F)I. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0537-1825933) Pursuant to Local Uniform Civil Rule 5(b) and the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing for the Northern District of Mississippi, the removing defendant must electronically file a copy of the entire state court record within 14 days of the date of removal. The state court record will be filed using the event State Court Record - Removal. Attach the Notice/Certificate of Filing State Court Record as the main document with each state court document attached as a separate PDF. All attachments must be clearly identified. The state court record can not be filed conventionally., filed by Maxum Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (jla) (Entered: 07/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Maxum Casualty Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Shauncey Hunter Ridgeway

Latest cases represented by Lawyer John W Johnson, II