This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/09/2021 at 11:23:48 (UTC).

Guttmann v. JPMCB Card Services

Case Summary

On 02/08/2021 Guttmann filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against JPMCB Card Services. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Nevada District. The Judges overseeing this case are Kent J. Dawson and Daniel J. Albregts. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-00210

  • Filing Date:

    02/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Kent J. Dawson

Referral Judge

Daniel J. Albregts

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Josef Guttmann

Las Vegas, NV 89107

Defendant

JPMCB Card Services

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

Jacob D Bundick

Attorney at Greenberg Traurig, LLP

10845 Griffith Peak Drive, Suite 600

Las Vegas, NV 89135

Christian Thomas Spaulding

Attorney at Greenberg Traurig, LLP

10845 Griffith Peak Drive Suite 600

Las Vegas, NV 89135

Michael R Hogue

Attorney at Greenberg Traurig, LLP

10845 Griffith Peak Drive, Suite 600

Las Vegas, NV 89135

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Exhibit A -- Small Claims Complaint

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Notice of NON-OPPOSITION to #4 Motion to Dismiss by Defendant JPMCB Card Services. (Bundick, Jacob) Modified on 3/24/2021 to reflect correct event (DKJ). (Entered: 03/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendant JPMCB Card Services. (Bundick, Jacob) (Entered: 02/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Kent J. Dawson on 2/16/2021. Regarding the Requirements of Klingele v. Eikenberry and Rand v. Rowland as to #4 Motion to Dismiss. Opposition due 14 days from the date of this Minute Order, and reply due seven 7 days after the filing of the opposition. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DKJ) (Entered: 02/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION to Dismiss #1 Petition for Removal,, by Defendant JPMCB Card Services. Responses due by 3/2/2021. (Bundick, Jacob) (Entered: 02/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by JPMCB Card Services that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent JPMorgan Chase & Co. added (DKJ) (Bundick, Jacob) Modified on 2/9/2021 to add corporate parent (DKJ). (Entered: 02/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Kent J. Dawson on 2/9/2021. Statement regarding removed action is due by 2/24/2021. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 3/11/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR) (Entered: 02/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • DocketCase randomly assigned to Judge Kent J. Dawson and Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts. (MR) (Entered: 02/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Justice Court, Las Vegas Township, Case Number 20A003560, (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0978-6362254) by JPMorgan Chase Bank N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A -- Small Claims Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Bundick, Jacob) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. (Entered: 02/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where JPMCB-Card Service is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael R Hogue

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Christian Thomas Spaulding

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jacob D Bundick