This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/04/2021 at 08:45:05 (UTC).

Gutta Enterprises, LLC v. Nayvadius Wilburn, LLC , et. al.

Case Summary

On 07/06/2021 Gutta Enterprises, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against Nayvadius Wilburn, LLC . This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Marvin E. Aspen and Martha M. Pacold. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-03585

  • Filing Date:

    07/06/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Marvin E. Aspen

Martha M. Pacold

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Gutta Enterprises, LLC

Defendants

Nayzadius Wilburn

Xavier Lamar Dotson

Wilburn Holdings Co., Inc.

Dotson Empire LLC

Freebandz Entertainment Inc.

Nayzadius Maximus Music

Zaytoven Global, LLC

Ultra International Music Publishing LLC

Nayvadius Wilburn, LLC

Future

Zaytoven

Wilburn Holding Co., Inc.

Nayvadius Maximus Music

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Kristina Dawn Diesner

Christopher William Niro

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Exhibit A

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #4

Exhibit D

1 #5

Exhibit E

1 #6

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

#3

#4

#6

#7

#8

8 #1

Initial Status Report outline

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

08/17/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#8) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Martha M. Pacold: The parties are directed to file an initial joint status report by 9/14/2021. (Attachments: #1 Initial Status Report outline) (rao, ) (Entered: 08/17/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/07/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#7) EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: Case reassigned to the Honorable Martha M. Pacold for all further proceedings. Honorable Marvin E. Aspen no longer assigned to the case. Signed by the Executive Committee on 7/7/2021. (exr, ) (Entered: 07/07/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/07/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) MAILED copyright report to Registrar, Washington DC (exr, ) (Entered: 07/07/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/06/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) DIGITAL EXHIBIT submitted by Gutta Enterprises, LLC regarding #1 For more information, please visit https://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/ExhibitDrop. If you wish to download a digital exhibit, please send your request to the Certified Copy Desk (CCD) inbox at CCD_ILND@ilnd.uscourts.gov. You will be provided with an invoice and charged according to the Fee Schedule. Once your payment has been processed, you will receive a URL via email to download the exhibit. (mp, ) Modified on 7/7/2021 (mp, ). (Entered: 07/07/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/06/2021

DocketCASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Marvin E. Aspen. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Maria Valdez. Case assignment: Random assignment. (lxk, ) (Entered: 07/06/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/06/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Gutta Enterprises, LLC by Kristina Dawn Diesner (Diesner, Kristina) (Entered: 07/06/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/06/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Gutta Enterprises, LLC by Christopher William Niro (Niro, Christopher) (Entered: 07/06/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/06/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Gutta Enterprises, LLC; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-18424599. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Niro, Christopher) (Entered: 07/06/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less