This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/15/2021 at 11:23:59 (UTC).

Guy v. MINACT, Inc.

Case Summary

On 11/16/2020 Guy filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against MINACT, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Tennessee Western District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Charmiane G. Claxton and Jon Phipps McCalla. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-02833

  • Filing Date:

    11/16/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Charmiane G. Claxton

Presiding Judge

Jon Phipps McCalla

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Gyndra L Guy

Nashville, TN 37203

Defendant

MINACT, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jason A. Lee

Attorney at BURROW LEE, PLLC

611 Commerce Street, Suite 2603

Nashville, TN 37203

Defendant Attorneys

Benjamin Alan Matthews

Attorney at JACKSON SHIELDS YEISER & HOLT

262 German Oak Drive

Cordova, TN 38018

James L. Holt, Jr.

Attorney at JACKSON SHIELDS YEISER HOLT SPEAKMAN & LUCAS

262 German Oak Dr.

Memphis, TN 38018

 

Court Documents

#19

#18

#16

14 #1

Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Proposed Order

#14

#13

#12

#11

#10

#9

#8

#7

#3

1 #4

Exhibit Exhibit 3 - Right to Sue

1 #3

Exhibit Exhibit 2 - EEOC Amended Charge

1 #2

Exhibit Exhibit 1 - EEOC Charge

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Jon Phipps McCalla on 1/14/2021. (pa) (Entered: 01/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) SETTING LETTER: The Jury Trial is set for Monday, 3/28/2022 at 9:30 AM before Judge Jon Phipps McCalla. The Pretrial Conference is set for Friday, 3/18/2022 at 9:30 AM before Judge Jon Phipps McCalla. The Proposed Pretrial Order is due by 4:30 PM on 3/9/2022. (jrs) (Entered: 01/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • Docket(#17) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jon Phipps McCalla: Telephonic Scheduling Conference held on 1/5/2021. Jason Lee appeared for the Plaintiff. James Holt appeared for the Defendant. The Court extensively reviewed case information and gathered additional supplementary information. Deadlines and schedule set. The Jury Trial is set for Monday, /28/2022 at 9:30 AM before Judge Jon Phipps McCalla. The trial is expected to take 3-4 days. The Pretrial Conference is set for Friday, 3/18/2022 at 9:30 AM before Judge Jon Phipps McCalla. The Proposed Joint Pretrial Order is due by 4:30 PM on 3/9/2022. A Scheduling Order will be entered. (Court Reporter: Cathy Phillips) (jrs) (Entered: 01/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) AGREED JOINT PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Jon Phipps McCalla on 1/4/21. (joj) (Entered: 01/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) COURTESY NOTICE: Pursuant to Rule 5 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, document #14 MOTION for Protective Order proposed order submitted filed by MINACT, Inc. has been filed. For future reference, please note : Proposed order are not to be published on ECF, but only emailed to chambers in word format. If no order previously emailed, please do so upon receipt of this notice. Please refer to the #ECF User Manual and #ECF Policies and Procedures. Filer is not required to resubmit document. (jae) (Entered: 12/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) MOTION for Protective Order proposed order submitted by MINACT, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Proposed Order)(Holt, James) (Entered: 12/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting . (Lee, Jason) (Entered: 12/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) SETTING LETTER: A Telephonic Scheduling Conference is set for Tuesday, 1/5/2021 at 11:00 AM before Judge Jon Phipps McCalla. To access the telephonic conference parties will dial 888-675-2535 and enter access code 7360481. Please call at least 5 minutes in advance of the conference time. (jrs) (Entered: 12/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by MINACT, Inc..(Holt, James) (Entered: 12/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin Alan Matthews on behalf of MINACT, Inc. (Matthews, Benjamin) (Entered: 12/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by James L. Holt, Jr on behalf of MINACT, Inc. (Holt, James) (Entered: 12/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Gyndra L Guy as to MINACT, Inc.. (Lee, Jason) (Entered: 12/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Summons Issued as to MINACT, Inc.. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (jld) (Entered: 11/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (jld) (Entered: 11/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (jld) (Entered: 11/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (jld) (Entered: 11/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Judge Jon Phipps McCalla and Magistrate Judge Charmiane G. Claxton added. (jld) (Entered: 11/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Summons by Jason A. Lee on behalf of Gyndra L Guy. (Lee, Jason) (Entered: 11/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT for Damages against Gyndra L Guy (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNWDC-3484626), filed by Gyndra L Guy. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - EEOC Charge, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 2 - EEOC Amended Charge, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 3 - Right to Sue)(Lee, Jason) (Entered: 11/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MINACT, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jason A. Lee