This case was last updated from PACER on 08/06/2019 at 07:23:02 (UTC).

GVB MD, v. Aetna Health Inc.

Case Summary

On 06/07/2019 GVB MD filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Aetna Health Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Federico A. Moreno. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-22357

  • Filing Date:

    06/07/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Federico A. Moreno

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

GVB MD, d/b/a MIAMI BACK AND NECK SPECIALISTS

901 E Las Olas Blvd., Suite 202

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33301

GVB MD

Defendant

Aetna Health Inc.

7777 Glades Rd, Suite 400

Boca Raton, FL 33434

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

David DiPietro

Attorney at Di Pietro Partners, LLP

901 East Las Olas Blvd., Suite 202

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33301

Nicole Marie Martell

Attorney at Di Pietro Partners

901 East Las Olas Boulevard Suite 202, Suite 202

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33301

Lisandra Estevez

Attorney at David Di Pietro , Associates, P.A.

101 Ne 3Rd Ave., Suite 1410

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33301

Defendant Attorneys

David J. DePiano

Attorney at Shapiro, Blasi, Wasserman & Hermann, P.A.

7777 Glades Road, Suite 400

Boca Raton, FL 33434

Genevieve Lee Baisden

Attorney at Shapiro, Blasi, Wasserman & Hermann, P.A.

7777 Glades Road, Suite 400

Boca Raton, FL 33434

Richard Philip Hermann, II.

Attorney at Shapiro, Blasi, Wasserman & Hermann, P.A.

7777 Glades Road, Suite 400, Suite 400

Boca Raton, FL 33434

 

Court Documents

#16

(#16) STATUS REPORT Regarding Removal by Aetna Health Inc. (DePiano, David) (Entered: 07/23/2019)

#15

(#15) NOTICE of Compliance by GVB MD (Martell, Nicole) (Entered: 07/18/2019)

#7

(#7) Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss the State Court Complaint contained within the Notice of Removal #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), by Aetna Health Inc.. Responses due by 7/2/2019 (DePiano, David) (Entered: 06/18/2019)

#14

(#14) REPLY to Response to Motion re #7 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss the State Court Complaint contained within the Notice of Removal #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), filed by Aetna Health Inc.. (DePiano, David) (Entered: 07/16/2019)

1 #1

Exhibit State Court filings: Complaint, Plaintiff's Request for Production,

1 #3

Exhibit Notice of Filing Notice of Removal

1 #2

Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet

1 #4

Exhibit Declaration of Elizabeth Petrozelli

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - Complaint) Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11713259, filed by Aetna Health Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court filings: Complaint, Plaintiff's Request for Production, Summons, Defendant's Notice of Appearance and Email Designations, #2 Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #4 Exhibit Declaration of Elizabeth Petrozelli)(DePiano, David) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

#13

(#13) Notice of Court Practice in Removal Cases. Report must be filed no later than July 23, 2019. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 7/8/2019. See attached document for full details. (ap00) (Entered: 07/09/2019)

11 #1

Text of Proposed Order Granting Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Enlargemen

#11

(#11) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #10 Response/Reply (Other) by Aetna Health Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time to Reply to Plaintiff's Response in Opposition of Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Count I and Counts III Through VII of Plaintiff's Complaint)(Baisden, Genevieve) (Entered: 07/03/2019)

#10

(#10) Plaintiff's RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION by GVB MD. (Martell, Nicole) (Entered: 07/02/2019)

6 #1

Exhibit Proposed Order

#6

(#6) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint by Aetna Health Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Order)(Hermann, Richard) (Entered: 06/14/2019)

#9

(#9) ORDER Granting #6 Nunc Pro Tunc Motion for Enlargement of Time. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 6/25/2019. See attached document for full details. (ap00) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

#8

(#8) ORDER Requiring Attorney David Di Pietro to Become and Admitted Member of the Southern District of Florida. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 6/18/2019. See attached document for full details. (ap00) (Entered: 06/18/2019)

#5

(#5) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Aetna Health Inc. identifying Corporate Parent CVS Health Corporation for Aetna Health Inc. (DePiano, David) (Entered: 06/14/2019)

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) STATUS REPORT Regarding Removal by Aetna Health Inc. (DePiano, David) (Entered: 07/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) NOTICE of Compliance by GVB MD (Martell, Nicole) (Entered: 07/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) REPLY to Response to Motion re #7 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss the State Court Complaint contained within the Notice of Removal #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), filed by Aetna Health Inc.. (DePiano, David) (Entered: 07/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings as to #7 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss the State Court Complaint contained within the Notice of Removal #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), . Responses due by 7/16/2019. per DE 12 (cbr) (Entered: 07/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) Notice of Court Practice in Removal Cases. Report must be filed no later than July 23, 2019. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 7/8/2019. See attached document for full details. (ap00) (Entered: 07/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) PAPERLESS ORDER Granting #11 Motion for Enlargement of Time. Reply must be filed no later than July 16, 2019. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 7/9/2019. (ap00) (Entered: 07/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #10 Response/Reply (Other) by Aetna Health Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time to Reply to Plaintiff's Response in Opposition of Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Count I and Counts III Through VII of Plaintiff's Complaint)(Baisden, Genevieve) (Entered: 07/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Plaintiff's RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION by GVB MD. (Martell, Nicole) (Entered: 07/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER Granting #6 Nunc Pro Tunc Motion for Enlargement of Time. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 6/25/2019. See attached document for full details. (ap00) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ORDER Requiring Attorney David Di Pietro to Become and Admitted Member of the Southern District of Florida. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 6/18/2019. See attached document for full details. (ap00) (Entered: 06/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss the State Court Complaint contained within the Notice of Removal #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), by Aetna Health Inc.. Responses due by 7/2/2019 (DePiano, David) (Entered: 06/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint by Aetna Health Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Order)(Hermann, Richard) (Entered: 06/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Aetna Health Inc. identifying Corporate Parent CVS Health Corporation for Aetna Health Inc. (DePiano, David) (Entered: 06/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by David DiPietro on behalf of GVB MD. Attorney David DiPietro added to party GVB MD(pty:pla). (DiPietro, David) (Entered: 06/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Bar Letter re: Admissions sent to attorney David Di Pietro, mailing date June 10, 2019, (pt) (Entered: 06/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • (#2) Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Federico A. Moreno. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Lauren F. Louis is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (mee) (Entered: 06/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - Complaint) Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11713259, filed by Aetna Health Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court filings: Complaint, Plaintiff's Request for Production, Summons, Defendant's Notice of Appearance and Email Designations, #2 Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #4 Exhibit Declaration of Elizabeth Petrozelli)(DePiano, David) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.