This case was last updated from PACER on 01/17/2020 at 07:15:54 (UTC).

Guzman v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration

Case Summary

On 11/18/2019 Guzman filed a Government Benefit - Social Security Disability lawsuit against Commissioner of Social Security Administration. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Arizona District. The Judge overseeing this case is Diane J Humetewa. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-05640

  • Filing Date:

    11/18/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Social Security Disability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Arizona District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Diane J Humetewa

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Stephanie X Guzman

Phoenix, AZ 85037

Defendant

Commissioner of Social Security Administration

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) ORDER denying #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis without prejudice. Plaintiff may refile a completed Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs or in the alternative pay the case opening fee on or before December 18, 2019. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that if Plaintiff does not refile a completed Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs or pay the case opening fee on or before December 18, 2019, the Clerk of Court shall terminate this action on December 18, 2019 without prejudice and without further order of the Court. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 11/18/19. (CLB) (Entered: 11/19/2019)

#4

RESTRICTED

#3

RESTRICTED

#2

RESTRICTED

#1

RESTRICTED

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MINUTE ORDER: Civil Case Terminated pursuant to (Doc. #5 ). This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (EJA) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ORDER denying #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis without prejudice. Plaintiff may refile a completed Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs or in the alternative pay the case opening fee on or before December 18, 2019. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that if Plaintiff does not refile a completed Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs or pay the case opening fee on or before December 18, 2019, the Clerk of Court shall terminate this action on December 18, 2019 without prejudice and without further order of the Court. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 11/18/19. (CLB) (Entered: 11/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE TO SELF-REPRESENTED LITIGANT re informational documents attached: (1) Notice to Self-Represented Litigant, (2) Federal Court Self-Service Clinic Flyer, (3) Fed. R. Civ. P. 5.2, and (4) Notice and Request re Electronic Noticing. (WLP) (Entered: 11/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) This case has been assigned to the Honorable Diane J Humetewa. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-19-05640-PHX-DJH. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (WLP) (Entered: 11/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Stephanie X Guzman. (WLP) (Entered: 11/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT filed by Stephanie X Guzman. (WLP) (Entered: 11/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.