This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/14/2021 at 10:36:47 (UTC).

Guzman v. Baldridge et al

Case Summary

On 04/15/2021 Guzman filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Baldridge. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Nevada District. The Judges overseeing this case are Elayna J. Youchah and Gloria M. Navarro. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-00620

  • Filing Date:

    04/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Courthouse:

    Nevada District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Elayna J. Youchah

Presiding Judge

Gloria M. Navarro

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Mario Guzman, Jr.

Defendants

C.R. England, Inc.

Audreyonna Baldridge

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Cinema I Greenberg

Attorney at Law Office of Cinema Greenberg, LLC

4435 South Eastern Avenue

Las Vegas, NV 89119

Janet L Merrill

Attorney at The702Firm

400 S. Seventh St., 4Th Fl.

Las Vegas, NV 89101

Bradley J. Myers

Attorney at THE702FIRM

400 South Seventh Street, 4Th Floor

Las Vegas, NV 89101

Tin Hwang

Attorney at Hwang Law Group LLC

2800 S. Jones Blvd., Ste. 2

Las Vegas, NV 89146

Michael C. Kane

Attorney at THE702FIRM

400 S. 7Th Street Suite 400

Las Vegas, NV 89101

Defendant Attorneys

Jonathan C. Pattillo

Attorney at c/o Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman & Dicker

6689 Las Vegas Blvd. South, Suite 200

Las Vegas, NV 89119

Michael P Lowry

Attorney at Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman & Dicker LLP

6689 Las Vegas Blvd. South, Suite 200

Las Vegas, NV 89119

 

Court Documents

#15

(#15) SCHEDULING ORDER Granting #14 Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order. Discovery due by 5/13/2022. Motions due by 6/10/2022. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 7/8/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 5/21/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR) (Entered: 05/21/2021)

#14

(#14) Joint Stipulated Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order by Plaintiff Mario Guzman, Jr. (Merrill, Janet) (Entered: 05/21/2021)

#13

(#13) Joint STATUS REPORT by Plaintiff Mario Guzman, Jr. (Merrill, Janet) (Entered: 05/13/2021)

#12

(#12) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Mario Guzman, Jr. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Merrill, Janet) (Entered: 05/11/2021)

#11

(#11) REPLY to Response to #6 Motion to Dismiss, by Defendants Audreyonna Baldridge, C.R. England, Inc.. (Lowry, Michael) (Entered: 05/06/2021)

#10

(#10) RESPONSE to #6 Motion to Dismiss, by Plaintiff Mario Guzman, Jr. Replies due by 5/6/2021. (Merrill, Janet) (Entered: 04/29/2021)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Rule 26(f) Meeting of Counsel on 5-13-2021 by Mario Guzman, Jr. (Merrill, Janet) (Entered: 04/29/2021)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Association of Counsel by Janet L Merrill on behalf of Plaintiff Mario Guzman, Jr. (Merrill, Janet) (Entered: 04/28/2021)

#7

(#7) STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendant C.R. England, Inc.. (Lowry, Michael) (Entered: 04/15/2021)

#6

(#6) MOTION to Dismiss by Defendants Audreyonna Baldridge, C.R. England, Inc.. Responses due by 4/29/2021. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 5/30/2021. (Lowry, Michael) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. (Entered: 04/15/2021)

#4

(#4) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 4/15/2021. Statement regarding removed action is due by 4/30/2021. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 5/15/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR) (Entered: 04/15/2021)

#2

(#2) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Audreyonna Baldridge, C.R. England, Inc.. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Lowry, Michael) (Entered: 04/15/2021)

1 #3

Demand Letter

1 #2

Complaint

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Eighth Judicial District Court, Case Number A-21-830899-C, (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0978-6448769) by C.R. England, Inc., Audreyonna Baldridge. Proof of service due by 6/8/2021. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Complaint, #3 Demand Letter) (Lowry, Michael) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. (Entered: 04/15/2021)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/21/2021
  • Docket(#16) NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. AO 85 Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (A copy of form AO 85 has been mailed to parties not receiving electronic service.) (no image attached) (MR) (Entered: 05/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) SCHEDULING ORDER Granting #14 Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order. Discovery due by 5/13/2022. Motions due by 6/10/2022. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 7/8/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 5/21/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR) (Entered: 05/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Joint Stipulated Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order by Plaintiff Mario Guzman, Jr. (Merrill, Janet) (Entered: 05/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Joint STATUS REPORT by Plaintiff Mario Guzman, Jr. (Merrill, Janet) (Entered: 05/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Mario Guzman, Jr. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Merrill, Janet) (Entered: 05/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) REPLY to Response to #6 Motion to Dismiss, by Defendants Audreyonna Baldridge, C.R. England, Inc.. (Lowry, Michael) (Entered: 05/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) RESPONSE to #6 Motion to Dismiss, by Plaintiff Mario Guzman, Jr. Replies due by 5/6/2021. (Merrill, Janet) (Entered: 04/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Rule 26(f) Meeting of Counsel on 5-13-2021 by Mario Guzman, Jr. (Merrill, Janet) (Entered: 04/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Association of Counsel by Janet L Merrill on behalf of Plaintiff Mario Guzman, Jr. (Merrill, Janet) (Entered: 04/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendant C.R. England, Inc.. (Lowry, Michael) (Entered: 04/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION to Dismiss by Defendants Audreyonna Baldridge, C.R. England, Inc.. Responses due by 4/29/2021. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 5/30/2021. (Lowry, Michael) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. (Entered: 04/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • Docket(#5) STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Judge Gloria M. Navarro. Judge Navarro's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR) (Entered: 04/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 4/15/2021. Statement regarding removed action is due by 4/30/2021. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 5/15/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR) (Entered: 04/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketCase randomly assigned to Judge Gloria M. Navarro and Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah. (MR) (Entered: 04/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CLERK'S NOTICE Regarding Local Rule IC 2-1(g). Attorney's account information is different from the address information contained in the filed document, ECF No. #1 . Attorney Cinema Greenberg is advised to review and update his/her user account information. (no image attached) (DKJ) (Entered: 04/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Audreyonna Baldridge, C.R. England, Inc.. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Lowry, Michael) (Entered: 04/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Eighth Judicial District Court, Case Number A-21-830899-C, (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0978-6448769) by C.R. England, Inc., Audreyonna Baldridge. Proof of service due by 6/8/2021. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Complaint, #3 Demand Letter) (Lowry, Michael) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. (Entered: 04/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where C.R. England, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jonathan C. Pattillo

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael P Lowry