This case was last updated from PACER on 04/20/2021 at 10:04:24 (UTC).

Manuel Guzman-Mendoza v. United States of America et al

Case Summary

On 02/19/2021 Manuel Guzman-Mendoza filed an Immigration - Other Immigration lawsuit against United States of America. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are James V. Selna and Autumn D. Spaeth. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:21-CV-00330

  • Filing Date:

    02/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Immigration - Other Immigration

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

James V. Selna

Referral Judge

Autumn D. Spaeth

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

MANUEL GUZMAN-MENDOZA

UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICE

Defendants

Does 1-10

Connie Nolan

US Department of Homeland Security

Tracy Renaud

United States of America

Alejandro Mayorkas

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

Kaveh Ardalan

Attorney at Kaveh Ardalan Law Offices

2100 North Broadway Suite 200

Santa Ana, CA 92706

Defendant Attorney

OIL-DCS Trial Attorney

Attorney at Office of Immigration Litigation

Po Box 868 Ben Franklin Station

Washington, DC 20044

 

Court Documents

#11

RESTRICTED

#10

(#10) INITIAL ORDER FOLLOWING FILING OF COMPLAINT ASSIGNED TO JUDGE SELNA (lb) (Entered: 02/24/2021)

#9

RESTRICTED

#8

RESTRICTED

#7

RESTRICTED

#6

RESTRICTED

#4

No Description Available

#3

No Description Available

#2

No Description Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by PLAINTIFF Manuel Guzman-Mendoza. Dismissal is WITHOUT PREJUDICE. (Ardalan, Kaveh) (Entered: 03/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) INITIAL ORDER FOLLOWING FILING OF COMPLAINT ASSIGNED TO JUDGE SELNA (lb) (Entered: 02/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by PLAINTIFF Manuel Guzman-Mendoza, (Ardalan, Kaveh) (Entered: 02/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening. The following error(s) was found: No Notice of Interested Parties has been filed. A Notice of Interested Parties must be filed with every partys first appearance. See Local Rule 7.1-1. Counsel must file a Notice of Interested Parties immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. (lh) (Entered: 02/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) 1 as to Defendants Alejandro Mayorkas, Connie Nolan, Tracy Renaud, US Department of Homeland Security, United States of America. (lh) (Entered: 02/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge James V. Selna and Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth. (lh) (Entered: 02/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where US Department of Homeland Security is a litigant

Latest cases where United States Department of Homeland Security is a litigant