This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/21/2022 at 08:28:11 (UTC).

Guzman-Hernandez v. Ashford Presbyterian Community Hospital, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 11/22/2021 Guzman-Hernandez filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Ashford Presbyterian Community Hospital, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Puerto Rico District. The Judge overseeing this case is Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-01555

  • Filing Date:

    11/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ileana Guzman-Hernandez

Defendants

Ashford Presbyterian Community Hospital, Inc.

Insurance Company A

Insurance Company B

Corporation X

Corporation Y

Professional Partnership I

Professional Partnership II

John Doe

Jane Doe

Ashford Presbyterian Community Hospital, Inc. doing business as Ashford Presbyterian Community Hospital

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Thomas Trebilcock-Horan

263 Camino Del Guyacandorado

Leonardo M. Aldridge

Attorney at ECIJA-SBGB Law Offices

Miramar Plaza, Second Floorp.O. Box 363068

San Juan, PR 00936

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $402 receipt number 0104-7538700.), filed by Ileana Guzman-Hernandez. Service due by 2/22/2022,(Trebilcock-Horan, Thomas) (Entered: 11/22/2021)

#2

(#2) CLERK'S NOTICE OF DEFECTIVE FILING.Civil Cover Sheet (JS44), and Category sheet not included electronically pursuant to L.Civ.R. 3(a). Notice of Compliance Deadline due by 11/24/2021. (arg) (Entered: 11/23/2021)

3 #3

Main Document

3 #1

Exhibit A, Category Sheet

3 #2

Exhibit B, Civil Cover Sheet

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Leonardo M. Aldridge on behalf of Ileana Guzman-Hernandez (Aldridge, Leonardo) (Entered: 11/24/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/24/2021
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez (arg) (Entered: 11/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Leonardo M. Aldridge on behalf of Ileana Guzman-Hernandez (Aldridge, Leonardo) (Entered: 11/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Filing Exhibits Category Sheet and Civil Cover Sheet filed by Thomas Trebilcock-Horan on behalf of Ileana Guzman-Hernandez Responses due by 12/7/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, Category Sheet, #2 Exhibit B, Civil Cover Sheet)(Trebilcock-Horan, Thomas) Modified on 11/29/2021 to edit title event (mcm). (Entered: 11/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CLERK'S NOTICE OF DEFECTIVE FILING.Civil Cover Sheet (JS44), and Category sheet not included electronically pursuant to L.Civ.R. 3(a). Notice of Compliance Deadline due by 11/24/2021. (arg) (Entered: 11/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $402 receipt number 0104-7538700.), filed by Ileana Guzman-Hernandez. Service due by 2/22/2022,(Trebilcock-Horan, Thomas) (Entered: 11/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Insurance Company B is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Thomas Trebilcock-Horan