Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 08/26/2019 at 07:12:33 (UTC).

Fortino Guzman Perez v. FCA US LLC

Case Summary

On 06/27/2019 Fortino Guzman Perez filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against FCA US LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are John F. Walter and Patrick J. Walsh. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-05599

  • Filing Date:

    06/27/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John F. Walter

Referral Judge

Patrick J. Walsh

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Fortino Guzman Perez

Defendants

FCA US LLC

Does 1 through 10, inclusive

Puente Hills Chrysler Dodge

Interested Parties

FCA North America Holdings LLC

Fiat Chrysler Automobiles N.V.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

White Jay Xie

Attorney at Consumer Law Experts PC

5757 West Century Boulevard Suite 500

Los Angeles, CA 90045

Benjeman R Beck

Attorney at Consumer Law Experts PC

5757 West Century Boulevard Suite 500

Los Angeles, CA 90045

Jessica F Anvar

Attorney at Consumer Law Experts PC

5757 West Century Boulevard Suite 500

Los Angeles, CA 90045

Defendant Attorneys

Michael Chung

Attorney at Bowman and Brooke LLP

970 West 190Th Street Suite 700

Torrance, CA 90502

Richard L Stuhlbarg

Attorney at Bowman and Brooke LLP

970 West 190Th Street Suite 700

Torrance, CA 90502

 

Court Documents

#16

(#16) Receipt of Copy of Remand Transmittal Letter from Los Angeles Superior Court, Case No. 19PSCV00481, acknowledged on 7/30/2019. (iv) (Entered: 08/05/2019)

#15

(#15) TRANSMITTAL of documents to Los Angeles Superior Court. A certified copy of the order of remand and a copy of the docket sheet from this court was sent to Clerk, Los Angeles Superior Court, Pomona. (iv) (Entered: 07/22/2019)

#14

(#14) ORDER TO REMAND TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT #13 by Judge John F. Walter. IT IS ORDERED THAT this action, case number 2:19-CV-05599-JFW-PJW and removed from Los Angeles County Superior Court case number 19PSCV00481, is hereby remanded to the Superior Court of the State of California for the County of Los Angeles. Case Terminated. Made JS-6 (iv) (Entered: 07/22/2019)

13 #1

Proposed Order

#13

(#13) First STIPULATION to Remand Case to State Court filed by Plaintiff Fortino Guzman Perez. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Xie, White) (Entered: 07/19/2019)

#12

(#12) DECLARATION of Richard L. Stuhlbarg re Compliance With Local Rules Governing Electronic Filing filed by Defendant FCA US LLC. (Stuhlbarg, Richard) (Entered: 07/10/2019)

#11

(#11) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Amended Complaint/Petition #9 as to Defendant Puente Hills Chrysler Dodge. (iv) (Entered: 07/10/2019)

#10

(#10) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Amended Complaint/Petition #9 filed by Plaintiff Fortino Guzman Perez. (Xie, White) (Entered: 07/08/2019)

#9

(#9) FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendant All Defendants amending Complaint - (Discovery),, filed by Plaintiff Fortino Guzman Perez(Xie, White) (Entered: 07/08/2019)

#8

(#8) Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney White Jay Xie counsel for Plaintiff Fortino Guzman Perez. Adding Matt Xie as counsel of record for FORTINO GUZMAN PEREZ for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff FORTINO GUZMAN PEREZ. (Attorney White Jay Xie added to party Fortino Guzman Perez(pty:pla))(Xie, White) (Entered: 07/08/2019)

#7

(#7) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge John F. Walter: Counsel are hereby notified that a Scheduling Conference has been set for July 29, 2019 at 1:15 p.m. before Judge John F. Walter in Courtroom 7A, 350 W. 1st St, Los Angeles, CA 90012. Lead Trial Counsel shall attend all proceedings before this Court, including the Scheduling Conference. Counsel are directed to comply with Rule 26 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 26-1 in a timely fashion and to file a Joint Report, on or before July 22, 2019. (iv) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

#6

(#6) STANDING ORDER by Judge John F. Walter. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge John F. Walter. (iv) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

#5

(#5) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

#4

(#4) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John F. Walter and Magistrate Judge Patrick J. Walsh. (lh) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

#3

(#3) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant FCA US LLC. (Chung, Michael) (Entered: 06/27/2019)

1 #2

Exhibit B - FCA's Answer to Complaint

1 #1

Exhibit A - Summons & Complaint

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles Superior Court - Pomona Courthouse (South), case number 19PSCV00481 Receipt No: 0973-23995061 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant FCA US LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Summons & Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - FCA's Answer to Complaint) (Attorney Michael Chung added to party FCA US LLC(pty:dft))(Chung, Michael) (Entered: 06/27/2019)

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) Receipt of Copy of Remand Transmittal Letter from Los Angeles Superior Court, Case No. 19PSCV00481, acknowledged on 7/30/2019. (iv) (Entered: 08/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) TRANSMITTAL of documents to Los Angeles Superior Court. A certified copy of the order of remand and a copy of the docket sheet from this court was sent to Clerk, Los Angeles Superior Court, Pomona. (iv) (Entered: 07/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) ORDER TO REMAND TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT #13 by Judge John F. Walter. IT IS ORDERED THAT this action, case number 2:19-CV-05599-JFW-PJW and removed from Los Angeles County Superior Court case number 19PSCV00481, is hereby remanded to the Superior Court of the State of California for the County of Los Angeles. Case Terminated. Made JS-6 (iv) (Entered: 07/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) First STIPULATION to Remand Case to State Court filed by Plaintiff Fortino Guzman Perez. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Xie, White) (Entered: 07/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) DECLARATION of Richard L. Stuhlbarg re Compliance With Local Rules Governing Electronic Filing filed by Defendant FCA US LLC. (Stuhlbarg, Richard) (Entered: 07/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Amended Complaint/Petition #9 as to Defendant Puente Hills Chrysler Dodge. (iv) (Entered: 07/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Amended Complaint/Petition #9 filed by Plaintiff Fortino Guzman Perez. (Xie, White) (Entered: 07/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendant All Defendants amending Complaint - (Discovery),, filed by Plaintiff Fortino Guzman Perez(Xie, White) (Entered: 07/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney White Jay Xie counsel for Plaintiff Fortino Guzman Perez. Adding Matt Xie as counsel of record for FORTINO GUZMAN PEREZ for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff FORTINO GUZMAN PEREZ. (Attorney White Jay Xie added to party Fortino Guzman Perez(pty:pla))(Xie, White) (Entered: 07/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge John F. Walter: Counsel are hereby notified that a Scheduling Conference has been set for July 29, 2019 at 1:15 p.m. before Judge John F. Walter in Courtroom 7A, 350 W. 1st St, Los Angeles, CA 90012. Lead Trial Counsel shall attend all proceedings before this Court, including the Scheduling Conference. Counsel are directed to comply with Rule 26 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 26-1 in a timely fashion and to file a Joint Report, on or before July 22, 2019. (iv) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) STANDING ORDER by Judge John F. Walter. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge John F. Walter. (iv) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John F. Walter and Magistrate Judge Patrick J. Walsh. (lh) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • NON-CONFORMED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint, filed by Defendant FCA US LLC. (SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL, DOCUMENT 1-2)(lh) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Does 1 through 50, FCA US LLC. Jury Demanded, filed by Plaintiff Fortino Guzman Perez. (FILED IN LOS ANGELES COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 5/24/2019 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL, DOCUMENT 1-1 #1 ) (lh) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant FCA US LLC. (Chung, Michael) (Entered: 06/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Certification and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant FCA US LLC, identifying Interested Parties - FCA North America Holdings, LLC and Fiat Chrysler Automobiles, N.V.. (Chung, Michael) (Entered: 06/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles Superior Court - Pomona Courthouse (South), case number 19PSCV00481 Receipt No: 0973-23995061 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant FCA US LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Summons & Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - FCA's Answer to Complaint) (Attorney Michael Chung added to party FCA US LLC(pty:dft))(Chung, Michael) (Entered: 06/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FCA NORTH AMERICA LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Fiat Chrysler Automobiles N.V. is a litigant

Latest cases where FCA US LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael Chung