This case was last updated from PACER on 10/17/2020 at 10:29:03 (UTC).

GUZMAN v. COOK INCORPORATED et al

Case Summary

On 08/18/2020 GUZMAN filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against COOK INCORPORATED. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Indiana Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Matthew P. Brookman, Jane Magnus-Stinson, Richard L. Young and Tim A. Baker. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-02174

  • Filing Date:

    08/18/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Indiana Southern District

Judge Details

Referral Judges

Matthew P. Brookman

Tim A. Baker

Presiding Judges

Jane Magnus-Stinson

Richard L. Young

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MARIBEL GUZMAN

Defendants

COOK MEDICAL, LLC

COOK INCORPORATED

WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS

COOK MEDICAL LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Michael Joseph Quillin

Attorney at O'LEARY, SHELTON, CORRIGAN, PETERSON, DALTON & QUILLIN

1034 S. Brentwood Blvd., Penthouse 1-A, 23Rd Floor

St. Louis, MO 63117

Defendant Attorneys

Andrea Roberts Pierson

Attorney at FAEGRE DRINKER BIDDLE & REATH LLP (Indianapolis)

300 North Meridian Street, Suite 2500

Indianapolis, IN 46204

Kip S.M. McDonald

Attorney at FAEGRE DRINKER BIDDLE & REATH LLP (Indianapolis)

300 North Meridian Street, Suite 2500

Indianapolis, IN 46204

 

Court Documents

#4

(#4) MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (REO) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Reassignment pursuant to General Order dated July 13, 2016 of Case to Judge Richard L. Young and Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker. Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson, Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman are no longer assigned to this case. Please include the new case number, 1:20-cv-02174-RLY-TAB, on all future filings in this matter. (REO) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

#5

(#5) Second Amended Order Establishing Policies and Procedures. Signed by Judge Richard L. Young on 9/11/2020.(LBT) (Entered: 09/11/2020)

#9

(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Andrea Roberts Pierson on behalf of Defendants COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS. Associated Cases: 1:14-ml-02570-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-06104-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-06105-RLY-TAB, 1:20-cv-01996-RLY-TAB, 1:20-cv-02171-RLY-TAB, 1:20-cv-02174-RLY-TAB, 1:20-cv-02177-RLY-TAB, 1:20-cv-02181-RLY-TAB, 1:20-cv-02182-RLY-TAB, 1:20-cv-02188-RLY-TAB, 1:20-cv-02190-RLY-TAB, 1:20-cv-02192-RLY-TAB, 1:20-cv-02194-RLY-TAB, 1:20-cv-02196-RLY-TAB, 1:20-cv-06203-RLY-TAB, 1:20-cv-06206-RLY-TAB, 1:20-cv-06212-RLY-TAB, 1:20-cv-06223-RLY-TAB (Pierson, Andrea) (Entered: 09/15/2020)

#8

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Kip S.M. McDonald on behalf of Defendants COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS. Associated Cases: 1:14-ml-02570-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-06104-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-06105-RLY-TAB, 1:20-cv-01996-RLY-TAB, 1:20-cv-02171-RLY-TAB, 1:20-cv-02174-RLY-TAB, 1:20-cv-02177-RLY-TAB, 1:20-cv-02181-RLY-TAB, 1:20-cv-02182-RLY-TAB, 1:20-cv-02188-RLY-TAB, 1:20-cv-02190-RLY-TAB, 1:20-cv-02192-RLY-TAB, 1:20-cv-02194-RLY-TAB, 1:20-cv-02196-RLY-TAB, 1:20-cv-06203-RLY-TAB, 1:20-cv-06206-RLY-TAB, 1:20-cv-06212-RLY-TAB, 1:20-cv-06223-RLY-TAB (McDonald, Kip) (Entered: 09/15/2020)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Joseph Quillin on behalf of Plaintiff MARIBEL GUZMAN. (Quillin, Michael) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by MARIBEL GUZMAN. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-6136644) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Quillin, Michael) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Andrea Roberts Pierson on behalf of Defendants COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS. Associated Cases: 1:14-ml-02570-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-06104-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-06105-RLY-TAB, 1:20-cv-01996-RLY-TAB, 1:20-cv-02171-RLY-TAB, 1:20-cv-02174-RLY-TAB, 1:20-cv-02177-RLY-TAB, 1:20-cv-02181-RLY-TAB, 1:20-cv-02182-RLY-TAB, 1:20-cv-02188-RLY-TAB, 1:20-cv-02190-RLY-TAB, 1:20-cv-02192-RLY-TAB, 1:20-cv-02194-RLY-TAB, 1:20-cv-02196-RLY-TAB, 1:20-cv-06203-RLY-TAB, 1:20-cv-06206-RLY-TAB, 1:20-cv-06212-RLY-TAB, 1:20-cv-06223-RLY-TAB (Pierson, Andrea) (Entered: 09/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Kip S.M. McDonald on behalf of Defendants COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS. Associated Cases: 1:14-ml-02570-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-06104-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-06105-RLY-TAB, 1:20-cv-01996-RLY-TAB, 1:20-cv-02171-RLY-TAB, 1:20-cv-02174-RLY-TAB, 1:20-cv-02177-RLY-TAB, 1:20-cv-02181-RLY-TAB, 1:20-cv-02182-RLY-TAB, 1:20-cv-02188-RLY-TAB, 1:20-cv-02190-RLY-TAB, 1:20-cv-02192-RLY-TAB, 1:20-cv-02194-RLY-TAB, 1:20-cv-02196-RLY-TAB, 1:20-cv-06203-RLY-TAB, 1:20-cv-06206-RLY-TAB, 1:20-cv-06212-RLY-TAB, 1:20-cv-06223-RLY-TAB (McDonald, Kip) (Entered: 09/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • Docket(#6) Remark - Pending Actions SD/IN 1:20-cv-02171-RLY-TAB, 1:20-cv-02174-RLY-TAB, 1:20-cv-02177-RLY-TAB, 1:20-cv-02181-RLY-TAB, 1:20-cv-02182-RLY-TAB Transferred as Member Actions to MDL 2570 on 9/11/2020. Associated Cases: 1:14-ml-02570-RLY-TAB, 1:20-cv-02171-RLY-TAB, 1:20-cv-02174-RLY-TAB, 1:20-cv-02177-RLY-TAB, 1:20-cv-02181-RLY-TAB, 1:20-cv-02182-RLY-TAB (LBT) (Entered: 09/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Second Amended Order Establishing Policies and Procedures. Signed by Judge Richard L. Young on 9/11/2020.(LBT) (Entered: 09/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (REO) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Reassignment pursuant to General Order dated July 13, 2016 of Case to Judge Richard L. Young and Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker. Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson, Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman are no longer assigned to this case. Please include the new case number, 1:20-cv-02174-RLY-TAB, on all future filings in this matter. (REO) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Joseph Quillin on behalf of Plaintiff MARIBEL GUZMAN. (Quillin, Michael) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by MARIBEL GUZMAN. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-6136644) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Quillin, Michael) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less